|
08.04.2022 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
28 |
|
08.04.2022 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.02.2022 |
F3004 Communication of the Registry |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.12.2021 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.12.2021 |
F3314 Oral proceedings: Minutes (ex parte) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
26.10.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.10.2021 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 07 |
Appeal |
6 |
|
26.10.2021 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 07 |
Appeal |
6 |
|
26.10.2021 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 08 |
Appeal |
6 |
|
26.10.2021 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 08 |
Appeal |
6 |
|
26.10.2021 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 09 |
Appeal |
6 |
|
26.10.2021 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 09 |
Appeal |
6 |
|
26.10.2021 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 10 |
Appeal |
9 |
|
26.10.2021 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 10 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.10.2021 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 11 |
Appeal |
9 |
|
26.10.2021 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 11 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.10.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.10.2021 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
15.09.2021 |
Communication from Registry of the Enlarged Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.09.2021 |
Communication from Registry of the Enlarged Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.09.2021 |
Decision of the Enlarged Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.09.2021 |
Decision of the Enlarged Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.05.2021 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.05.2021 |
F3011.2 Oral Proceedings: Summons VICO |
Appeal |
8 |
|
04.05.2021 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
5 |
|
29.04.2021 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.03.2021 |
Communication from Registry of the Enlarged Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.03.2021 |
Communication from Registry of the Enlarged Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.03.2021 |
Communication of the Enlarged Board of Appeal during review procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
10.03.2021 |
Decision of the Enlarged Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
68 |
|
10.03.2021 |
Decision of the Enlarged Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
68 |
|
07.09.2020 |
F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.09.2020 |
F3303.17 Change of the composition of the Board (T), in case Chairman is a legal member |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.07.2020 |
Communication from Registry of the Enlarged Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.07.2020 |
Communication from Registry of the Enlarged Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.07.2020 |
Communication from Registry of the Enlarged Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.07.2020 |
Communication from Registry of the Enlarged Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.07.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.07.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.07.2020 |
amicus curiae |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.07.2020 |
F3314 Oral proceedings: Minutes (ex parte) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.07.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.07.2020 |
Communication from Registry of the Enlarged Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.07.2020 |
Incoming letter in referral procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.07.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.07.2020 |
Communication from Registry of the Enlarged Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.07.2020 |
Communication from Registry of the Enlarged Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.07.2020 |
amicus curiae |
Appeal |
4 |
|
30.06.2020 |
Communication from Registry of the Enlarged Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.06.2020 |
Communication from Registry of the Enlarged Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.06.2020 |
amicus curiae |
Appeal |
49 |
|
24.06.2020 |
Communication from Registry of the Enlarged Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.06.2020 |
Communication from Registry of the Enlarged Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.06.2020 |
Communication from Registry of the Enlarged Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.06.2020 |
Communication from Registry of the Enlarged Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.06.2020 |
Communication from Registry of the Enlarged Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
5 |
|
22.06.2020 |
Communication from Registry of the Enlarged Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
5 |
|
19.06.2020 |
Order from the Enlarged Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.06.2020 |
Incoming letter in referral procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.06.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.06.2020 |
Incoming letter in referral procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.06.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.06.2020 |
Communication from Registry of the Enlarged Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
3 |
|
10.06.2020 |
Communication from Registry of the Enlarged Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
3 |
|
20.05.2020 |
Incoming letter in referral procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.04.2020 |
Communication from Registry of the Enlarged Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
3 |
|
09.04.2020 |
Communication from Registry of the Enlarged Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.04.2020 |
Communication from Registry of the Enlarged Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.04.2020 |
Communication from Registry of the Enlarged Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.04.2020 |
F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.04.2020 |
Order from the Enlarged Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.04.2020 |
amicus curiae |
Appeal |
28 |
|
06.11.2019 |
Communication from Registry of the Enlarged Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.11.2019 |
Communication from Registry of the Enlarged Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.11.2019 |
Communication from Registry of the Enlarged Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.11.2019 |
Communication from Registry of the Enlarged Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.11.2019 |
Communication from Registry of the Enlarged Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.11.2019 |
Communication from Registry of the Enlarged Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.09.2019 |
amicus curiae |
Appeal |
5 |
|
11.09.2019 |
Order from the Enlarged Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.09.2019 |
amicus curiae |
Appeal |
11 |
|
02.09.2019 |
amicus curiae |
Appeal |
10 |
|
01.09.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.09.2019 |
Incoming letter in referral procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
01.09.2019 |
Incoming letter in referral procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
01.09.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.09.2019 |
amicus curiae |
Appeal |
4 |
|
01.09.2019 |
amicus curiae |
Appeal |
24 |
|
01.09.2019 |
amicus curiae |
Appeal |
5 |
|
01.09.2019 |
amicus curiae |
Appeal |
7 |
|
01.09.2019 |
amicus curiae |
Appeal |
22 |
|
01.09.2019 |
amicus curiae |
Appeal |
4 |
|
30.08.2019 |
amicus curiae |
Appeal |
8 |
|
30.08.2019 |
amicus curiae |
Appeal |
8 |
|
30.08.2019 |
amicus curiae |
Appeal |
15 |
|
30.08.2019 |
amicus curiae |
Appeal |
8 |
|
29.08.2019 |
Incoming letter in referral procedure |
Appeal |
17 |
|
29.08.2019 |
amicus curiae |
Appeal |
6 |
|
28.08.2019 |
amicus curiae |
Appeal |
5 |
|
28.08.2019 |
amicus curiae |
Appeal |
8 |
|
27.08.2019 |
amicus curiae |
Appeal |
13 |
|
22.08.2019 |
amicus curiae |
Appeal |
10 |
|
22.08.2019 |
amicus curiae |
Appeal |
5 |
|
21.08.2019 |
amicus curiae |
Appeal |
17 |
|
18.08.2019 |
amicus curiae |
Appeal |
3 |
|
16.08.2019 |
amicus curiae |
Appeal |
13 |
|
07.08.2019 |
amicus curiae |
Appeal |
6 |
|
05.06.2019 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.06.2019 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Appeal |
2 |
|
31.05.2019 |
Communication of the Enlarged Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.05.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.05.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.05.2019 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.05.2019 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.05.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.05.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.05.2019 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.05.2019 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.05.2019 |
