|
03.01.2013 |
Closing of application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.12.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.12.2012 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.12.2012 |
Text: Decision / Communication |
Appeal |
25 |
|
26.10.2012 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.10.2012 |
F3314 Oral proceedings: Minutes (ex parte) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.09.2012 |
Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.09.2012 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.09.2012 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
21.09.2012 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.09.2012 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.09.2012 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.09.2012 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
21.08.2012 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.08.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.08.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
01.08.2012 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
01.08.2012 |
F3346 Communication with reference to loss of rights, with time limit (ex parte) |
Appeal |
7 |
|
30.07.2012 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.10.2011 |
F3303.17 Change of the composition of the Board (T), in case Chairman is a legal member |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.03.2010 |
F3303.17 Change of the composition of the Board (T), in case Chairman is a legal member |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.11.2009 |
Letter relating to the automatic debiting procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.11.2009 |
Letter relating to the automatic debiting procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.09.2009 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.09.2009 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.09.2009 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.09.2009 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.09.2009 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.08.2009 |
Indication of deficiencies in a request for registering a transfer of rights and invitation to correct them |
Appeal |
3 |
|
27.07.2009 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.07.2009 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.07.2009 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.07.2009 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.07.2008 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.04.2008 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.03.2008 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.03.2008 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
03.03.2008 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.03.2008 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
03.03.2008 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
03.03.2008 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
11 |
|
03.03.2008 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
03.03.2008 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
03.03.2008 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.03.2008 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
12 |
|
03.03.2008 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
03.03.2008 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
38 |
|
03.03.2008 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
03.03.2008 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
15 |
|
28.02.2008 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.02.2008 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
28.02.2008 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
28.02.2008 |
Cover sheet for fax transmission |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.02.2008 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
15 |
|
24.11.2007 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.11.2007 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.11.2007 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.11.2007 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.11.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.11.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.11.2007 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
02.11.2007 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
02.11.2007 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.11.2007 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.11.2007 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
02.11.2007 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.11.2007 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.11.2007 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.11.2007 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.11.2007 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.10.2007 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.09.2007 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.09.2007 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.09.2007 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.09.2007 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.09.2007 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.09.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.09.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
07.09.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
07.09.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
07.09.2007 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.09.2007 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
07.09.2007 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
07.09.2007 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
23 |
|
07.09.2007 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.09.2007 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
38 |
|
07.09.2007 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
07.09.2007 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
07.09.2007 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
07.09.2007 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
06.03.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.02.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.02.2007 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
15.02.2007 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
124 |
|
15.02.2007 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.01.2007 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.07.2006 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
21.07.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
21.07.2006 |
Non-scannable object |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
21.07.2006 |
Non-scannable object |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.07.2006 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
19.07.2006 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
19.07.2006 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
19.07.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
19.07.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
19.07.2006 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
16.03.2006 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
16.03.2006 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.11.2005 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
25.10.2005 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
25.10.2005 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
25.10.2005 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
5 |
|
25.10.2005 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
5 |
|
25.10.2005 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
25.10.2005 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
25.10.2005 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
25.10.2005 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
12.10.2005 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.10.2005 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
10.10.2005 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.10.2005 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
28.09.2005 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
6 |
|
28.09.2005 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
6 |
|
26.09.2005 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
6 |
|
26.09.2005 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
6 |
|
21.09.2005 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.09.2005 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.09.2005 |
Despatch of copy of consultation |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
02.09.2005 |
Result of consultation |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
09.08.2005 |
Despatch of copy of consultation |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
09.08.2005 |
Result of consultation |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
06.08.2005 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
04.08.2005 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
23.07.2005 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
21.07.2005 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
19.07.2005 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.07.2005 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.07.2005 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
19.07.2005 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
18.07.2005 |
Free text |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
02.06.2005 |
Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/409 |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
35 |
|
02.06.2005 |
Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/409 |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
14 |
|
30.05.2005 |
Free text |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
30.05.2005 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
10 |
|
30.05.2005 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
10 |
|
30.05.2005 |
Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/409 |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
30.05.2005 |
Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/409 |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
30.05.2005 |
Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/409 |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
11 |
|
30.05.2005 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
8 |
|
30.05.2005 |
Written opinion |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
6 |
|
18.05.2005 |
Annexes to the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
18.05.2005 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
13.05.2005 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
18.04.2005 |
Free text |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
02.04.2005 |
Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/409 |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
31.03.2005 |
Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/409 |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
24.03.2005 |
Annex to International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
10 |
|
24.03.2005 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
24.03.2005 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
24.03.2005 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
24.03.2005 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
24.03.2005 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
24.03.2005 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
24.03.2005 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
24.03.2005 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
21.01.2005 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
10 |
|
21.01.2005 |
Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
11 |
|
19.01.2005 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
10 |
|
19.01.2005 |
Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
11 |
|
11.11.2004 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
11.11.2004 |
International publication of the international search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.10.2004 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.10.2004 |
Written opinion |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
19.10.2004 |
Written opinion - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
19.10.2004 |
Written opinion - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
18.10.2004 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
18.10.2004 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
18.10.2004 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
08.10.2004 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.08.2004 |
Urgent incoming letter |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
16.08.2004 |
Urgent incoming letter |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
04.08.2004 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
64 |
|
08.07.2004 |
Published international application - A2 |
Search / examination |
66 |
|
06.07.2004 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
06.07.2004 |
Notification of receipt of demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
17.06.2004 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
17.06.2004 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
03.03.2004 |
Communication in cases for which no other form is applicable |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
06.02.2004 |
Submission concerning representation |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
28.01.2004 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
28.01.2004 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
8 |
|
28.01.2004 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
50 |
|
28.01.2004 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
7 |