blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1569642

EP1569642 - USE OF CANTHIN-6-ONE, PLANT EXTRACTS CONTAINING SAME AND DERIVATIVES THEREOF IN THE TREATMENT OF TRYPANOSOMIASES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.06.2011
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip19.10.2012Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 21.11.2012  [2012/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Institut de Recherche pour le Développement (IRD)
213, rue La Fayette
75480 Paris Cedex 10 / FR
For all designated states
Universite Nationale d'Asuncion
Rio de la Plata y la gerenza
CC2511 Asuncion / PY
[N/P]
Former [2005/36]For all designated states
Institut de Recherche pour le Développement ( IRD)
213, rue La Fayette
75480 Paris Cedex 10 / FR
For all designated states
Universite Nationale d'Asuncion
Rio de la Plata y la gerenza
CC2511 Asuncion / PY
Inventor(s)01 / FERREIRA, Maria-Elena
Juan de Mema, C/Cerro Cora
Lugue / PY
02 / FOURNET, Alain
506, chemin de Tastet
F-40590 Ossages / FR
03 / ROJAS DE ARIAS, Antonieta
C/ Concordia y Florida
1165 Atilio Pena / PY
04 / HOCQUEMILLER, Reynald
9, rue d'Arpajon
F-91470 Limours / FR
05 / POUPON, Erwan
22 rue Jean Moulin
F-92160 Antony / FR
 [2006/52]
Former [2005/36]01 / FERREIRA, Maria-Elena
Juan de Mema, C/Cerro Cora
Lugue / PY
02 / FOURNET, Alain
506, chemin de Tastet
F-40590 Ossages / FR
03 / ROJAS DE ARIAS, Antonieta
C/ Concordia y Florida
1165 Atilio Pena / PY
04 / HOCQUEMILLER, Reynald
9, rue d'Arpajon
F-91470 Limours / FR
05 / POUPON, Erwan
1C, rue des Iris
F-92160 Antony / FR
Representative(s)Corizzi, Valérie, et al
Cabinet ORES
36, rue de Saint Pétersbourg
75008 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [2005/36]Corizzi, Valérie, et al
Cabinet ORES, 36, rue de Saint Pétersbourg
75008 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date03789474.824.11.2003
[2005/36]
WO2003FR03459
Priority number, dateFR2002001472925.11.2002         Original published format: FR 0214729
[2005/36]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2004050092
Date:17.06.2004
Language:FR
[2004/25]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1569642
Date:07.09.2005
Language:FR
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.06.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2005/36]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1569642
Date:11.08.2010
Language:FR
[2010/32]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP17.06.2004
ClassificationIPC:A61K31/4375, A61K36/185, A61K36/758, A61P33/02, C07D471/16
[2010/08]
CPC:
A61K31/4375 (EP,US); A61K36/185 (EP,US); A61K36/758 (EP,US);
A61P33/00 (EP); A61P33/02 (EP); Y02A50/30 (EP,US)
Former IPC [2005/36]A61K31/4375, A61K35/78, A61P33/02, C07D471/16
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2005/36]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERWENDUNG VON CANTHIN-6-ON, VON PFLANZENEXTRAKTEN DIESES ENTHALTEND UND VON DESSEN DERIVATEN FÜR DIE BEHANDLUNG VON TRYPANOSOMIASIS[2005/36]
English:USE OF CANTHIN-6-ONE, PLANT EXTRACTS CONTAINING SAME AND DERIVATIVES THEREOF IN THE TREATMENT OF TRYPANOSOMIASES[2005/36]
