EP1581418 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR HILL START [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 06.01.2017 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.01.2017 | Opposition rejected | published on 08.02.2017 [2017/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VOLVO LASTVAGNAR AB 405 08 Göteborg / SE | [2005/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STEEN, Marcus Fotbollsvägen 31 S-424 33 Angered / SE | 02 /
LAURI, Erik Eklanda Slätt 22 S-431 59 Mölndal / SE | 03 /
KARLSSON, Lars Snäckskalsvägen 9 S-417 29 Göteborg / SE | [2005/40] | Representative(s) | Volvo Technology Corporation Volvo Group Intellectual Property BF14100, VGHQ3A 405 08 Göteborg / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/26] | Fröhling, Werner Otto Volvo Technology Corporation Corporate Patents 06820, M1.7 405 08 Göteborg / SE | ||
Former [2005/40] | Fröhling, Werner Otto Volvo Technology Corporation, Corporate Patents, 06820, M1.7 Götaverksgatan 10 417 55 Göteborg / SE | Application number, filing date | 03783018.9 | 18.12.2003 | [2005/40] | WO2003SE02042 | Priority number, date | SE20020003903 | 30.12.2002 Original published format: SE 0203903 | [2005/40] | Filing language | SV | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004058551 | Date: | 15.07.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1581418 | Date: | 05.10.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.07.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1581418 | Date: | 16.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 15.07.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B60T7/12, B60W10/02, B60W10/06, B60W30/18, // F16H37/04 | [2013/33] | CPC: |
B60W30/18027 (EP,US);
B60T7/122 (EP,US);
B60W30/18118 (EP,US);
B60T2201/06 (EP,US);
B60W10/02 (EP,US);
B60W10/06 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2010/35] | B60T7/12, B60W30/18 | ||
Former IPC [2005/40] | B60T7/12 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/40] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG FÜR BERGSTART | [2005/40] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR HILL START | [2005/40] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR DEMARRAGE EN COTE | [2005/40] | Entry into regional phase | 01.08.2005 | National basic fee paid | 01.08.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.08.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.06.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 01.08.2005 | Examination requested [2005/40] | 06.09.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.12.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 06.12.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
15.12.2011
11.01.2012
ADMISSIBLE Scania CV AB P.O. Box Granparksvägen 10, by 117 kv 151 87 Södertälje / SE Opponent's representative Thum, Bernhard Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/04] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
15.12.2011
Scania CV AB 15187 Södertälje / SE Opponent's representative Thum, Bernhard Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | 24.01.2012 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 24.05.2012 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 09.07.2013 | Date of oral proceedings | 18.07.2013 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 18.07.2013 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 21.10.2016 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2017/06] | Appeal following opposition | 26.08.2013 | Appeal received No. T1870/13 | 27.11.2013 | Statement of grounds filed | 21.10.2016 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent was rejected | 21.10.2016 | Date of oral proceedings | 03.11.2016 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 03.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 16.03.2011 | BE | 16.03.2011 | CY | 16.03.2011 | CZ | 16.03.2011 | DK | 16.03.2011 | EE | 16.03.2011 | FI | 16.03.2011 | HU | 16.03.2011 | RO | 16.03.2011 | SI | 16.03.2011 | SK | 16.03.2011 | TR | 16.03.2011 | BG | 16.06.2011 | GR | 17.06.2011 | PT | 18.07.2011 | IE | 18.12.2011 | LU | 18.12.2011 | CH | 31.12.2011 | LI | 31.12.2011 | MC | 31.12.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 16.03.2011 | |
BE | 16.03.2011 | ||
CY | 16.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 16.03.2011 | ||
DK | 16.03.2011 | ||
EE | 16.03.2011 | ||
FI | 16.03.2011 | ||
RO | 16.03.2011 | ||
SI | 16.03.2011 | ||
SK | 16.03.2011 | ||
TR | 16.03.2011 | ||
BG | 16.06.2011 | ||
GR | 17.06.2011 | ||
PT | 18.07.2011 | ||
IE | 18.12.2011 | ||
LU | 18.12.2011 | ||
CH | 31.12.2011 | ||
LI | 31.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | AT | 16.03.2011 | |
BE | 16.03.2011 | ||
CY | 16.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 16.03.2011 | ||
EE | 16.03.2011 | ||
FI | 16.03.2011 | ||
RO | 16.03.2011 | ||
SI | 16.03.2011 | ||
SK | 16.03.2011 | ||
BG | 16.06.2011 | ||
GR | 17.06.2011 | ||
PT | 18.07.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | AT | 16.03.2011 | |
BE | 16.03.2011 | ||
CY | 16.03.2011 | ||
EE | 16.03.2011 | ||
FI | 16.03.2011 | ||
SI | 16.03.2011 | ||
BG | 16.06.2011 | ||
GR | 17.06.2011 | ||
PT | 18.07.2011 | ||
Former [2011/41] | AT | 16.03.2011 | |
BE | 16.03.2011 | ||
CY | 16.03.2011 | ||
FI | 16.03.2011 | ||
SI | 16.03.2011 | ||
BG | 16.06.2011 | ||
GR | 17.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/40] | AT | 16.03.2011 | |
CY | 16.03.2011 | ||
FI | 16.03.2011 | ||
SI | 16.03.2011 | ||
BG | 16.06.2011 | ||
GR | 17.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | GR | 17.06.2011 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0781946 (AISIN AW CO [JP]); | [A]EP1040957 (ISUZU MOTORS LTD [JP]); | [A]US6411881 (THOMAS JOSEPH LYLE [US]); | [A]US6439675 (ZECHMANN JUERGEN [DE], et al) |