EP1551598 - CHISEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.05.2006 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.05.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.06.2006 [2006/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Irwin Industrial Tool Company Limited Parkway Works, Sheffield South Yorkshire S9 3BL / GB | [2005/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HALL, Stephen John 3 Moatlands, Wickersley Rotherham, South Yorkshire S66 1DQ / GB | 02 /
PRIEST, Arthur 43 Godric Drive, Brinsworth Rotherham, South Yorkshire S60 5AT / GB | [2005/28] | Representative(s) | Lawrence, John Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/28] | Lawrence, John Barker Brettell, 138 Hagley Road, Edgbaston Birmingham B16 9PW / GB | Application number, filing date | 03761696.8 | 30.06.2003 | [2005/28] | WO2003GB02776 | Priority number, date | GB20020015149 | 01.07.2002 Original published format: GB 0215149 | [2005/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004002688 | Date: | 08.01.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1551598 | Date: | 13.07.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.01.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.01.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B25D3/00, B25G1/10, B29C45/16, B29C45/14 | [2005/28] | CPC: |
B25D3/00 (EP);
B25G1/12 (EP);
B29C45/14311 (EP);
B25D2222/54 (EP);
B25D2222/61 (EP);
B29C45/0005 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/28] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MEISSEL | [2005/28] | English: | CHISEL | [2005/28] | French: | CISEAU | [2005/28] | Entry into regional phase | 21.01.2005 | National basic fee paid | 21.01.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.01.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.01.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 21.01.2005 | Examination requested [2005/28] | 31.12.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/26] | 07.02.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2006/26] | 17.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2005 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XAY]WO0200398 (ROSIE ANDREW MACPHERSON ;HOWELL PAUL (GB); MARTIN GRAHAM JOHN (GB)) [X] 1-5,9,12 * page 3, line 18 - line 25 * * page 4, line 2 - line 7 * * page 9, line 3 - line 10 * * page 9, line 29 - page 10, line 26 * * figures 7A,7B,9A,9B,9C * [A] 10 [Y] 6; | [YA]GB1586983 (STANLEY TOOLS LTD) [Y] 6 * page 1, line 42 - line 54 * * figure 3 * [A] 1,10; | [A]US6365086 (BAGENT DONALD E ET AL) [A] 3 * column 2, line 45 - line 49 * * column 3, line 29 - line 30 * * column 3, line 51 - line 55 * * figures 2,4 *; | [A]DE29621152U (GRUENZWEIG & HARTMANN MONTAGE) [A] 3 * page 4, paragraph 2 * * figure 2 *; | [DA]GB1582330 (FREEMAN E) [DA] 7,8 * the whole document * |