French:UTILISATION DE LA CANTHIN-6-ONE, DES EXTRAITS DE PLANTES LA CONTENANT ET DE SES DERIVES DANS LE TRAITEMENT DES TRYPANOSOMIASES[2005/36]
Entry into regional phase13.06.2005National basic fee paid 
13.06.2005Designation fee(s) paid 
13.06.2005Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.06.2005Examination requested  [2005/36]
15.07.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.09.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.04.2010Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.06.2010Fee for grant paid
25.06.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)12.05.2011No opposition filed within time limit [2011/29]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.09.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
27.09.2006Renewal fee patent year 04
24.09.2007Renewal fee patent year 05
26.09.2008Renewal fee patent year 06
21.09.2009Renewal fee patent year 07
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT11.08.2010
CY11.08.2010
CZ11.08.2010
DK11.08.2010
EE11.08.2010
FI11.08.2010
IE11.08.2010
IT11.08.2010
NL11.08.2010
RO11.08.2010
SE11.08.2010
SI11.08.2010
SK11.08.2010
TR11.08.2010
BG11.11.2010
GR12.11.2010
ES22.11.2010
LU24.11.2010
BE30.11.2010
MC30.11.2010
PT13.12.2010
HU12.02.2011
[2012/47]
Former [2012/44]AT11.08.2010
CY11.08.2010
CZ11.08.2010
DK11.08.2010
EE11.08.2010
FI11.08.2010
IE11.08.2010
IT11.08.2010
NL11.08.2010
RO11.08.2010
SE11.08.2010
SI11.08.2010
SK11.08.2010
BG11.11.2010
GR12.11.2010
ES22.11.2010
LU24.11.2010
BE30.11.2010
MC30.11.2010
PT13.12.2010
HU12.02.2011
Former [2012/42]AT11.08.2010
CY11.08.2010
CZ11.08.2010
DK11.08.2010
EE11.08.2010
FI11.08.2010
IE11.08.2010
IT11.08.2010
NL11.08.2010
RO11.08.2010
SE11.08.2010
SI11.08.2010
SK11.08.2010
BG11.11.2010
GR12.11.2010
ES22.11.2010
BE30.11.2010
MC30.11.2010
PT13.12.2010
HU12.02.2011
Former [2011/41]AT11.08.2010
CY11.08.2010
CZ11.08.2010
DK11.08.2010
EE11.08.2010
FI11.08.2010
IE11.08.2010
IT11.08.2010
NL11.08.2010
RO11.08.2010
SE11.08.2010
SI11.08.2010
SK11.08.2010
BG11.11.2010
GR12.11.2010
ES22.11.2010
BE30.11.2010
MC30.11.2010
PT13.12.2010
Former [2011/31]AT11.08.2010
CY11.08.2010
CZ11.08.2010
DK11.08.2010
EE11.08.2010
FI11.08.2010
IE11.08.2010
IT11.08.2010
NL11.08.2010
RO11.08.2010
SE11.08.2010
SI11.08.2010
SK11.08.2010
BG11.11.2010
GR12.11.2010
ES22.11.2010
MC30.11.2010
PT13.12.2010
Former [2011/23]AT11.08.2010
CY11.08.2010
CZ11.08.2010
DK11.08.2010
EE11.08.2010
FI11.08.2010
IE11.08.2010
NL11.08.2010
SE11.08.2010
SI11.08.2010
SK11.08.2010
BG11.11.2010
GR12.11.2010
PT13.12.2010
Former [2011/19]AT11.08.2010
CY11.08.2010
DK11.08.2010
FI11.08.2010
IE11.08.2010
NL11.08.2010
SE11.08.2010
SI11.08.2010
BG11.11.2010
GR12.11.2010
PT13.12.2010
Former [2011/15]AT11.08.2010
CY11.08.2010
FI11.08.2010
NL11.08.2010
SE11.08.2010
SI11.08.2010
BG11.11.2010
GR12.11.2010
PT13.12.2010
Former [2011/13]AT11.08.2010
CY11.08.2010
FI11.08.2010
NL11.08.2010
SI11.08.2010
BG11.11.2010
PT13.12.2010
Former [2011/12]AT11.08.2010
FI11.08.2010
NL11.08.2010
SI11.08.2010
BG11.11.2010
PT13.12.2010
Former [2011/10]AT11.08.2010
FI11.08.2010
NL11.08.2010
SI11.08.2010
PT13.12.2010
