blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1569684

EP1569684 - USE OF HMGB FRAGMENTS AS ANTI-INFLAMMATORY AGENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  15.05.2009
Database last updated on 18.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip15.05.2009Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 17.06.2009  [2009/25]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Critical Therapeutics, Inc.
60 Westview Avenue
Lexington, MA 02421 / US
[2005/36]
Inventor(s)01 / NEWMAN, Walter
160 West Newton Street
Boston, MA 02118 / US
02 / O'KEEFE, Theresa, L.
1 Parkers Lane
Waltham, MA 02453 / US
 [2007/01]
Former [2005/36]01 / NEWMAN, Walter
3 Durham Street 3
Boston, MA 02115 / US
02 / O'KEEFE, Theresa, L.
1 Parkers Lane
Waltham, MA 02453 / US
Representative(s)Snodin, Michael D.
Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB
[N/P]
Former [2005/36]Snodin, Michael D.
Eric Potter Clarkson Park View House 58 The Ropewalk
Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB
Application number, filing date03789973.920.11.2003
[2005/36]
WO2003US37507
Priority number, dateUS20020427841P20.11.2002         Original published format: US 427841 P
US20020427846P20.11.2002         Original published format: US 427846 P
[2005/36]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report
No.:WO2004046345
Date:03.06.2004
Language:EN
[2004/23]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1569684
Date:07.09.2005
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.06.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2005/36]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US02.12.2004
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.06.2006
ClassificationIPC:A61K39/00, C07K7/00, A61K38/00
[2005/36]
CPC:
C07K14/47 (EP); A61K38/1709 (EP); A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P1/18 (EP); A61P11/00 (EP); A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P17/02 (EP); A61P17/06 (EP); A61P19/00 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP); A61P29/00 (EP); A61P3/04 (EP);
A61P31/00 (EP); A61P31/04 (EP); A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/04 (EP); A61P43/00 (EP); A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/02 (EP) (-)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2005/36]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERWENDUNG VONHMGB-FRAGMENTEN ALS ENTZÜNDUNGSHEMMENDE MITTEL[2005/36]
English:USE OF HMGB FRAGMENTS AS ANTI-INFLAMMATORY AGENTS[2005/36]
French:UTILISATION DE FRAGMENTS HMGB EN TANT QU'AGENTS ANTI-INFLAMMATOIRES[2005/36]
Entry into regional phase16.06.2005National basic fee paid 
16.06.2005Search fee paid 
16.06.2005Designation fee(s) paid 
16.06.2005Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.06.2005Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
16.06.2005Examination requested  [2005/36]
18.08.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.12.2008Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2009/25]
03.02.2009Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2009/25]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.11.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
27.11.2006Renewal fee patent year 04
27.11.2007Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.200806   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]EP1033401  (GENSET SA [FR])[X] 13;
 [X]  - ROGALLA P ET AL, "Mapping and molecular characterization of five HMG1-related DNA sequences", CYTOGENETICS AND CELL GENETICS, (1998), vol. 83, no. 1-2, ISSN 0301-0171, pages 124 - 129, XP009063822 [X] 1 * abstract * * page 124, column R, paragraph 2 * * page 126, column R, line 12 - page 127, column R, line 10; figure 3 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1159/000015147
 [X]  - "Human secreted protein, SEQ ID NO: 7904.", Geneseq, (20001006), Database accession no. AAG03823, URL: EBI, XP002373264 [X] 11-14 * Geneseq accession number AAG03823 is 100% identical with SEQ ID No:4 of the present application over the entire length of SEQ ID No:4. AAG03823 is identical to SEQ ID No:7904 of EP1033401 *
 [A]  - DAILEY LISA ET AL, "Coevolution of HMG domains and homeodomains and the generation of transcriptional regulation by Sox/POU complexes", JOURNAL OF CELLULAR PHYSIOLOGY, (200103), vol. 186, no. 3, ISSN 0021-9541, pages 315 - 328, XP002373261 [A] 1,7,11-15,25,27 * page 316, column R, paragraph 2; figure 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/1097-4652(2001)9999:9999<000::AID-JCP1046>3.0.CO;2-Y
 [T]  - YANG HUAN ET AL, "Reversing established sepsis with antagonists of endogenous high-mobility group box 1.", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, (20040106), vol. 101, no. 1, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 296 - 301, XP002373262 [T] 1,7,11-15,25,27 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.2434651100
International search[X]  - WANG ET AL., "HMG-1 as a late mediator of endotoxin lethality in mice", SCIENCE, (19990709), vol. 285, no. 5425, pages 248 - 251, XP002940163

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.285.5425.248
 [X]  - ANDERSSON ET AL., "High mobility group 1 protein (HMG-1) stimulates proinföammatory cytokine synthesis in human monocytes", J. EXP. MED., (20000821), vol. 192, no. 4, pages 565 - 570, XP002233473

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1084/jem.192.4.565
 [X]  - ABRAHAM ET AL., "Cutting edge: HMG-1 as a mediator of acute lung inflammation", J. IMMUNOL., (20000915), vol. 165, no. 6, pages 2950 - 2954, XP002982921
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.