EP1522205 - TELEMETRY SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.04.2011 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.04.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.05.2011 [2011/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BS&B Safety Systems Limited Raheen Business Park Raheen Limerick / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/19] | For all designated states BS&B Safety Systems Limited Raheen Business Park Raheen, Limerick / IE | ||
Former [2005/15] | For all designated states F W Murphy 5311 South 122nd East Avenue Tulsa, OK 74146 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOLMES, John, K. 8242 South 72nd East Avenue Tulsa, OK 74133 / US | 02 /
BALDWIN, Terry, A. c/o F. W. Murphy 5311 S. 122nd East Avenue Tulsa, Oklahoma 74146 / US | [2007/07] |
Former [2005/15] | 01 /
HOLMES, John, K. 8242 South 72nd East Avenue Tulsa, OK 74133 / US | ||
02 /
BALDWIN, Terry, A. 13812 Birchwood Cr. Lindale, TX 75771 / US | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Grillparzerstrasse 14 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/28] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Postfach 22 14 43 80504 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/15] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Steinsdorfstrasse 6 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03764302.0 | 29.05.2003 | [2005/15] | WO2003US16875 | Priority number, date | US20020196723 | 16.07.2002 Original published format: US 196723 | [2005/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004008413 | Date: | 22.01.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/04] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1522205 | Date: | 13.04.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.01.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.02.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q9/02 | [2005/15] | CPC: |
H04Q9/02 (EP,US);
G08C17/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/15] | Title | German: | TELEMETRIESYSTEM | [2005/15] | English: | TELEMETRY SYSTEM | [2005/15] | French: | DISPOSITIF HERTZIEN D'EXTREMITE | [2005/15] | Entry into regional phase | 14.01.2005 | National basic fee paid | 14.01.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.01.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.02.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 14.01.2005 | Examination requested [2005/15] | 08.07.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.11.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/19] | 29.12.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US5461365 (SCHLAGER DAN [US], et al) [X] 1,3,7,11-13,17,20-23 * column 4, line 52 - line 67 * * column 5, line 32 - line 48 * * column 6, line 53 - column 7, line 14 * * column 8, line 63 - column 9, line 3 ** column 10, line 13 - line 19 *; | [X]WO0101366 (TELEMONITOR INC [US], et al) [X] 1-7,9-11,14-32 * page 5, line 4 - page 6, line 12 * * page 7, line 27 - page 8, line 29 * * page 21, line 12 - line 27 * * page 26, line 18 - line 25 * * page 29, line 24 - page 30, line 17 * * page 34, line 20 - page 35, line 15 *; | [X]WO0113558 (PHOENIX DATACOMM INC [US]) [X] 1-5,8,10,17-20,22-25,28-30,32 * page 5, line 23 - page 6, line 5 * * page 7, line 12 - line 22 * * page 9, line 9 - page 10, line 12 * * page 11, line 15 - page 12, line 15 * * page 15, line 3 - line 14 *; | [X]WO0116913 (WEBLINK WIRELESS INC [US]) [X] 1-5,7,11,12,17-23,25,28-30 * page 10, line 11 - line 32 * * page 13, line 4 - page 15, line 3 * |