EP1554441 - TOILET ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 15.09.2006 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 29.10.2008 [2008/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states American Standard International Inc. 15 West 54th Street New York, New York 10019 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2005/29] | For all designated states American Standard International Inc. 15 West 54th Street New York, New York 10019 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JENSEN, Robert, M. 399 Dunham's Corner Road East Brunswick, NJ 08816 / US | 02 /
PROKOPENKO, Aleksandr, V. 13 Buttonwood Drive Bordentown, NJ 03505 / US | [2005/29] | Representative(s) | Müller, Karl-Ernst, et al Patentanwälte Becker & Müller Turmstrasse 22 40878 Ratingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/44] | Müller, Karl-Ernst, et al Patentanwälte Becker & Müller Turmstrasse 22 40878 Ratingen / DE | ||
Former [2005/29] | Müller, Karl-Ernst, et al Turmstrasse 22 40878 Ratingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 03791724.2 | 21.08.2003 | [2005/29] | WO2003US26287 | Priority number, date | US20020231977 | 30.08.2002 Original published format: US 231977 | [2005/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004020753 | Date: | 11.03.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/11] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1554441 | Date: | 20.07.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.03.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.05.2004 | Classification | IPC: | E03D11/08 | [2005/29] | CPC: |
E03D11/08 (EP,US);
E03D11/00 (KR);
E03D1/34 (EP,US);
E03D11/02 (EP,US);
E03D2201/30 (EP,US);
E03D2201/40 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/29] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TOILETTENANORDNUNG | [2005/29] | English: | TOILET ASSEMBLY | [2005/29] | French: | BLOC W.-C. | [2005/29] | Entry into regional phase | 24.02.2005 | National basic fee paid | 24.02.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.02.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.02.2005 | Examination requested [2005/29] | 28.07.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.11.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.12.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.06.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.08.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.09.2006 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2006/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2005 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   20.10.2005 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US705319 (BUSH HIRAM T [US]) [X] 1-8,10-18 * the whole document *; | [X]US1785198 (KELSO HOWARD F) [X] 1-11,13-18 * page 1, line 56 - page 2, line 54; figures 1,2 *; | [XY]JPH08120740 ; | [XY]US6145138 (NAKAMURA KENICHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-8,10,12,14,18-20 * the whole document * [Y] 21-23,25-30,32-39; | [X]US4197599 (TSAI KUO L [TW]) [X] 1-8,18-20 * column 2, line 14 - column 3, line 2; figures 1,3 *; | [X]GB504872 (TWYFORDS LTD, et al) [X] 1-6,10-12 * the whole document *; | [X]US5926863 (ARITA KINYA [JP], et al) [X] 1-8,14,18,19,21,22,24-27,31,32,34-36,38,39 * column 4, line 15 - column 10, line 14; figure 4 *; | [X]US6115853 (SHIBATA SHINJI [JP], et al) [X] 1-8,18-22,24-36,38,39 * page 38, line 33 - line 67; figures 32,33 *; | [X]EP0747545 (AMERICAN STANDARD INC [US]) [X] 1-6 * column 2, line 55 - column 4, line 30; figure 5 *; | [X]US4246666 (STANSBURY JR BENJAMIN H) [X] 1 * column 4, line 32 - column 5, line 10; figure 6 *; | [X]WO9531617 (MERLIN SERVICES PTY LTD [AU], et al) [X] 1 * the whole document *; | [X]US5502845 (HAYASHI RYOSUKE [JP], et al) [X] 21,22,25-36,38,39 * abstract *; | [X]US1928717 (CAMPUS CESARE C) [X] 21,22,25-36,38,39 * figure 4 *; | [E]WO03014483 (CAROMA IND LTD [AU], et al) [E] 21,22,25-27,32-36,38,39 * page 5, line 13 - line 27; figure 1 * | [XY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960930), vol. 1996, no. 09, & JP08120740 A 19960514 (INAX CORP) [X] 1-8,11,12,14,15,18 * abstract * [Y] 21-23,25-30,32-39 |