EP1521655 - DEVICE FOR DISCHARGING MOLTEN METAL FROM A CONTAINER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2005/15] | DEVICE FOR THE DISCHARGING MOLTEN METAL FROM A CONTAINER | ||
[2005/33] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.12.2006 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DANIELI & C. OFFICINE MECCANICHE S.p.A. Via Nazionale, 41 35042 Buttrio (UD) / IT | [2006/04] |
Former [2005/15] | For all designated states DANIELI & C. OFFICINE MECCANICHE S.p.A. Via Nazionale, 41 33042 Buttrio (UD) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOTHAM, W. Brian 1103, Town Street, Lound Retford, Nottinghamshire DN22 8SA / GB | 02 /
ZOMERO, Gianni Via Alpi, 22 I-33030 Pasian di Prato / IT | 03 /
DE LUCA, Andrea Via Malignani, 13/6 I-33047 Remanzacco / IT | [2005/15] | Representative(s) | Gervasi, Gemma, et al Notarbartolo & Gervasi S.p.A. Viale Achille Papa, 30 20149 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2005/15] | Gervasi, Gemma, Dr., et al NOTARBARTOLO & GERVASI Srl, Corso di Porta Vittoria, 9 20122 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 03763725.3 | 07.07.2003 | [2005/15] | WO2003EP07241 | Priority number, date | IT2002MI01507 | 10.07.2002 Original published format: IT MI20021507 | [2005/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004007123 | Date: | 22.01.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1521655 | Date: | 13.04.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.01.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1521655 | Date: | 25.01.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.01.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B22D37/00, B22D11/10 | [2005/15] | CPC: |
B22D37/005 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/15] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM ENTLEEREN VON METALLSCHMELZE AUS EINEM BEHÄLTER | [2005/33] | English: | DEVICE FOR DISCHARGING MOLTEN METAL FROM A CONTAINER | [2005/33] | French: | DISPOSITIF DESTINE A DECHARGER DU METAL FONDU D'UN CONTENEUR | [2005/15] |
Former [2005/15] | VORRICHTUNG ZUM ENTLEEREN VON SCHMELZE AUS EINEM BEHÄLTER | ||
Former [2005/15] | DEVICE FOR THE DISCHARGING MOLTEN METAL FROM A CONTAINER | Entry into regional phase | 07.02.2005 | National basic fee paid | 07.02.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.02.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.02.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.02.2005 | Examination requested [2005/15] | 22.07.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.11.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 21.11.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.10.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 25.01.2006 | CH | 25.01.2006 | CY | 25.01.2006 | CZ | 25.01.2006 | EE | 25.01.2006 | FI | 25.01.2006 | LI | 25.01.2006 | NL | 25.01.2006 | RO | 25.01.2006 | SI | 25.01.2006 | SK | 25.01.2006 | TR | 25.01.2006 | BG | 25.04.2006 | DK | 25.04.2006 | SE | 25.04.2006 | GR | 26.04.2006 | ES | 06.05.2006 | PT | 26.06.2006 | IE | 07.07.2006 | LU | 07.07.2006 | HU | 26.07.2006 | MC | 31.07.2006 | [2009/03] |
Former [2008/37] | BE | 25.01.2006 | |
CH | 25.01.2006 | ||
CZ | 25.01.2006 | ||
EE | 25.01.2006 | ||
FI | 25.01.2006 | ||
LI | 25.01.2006 | ||
NL | 25.01.2006 | ||
RO | 25.01.2006 | ||
SI | 25.01.2006 | ||
SK | 25.01.2006 | ||
TR | 25.01.2006 | ||
BG | 25.04.2006 | ||
DK | 25.04.2006 | ||
SE | 25.04.2006 | ||
GR | 26.04.2006 | ||
ES | 06.05.2006 | ||
PT | 26.06.2006 | ||
IE | 07.07.2006 | ||
LU | 07.07.2006 | ||
HU | 26.07.2006 | ||
MC | 31.07.2006 | ||
Former [2008/32] | BE | 25.01.2006 | |
CH | 25.01.2006 | ||
CZ | 25.01.2006 | ||
EE | 25.01.2006 | ||
FI | 25.01.2006 | ||
LI | 25.01.2006 | ||
NL | 25.01.2006 | ||
RO | 25.01.2006 | ||