Communication of the Enlarged Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.05.2019 |
Communication of the Enlarged Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.04.2019 |
Order from the Enlarged Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.04.2019 |
Indication of deficiencies in a request for registering a transfer of rights and invitation to correct them |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.04.2019 |
Indication of deficiencies in a request for registering a transfer of rights and invitation to correct them |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.04.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.04.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.04.2019 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Appeal |
5 |
|
02.04.2019 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Appeal |
5 |
|
02.04.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.04.2019 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.04.2019 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.03.2019 |
Order from the Enlarged Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.03.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.02.2019 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
48 |
|
28.02.2019 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
48 |
|
28.02.2019 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.01.2019 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.01.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.01.2019 |
General enquiry |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.01.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.06.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.06.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.06.2018 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
18.06.2018 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.06.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.06.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.06.2018 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.04.2018 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.04.2018 |
F3314 Oral proceedings: Minutes (ex parte) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
09.04.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.04.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.04.2018 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.04.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.04.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.04.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.04.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.04.2018 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.04.2018 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.04.2018 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
09.03.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.03.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
21 |
|
09.03.2018 |
Claims |
Appeal |
18 |
|
09.03.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.03.2018 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
22.12.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.12.2017 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.12.2017 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
7 |
|
13.12.2017 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.11.2017 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.08.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.08.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.08.2017 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's name |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.08.2017 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's name |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.08.2017 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's name |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.08.2017 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's name |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.08.2017 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's name |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.08.2017 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's name |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
14.08.2017 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's name |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.07.2017 |
Extension of time limit granted |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.06.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.06.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.06.2017 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.04.2017 |
Indication of deficiencies in a request for registering a transfer of rights and invitation to correct them |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.03.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.03.2017 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.03.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.03.2017 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.03.2016 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.03.2016 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.11.2015 |
Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.10.2015 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.09.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.09.2015 |
General enquiry |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.09.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.03.2014 |
F3303.14 Composition of the Board (T), in case Chairman is a legal member |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.03.2014 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.01.2014 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.01.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.01.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
6 |
|
06.01.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
6 |
|
06.01.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
6 |
|
06.01.2014 |
Claims |
Appeal |
6 |
|
06.01.2014 |
Claims |
Appeal |
6 |
|
06.01.2014 |
Claims |
Appeal |
6 |
|
06.01.2014 |
Description |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.01.2014 |
Description |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.01.2014 |
Description |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.01.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.01.2014 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.01.2014 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
8 |
|
05.11.2013 |
Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.11.2013 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.11.2013 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.11.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.11.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
04.11.2013 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
30.08.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.08.2013 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.08.2013 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.08.2013 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.08.2013 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
26.08.2013 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.08.2013 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
23.08.2013 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
23.08.2013 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.08.2013 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.08.2013 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.08.2013 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.03.2013 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.03.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.03.2013 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
27.03.2013 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
27.03.2013 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
27.03.2013 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
27.03.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.03.2013 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
23.11.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.11.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.11.2012 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
20.11.2012 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.11.2012 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.10.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.10.2012 |
Enquiry as to when a communication from the Examining Division can be expected |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.10.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.10.2012 |
Transmittal of third party observations to applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.11.2011 |
Non-patent literature filed by a third party |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
15.11.2011 |
Non-patent literature filed by a third party |
Search / examination |
19 |
|
15.11.2011 |
Non-patent literature filed by a third party |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
15.11.2011 |
Non-patent literature filed by a third party |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
15.11.2011 |
Non-patent literature filed by a third party |
