|
11.07.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.07.2014 |
Closing of application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.07.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.07.2014 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
18 |
|
08.07.2014 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.04.2014 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
3 |
|
11.03.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.03.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.03.2014 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.02.2014 |
Submission concerning representation |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.01.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
4 |
|
21.01.2014 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
21.01.2014 |
Description |
Appeal |
4 |
|
21.01.2014 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
20.12.2013 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.12.2013 |
Submission concerning representation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.12.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.12.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.11.2013 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.11.2013 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
4 |
|
25.11.2013 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.11.2013 |
F3313 Order: change of Board due to the technical aspects of the appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.10.2012 |
F3004 Communication of the Registry |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.09.2012 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.02.2012 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.07.2011 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.07.2011 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
30.06.2011 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
5 |
|
30.06.2011 |
Claims |
Appeal |
5 |
|
30.06.2011 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
30.06.2011 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
30.06.2011 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
15 |
|
21.04.2011 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
21.04.2011 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.03.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.03.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.03.2011 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
08.03.2011 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.03.2011 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.03.2011 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.03.2011 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
24 |
|
08.03.2011 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.03.2011 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.03.2011 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.03.2011 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.03.2011 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.02.2011 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.02.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.02.2011 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
19 |
|
15.02.2011 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.02.2011 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.02.2011 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.02.2011 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.02.2011 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.02.2011 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.02.2011 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.01.2011 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
11.01.2011 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
11.01.2011 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
11.01.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
11.01.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
11.01.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.01.2011 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
16.10.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.10.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.10.2010 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
21 |
|
11.10.2010 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.10.2010 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.08.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.08.2010 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.08.2010 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
12 |
|
02.08.2010 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
22.07.2010 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
10 |
|
05.02.2010 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.07.2009 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.12.2008 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.11.2008 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.11.2008 |
Claims |
Appeal |
5 |
|
10.11.2008 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
10.11.2008 |
Claims |
Appeal |
5 |
|
10.11.2008 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
20 |
|
26.07.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.07.2008 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.07.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.07.2008 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
18.07.2008 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
18.07.2008 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
18.07.2008 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
18.07.2008 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.07.2008 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.07.2008 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
18.07.2008 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.07.2008 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.07.2008 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.07.2008 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.07.2008 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.05.2008 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
06.05.2008 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
06.05.2008 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
06.05.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
06.05.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
06.05.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
06.05.2008 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
10.04.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.04.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.03.2008 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
31.03.2008 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.03.2008 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.05.2007 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.05.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.05.2007 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
28.03.2007 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
28.03.2007 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.11.2006 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
03.11.2006 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
03.11.2006 |
Description |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
03.11.2006 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
11.08.2006 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
11.08.2006 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.04.2006 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
10.04.2006 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
10.04.2006 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
20.12.2005 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
20.12.2005 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.11.2005 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.10.2005 |
Request for change of name |
Search / examination |
59 |
|
27.04.2005 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.04.2005 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.04.2005 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.03.2005 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
29.03.2005 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
21.01.2005 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
02.09.2004 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.09.2004 |
International publication of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.05.2004 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
38 |
|
14.05.2004 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
89 |
|
14.05.2004 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
30 |
|
14.05.2004 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
50 |
|
14.05.2004 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
39 |
|
02.04.2004 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
02.04.2004 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.03.2004 |
Published international application - A2 |
Search / examination |
43 |
|
18.03.2004 |
Submission concerning representation |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
21.11.2003 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
21.11.2003 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
8 |
|
21.11.2003 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
23 |
|
21.11.2003 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
10 |