Former [2011/08]AT11.08.2010
NL11.08.2010
Cited inInternational search[PX]WO03094990  (HEMOTEQ GMBH [DE], et al) [PX] 14,21 * page 24, line 20 - line 29 * * page 27, line 4 - line 5 *;
 [XY]  - ODEBIYI O O ET AL, "ANTIMICROBIAL ALKALOIDS FROM A NIGERIAN CHEWING STICK (FAGARA ZANTHOXYLOIDES)", PLANTA MEDICA, THIEME, STUTTGART, DE, (1979), vol. 36, no. 3, ISSN 0032-0943, pages 204 - 207, XP008007203 [X] 14,16-18 * page 205, column 2, paragraph 2 * [Y] 1-13,15,19-21
 [XAY]  - FERREIRA M E ET AL, "LEISHMANICIDAL ACTIVITY OF TWO CANTHIN-6-ONE ALKALOIDS, TWO MAJOR CONSTITUENTS OF ZANTHOXYLUM CHILOPERONE VAR. ANGUSTIFOLIUM", JOURNAL OF ETHNOPHARMACOLOGY, ELSEVIER SCIENTIFIC PUBLISHERS LTD, IE, (2002), vol. 80, no. 2/3, ISSN 0378-8741, pages 199 - 202, XP001104505 [X] 14,16-18,20,21 * page 200, chapitre "Drug treatment" * * page 201, chapitre "Results and discussion" * * the whole document * [A] 1-13 [Y] 15,19

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0378-8741(02)00025-9
 [XAY]  - DIEHL E E ET AL, "CONSTITUENTS OF ZANTHOXYLUM RUGOSUM ST.-HIL & TUL", BIOCHEMICAL SYSTEMATICS AND ECOLOGY, PERGAMON PRESS, GB, (2000), vol. 3, no. 28, ISSN 0305-1978, pages 275 - 277, XP008007208 [X] 14,16-18,20 * page 276, paragraph 3 * * the whole document * [A] 1-13 [Y] 15,19,21
    [DXAY] - KANCHANAPOOM T ET AL, "CANTHIN-6-ONE AND BETA-CARBOLINE ALKALOIDS FROM EURYCOMA HARMANDIANA", PHYTOCHEMISTRY, PERGAMON PRESS, GB, (200102), vol. 56, no. 4, ISSN 0031-9422, pages 383 - 386, XP001086497 [DX] 14,16-18 * page 384, composés 2-5 * * the whole document * [A] 1-13 [Y] 15,19-21

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0031-9422(00)00363-0
 [XAY]  - HARRIS A ET AL, "CANTHIN-6-ONE ALKALOIDS FROM BRUCEA ANTIDYSENTERICA ROOT BARK", PLANTA MEDICA, THIEME, STUTTGART, DE, (1985), vol. 2, ISSN 0032-0943, pages 151 - 153, XP008007205 [X] 14,16-18,20 * page 151, colonne 2, composés 1-4 * * the whole document * [A] 1-13 [Y] 15,19,21
 [XA]  - CHAN K L ET AL, "PLANTS AS SOURCES OF ANTIMALARIAL DRUGS. PART 3 EURYCOMA LONGIFOLIA", PLANTA MEDICA, THIEME, STUTTGART, DE, (1986), no. 2, ISSN 0032-0943, pages 105 - 107, XP008007198 [X] 14 * page 105, composé 9 * * the whole document * [A] 1-13,15-21
 [X]  - KOIKE, KAZUO ET AL, "Synthesis and antitumor activity of canthin-5,6-dione derivatives", HETEROCYCLES (1999), 51(2), 315-323, XP001180668 [X] 14-18 * page 316, composé 14 *
 [Y]  - FREIBURGHAUS F ET AL, "Evaluation of African medicinal plants for their in vitro trypanocidal activity", JOURNAL OF ETHNOPHARMACOLOGY, ELSEVIER SCIENTIFIC PUBLISHERS LTD, IE, (1996), vol. 55, ISSN 0378-8741, pages 1 - 11, XP002212312 [Y] 1-13 * pages 4-7, chapitre "Discussion" * * tables 2,3 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0378-8741(96)01463-8
 [A]  - FREIBURGHAUS F ET AL, "In vitro trypanocidal activity of some rare Tanzanian medicinal plants", ACTA TROPICA, ELSEVIER SCIENCE BV., AMSTERDAM, NL, (1997), vol. 67, no. 3, ISSN 0001-706X, pages 181 - 185, XP002212313 [A] 1-13 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0001-706X(97)00064-8
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.