Search / examination |
22 |
|
15.11.2011 |
Non-patent literature filed by a third party |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
15.11.2011 |
Non-patent literature filed by a third party |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
15.11.2011 |
Non-patent literature filed by a third party |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
15.11.2011 |
Non-patent literature filed by a third party |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
15.11.2011 |
Non-patent literature filed by a third party |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
15.11.2011 |
Non-patent literature filed by a third party |
Search / examination |
51 |
|
15.11.2011 |
Reply to communication to third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.11.2011 |
Reply to communication to third party |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
26.10.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.10.2011 |
Enquiry as to when a communication from the Examining Division can be expected |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.10.2011 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.10.2011 |
Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.10.2011 |
Decision to allow further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.09.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.09.2011 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
30.09.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
30.09.2011 |
Description |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
30.09.2011 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.09.2011 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
30.09.2011 |
Request for further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.09.2011 |
Refusal of request for extension of time limit |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.09.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.09.2011 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.09.2011 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.07.2011 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.07.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.07.2011 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.07.2011 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.03.2011 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
09.03.2011 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
09.03.2011 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
24 |
|
09.03.2011 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
09.03.2011 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.12.2010 |
Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.11.2010 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.11.2010 |
Enquiry as to when a communication from the Examining Division can be expected |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.11.2010 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.06.2010 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.06.2010 |
Enquiry as to when a communication from the Examining Division can be expected |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.06.2010 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.11.2008 |
Decision to allow further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.11.2008 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.11.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
14.11.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
14.11.2008 |
Description |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
14.11.2008 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.11.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
14.11.2008 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
14.11.2008 |
Request for further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.10.2008 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.08.2008 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.08.2008 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.08.2008 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.08.2008 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.04.2008 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
07.04.2008 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.03.2008 |
Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.01.2008 |
Enquiry as to when a communication from the Examining Division can be expected |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.12.2007 |
Communication concerning signing of documents |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.12.2007 |
Enquiry as to when a communication from the Examining Division can be expected |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.11.2006 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.11.2006 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.11.2006 |
Request for change of representative |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
03.11.2006 |
Request for change of representative |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
02.11.2006 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.06.2005 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
01.06.2005 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.05.2005 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
27.05.2005 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.05.2005 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.05.2005 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.04.2005 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.03.2005 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.03.2005 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
21.01.2005 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
03.01.2005 |
Annexes to the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
03.01.2005 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
30.11.2004 |
Annex to International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
9 |
|
30.11.2004 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
30.11.2004 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
30.11.2004 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
5 |
|
30.11.2004 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
5 |
|
30.11.2004 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
30.11.2004 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
30.11.2004 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
30.11.2004 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
08.10.2004 |
Claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
10 |
|
08.10.2004 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
9 |
|
08.10.2004 |
Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
6 |
|
05.10.2004 |
Claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
10 |
|
05.10.2004 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
9 |
|
05.10.2004 |
Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
6 |
|
10.09.2004 |
Grant of extension of time limit |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
06.09.2004 |
Request for extension of time limit |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
03.09.2004 |
Request for extension of time limit |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
10.08.2004 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
30.07.2004 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.07.2004 |
Written opinion |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
05.07.2004 |
Written opinion - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
05.07.2004 |
Written opinion - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
16.06.2004 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
14.06.2004 |
Invitation to pay prescribed fees together with late payment fee (Rule 58bis PCT) |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
14.06.2004 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
11.06.2004 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
111 |
|
10.06.2004 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
10.06.2004 |
International publication of the international search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.06.2004 |
Invitation to pay prescribed fees together with late payment fee (Rule 58bis PCT) |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
05.04.2004 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
05.04.2004 |
Notification of receipt of demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
24.03.2004 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
24.03.2004 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
18.03.2004 |
Published international application - A2 |
Search / examination |
116 |
|
13.11.2003 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
13.11.2003 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
8 |
|
13.11.2003 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
76 |
|
13.11.2003 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
31 |
|
09.09.2003 |
Abstract |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
09.09.2003 |
Annex |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
09.09.2003 |
Claims |
PCT receiving Office |
8 |
|
09.09.2003 |
Description |
PCT receiving Office |
76 |
|
09.09.2003 |
Drawings |
PCT receiving Office |
31 |