SI | 25.01.2006 | ||
SK | 25.01.2006 | ||
BG | 25.04.2006 | ||
DK | 25.04.2006 | ||
SE | 25.04.2006 | ||
GR | 26.04.2006 | ||
ES | 06.05.2006 | ||
PT | 26.06.2006 | ||
IE | 07.07.2006 | ||
HU | 26.07.2006 | ||
MC | 31.07.2006 | ||
Former [2008/28] | BE | 25.01.2006 | |
CH | 25.01.2006 | ||
CZ | 25.01.2006 | ||
EE | 25.01.2006 | ||
FI | 25.01.2006 | ||
LI | 25.01.2006 | ||
NL | 25.01.2006 | ||
RO | 25.01.2006 | ||
SI | 25.01.2006 | ||
SK | 25.01.2006 | ||
BG | 25.04.2006 | ||
DK | 25.04.2006 | ||
SE | 25.04.2006 | ||
GR | 26.04.2006 | ||
ES | 06.05.2006 | ||
PT | 26.06.2006 | ||
IE | 07.07.2006 | ||
MC | 31.07.2006 | ||
Former [2008/21] | BE | 25.01.2006 | |
CH | 25.01.2006 | ||
CZ | 25.01.2006 | ||
FI | 25.01.2006 | ||
LI | 25.01.2006 | ||
NL | 25.01.2006 | ||
RO | 25.01.2006 | ||
SI | 25.01.2006 | ||
SK | 25.01.2006 | ||
BG | 25.04.2006 | ||
DK | 25.04.2006 | ||
SE | 25.04.2006 | ||
GR | 26.04.2006 | ||
ES | 06.05.2006 | ||
PT | 26.06.2006 | ||
IE | 07.07.2006 | ||
MC | 31.07.2006 | ||
Former [2007/45] | BE | 25.01.2006 | |
CH | 25.01.2006 | ||
FI | 25.01.2006 | ||
LI | 25.01.2006 | ||
NL | 25.01.2006 | ||
RO | 25.01.2006 | ||
SI | 25.01.2006 | ||
SK | 25.01.2006 | ||
BG | 25.04.2006 | ||
DK | 25.04.2006 | ||
SE | 25.04.2006 | ||
ES | 06.05.2006 | ||
PT | 26.06.2006 | ||
IE | 07.07.2006 | ||
MC | 31.07.2006 | ||
Former [2007/41] | BE | 25.01.2006 | |
CH | 25.01.2006 | ||
FI | 25.01.2006 | ||
IT | 25.01.2006 | ||
LI | 25.01.2006 | ||
NL | 25.01.2006 | ||
RO | 25.01.2006 | ||
SI | 25.01.2006 | ||
SK | 25.01.2006 | ||
BG | 25.04.2006 | ||
DK | 25.04.2006 | ||
SE | 25.04.2006 | ||
ES | 06.05.2006 | ||
PT | 26.06.2006 | ||
IE | 07.07.2006 | ||
MC | 31.07.2006 | ||
Former [2007/27] | BE | 25.01.2006 | |
CH | 25.01.2006 | ||
FI | 25.01.2006 | ||
LI | 25.01.2006 | ||
NL | 25.01.2006 | ||
SI | 25.01.2006 | ||
SK | 25.01.2006 | ||
BG | 25.04.2006 | ||
DK | 25.04.2006 | ||
SE | 25.04.2006 | ||
ES | 06.05.2006 | ||
PT | 26.06.2006 | ||
IE | 07.07.2006 | ||
MC | 31.07.2006 | ||
Former [2007/20] | BE | 25.01.2006 | |
CH | 25.01.2006 | ||
FI | 25.01.2006 | ||
LI | 25.01.2006 | ||
NL | 25.01.2006 | ||
SI | 25.01.2006 | ||
SK | 25.01.2006 | ||
BG | 25.04.2006 | ||
DK | 25.04.2006 | ||
SE | 25.04.2006 | ||
ES | 06.05.2006 | ||
PT | 26.06.2006 | ||
MC | 31.07.2006 | ||
Former [2007/14] | BE | 25.01.2006 | |
CH | 25.01.2006 | ||
FI | 25.01.2006 | ||
LI | 25.01.2006 | ||
NL | 25.01.2006 | ||
SI | 25.01.2006 | ||
SK | 25.01.2006 | ||
BG | 25.04.2006 | ||
DK | 25.04.2006 | ||
SE | 25.04.2006 | ||
ES | 06.05.2006 | ||
PT | 26.06.2006 | ||
Former [2007/03] | CH | 25.01.2006 | |
FI | 25.01.2006 | ||
LI | 25.01.2006 | ||
NL | 25.01.2006 | ||
SI | 25.01.2006 | ||
SK | 25.01.2006 | ||
BG | 25.04.2006 | ||
DK | 25.04.2006 | ||
SE | 25.04.2006 | ||
PT | 26.06.2006 | ||
Former [2007/01] | CH | 25.01.2006 | |
FI | 25.01.2006 | ||
LI | 25.01.2006 | ||
NL | 25.01.2006 | ||
SI | 25.01.2006 | ||
BG | 25.04.2006 | ||
DK | 25.04.2006 | ||
SE | 25.04.2006 | ||
PT | 26.06.2006 | ||
Former [2006/49] | CH | 25.01.2006 | |
FI | 25.01.2006 | ||
LI | 25.01.2006 | ||
NL | 25.01.2006 | ||
SI | 25.01.2006 | ||
BG | 25.04.2006 | ||
SE | 25.04.2006 | ||
PT | 26.06.2006 | ||
Former [2006/45] | CH | 25.01.2006 | |
FI | 25.01.2006 | ||
LI | 25.01.2006 | ||
NL | 25.01.2006 | ||
SE | 25.04.2006 | ||
Former [2006/42] | CH | 25.01.2006 | |
FI | 25.01.2006 | ||
LI | 25.01.2006 | ||
Former [2006/36] | FI | 25.01.2006 | Cited in | International search | [A]US3608616 (SCHNEIDER RALF) [A] 1,7 * column 2, line 22 - line 25; figure 1 *; | [A]US3833050 (KASHUBA V, et al) [A] 1,5,7 * column 2, line 28 - column 3, line 9; figure . *; | [A]US4840297 (WEEKLEY DAVID L [US], et al) [A] 1,7* column 2, line 24 - line 30; figure 1 *; | [A]FR2659880 (SIDERURGIE FSE INST RECH [FR]) [A] 1,7 * abstract * |