EP1580557 - METHOD OF EXAMINING STAPHYLOCOCCUS AUREUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.04.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.04.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.05.2007 [2007/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DAIICHI PURE CHEMICALS CO., LTD. 13-5, Nihonbashi 3-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-0027 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/39] | For all designated states DAIICHI PURE CHEMICALS CO., LTD. 13-5, Nihonbashi 3-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-0027 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Horii, Toshinobu 3-22-1-201 Chikusa, Chikusa-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 464-0858 / JP | 02 /
Kondo, Akira, Daiichi Pure Chemicals Co., Ltd. Diagnostics Res. Lab., 3-3-1 Koyodai Ryugasaki-shi, Ibaraki 301-0852 / JP | 03 /
Kanno, Takashi 2-6-1-A-301 Handayama Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka 431-3125 / JP | 04 /
Maekawa, Masato 4-29-6, Handayama Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka 431-3125 / JP | [2005/39] | Representative(s) | Hartz, Nikolai Wächtershäuser & Hartz Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Weinstrasse 8 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/39] | Hartz, Nikolai Wächtershäuser & Hartz Patentanwälte Weinstrasse 8 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03774159.2 | 21.11.2003 | [2005/39] | WO2003JP14946 | Priority number, date | JP20020339526 | 22.11.2002 Original published format: JP 2002339526 | [2005/39] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004048975 | Date: | 10.06.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1580557 | Date: | 28.09.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.06.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 10.06.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.08.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/569, G01N33/543 | [2005/39] | CPC: |
G01N33/56938 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/39] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR UNTERSUCHUNG VON STAPHYLOCOCCUS AUREUS | [2005/39] | English: | METHOD OF EXAMINING STAPHYLOCOCCUS AUREUS | [2005/39] | French: | PROCEDE DE DETECTION DE STAPHYLOCOCCUS AUREUS | [2005/39] | Entry into regional phase | 19.05.2005 | Translation filed | 19.05.2005 | National basic fee paid | 19.05.2005 | Search fee paid | 19.05.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.05.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.03.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 19.05.2005 | Examination requested [2005/39] | 08.11.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/19] | 19.12.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2007/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2006 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0532430 (BIO MERIEUX [FR]) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [A] - GUIDRY A J ET AL, "Prevention of nonspecific binding of immunoglobulin to Staphylococcus aureus protein A in ELISA assays.", JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGICAL METHODS. 25 OCT 1991, (19911025), vol. 143, no. 2, ISSN 0022-1759, pages 159 - 165, XP002391669 [A] 1-9 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0022-1759(91)90041-D | International search | [Y]JPS6212859 (PHARMACIA AB); | [Y]JPH09211000 (KIKKOMAN CORP); | [Y] - YOSHIZAWA, Y ET AL., "Optimization of binding conditions of murine IgG1 antibodies to staphylococcal protein A.", JIKEIKAI MED. J., (1998), vol. 45, pages 107 - 113, XP002974919 | [Y] - COE, E.JOHN ET AL., "Staphylococcal protein a purification of rodent IgG1 and IgG2 with particular emphasis on syrian hamsters", MOLECULAR IMMUNOLOGY, (1981), vol. 18, no. 11, pages 1007 - 1012, XP002974920 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0161-5890(81)90119-X |