|
18.02.2020 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.02.2020 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.02.2020 |
Refund of fees |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.02.2020 |
F3324 Closure of the appeal proceedings: withdrawal of the appeal/ application/ opposition |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.01.2020 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.01.2020 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.01.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.01.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.01.2020 |
Withdrawal of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.01.2020 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.01.2020 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.12.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.12.2019 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.12.2019 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
24.12.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.12.2019 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
17.12.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.12.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.12.2019 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.10.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.10.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.10.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.10.2019 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.10.2019 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.10.2019 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
7 |
|
17.10.2019 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.10.2019 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.10.2019 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
30 |
|
17.10.2019 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.10.2019 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.10.2019 |
Means of redress |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.10.2019 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.10.2019 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.10.2019 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.10.2019 |
Minutes of the taking of evidence |
Opposition |
150 |
|
17.10.2019 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.10.2019 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
17.10.2019 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
03.07.2019 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.06.2019 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.06.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.06.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.06.2019 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.05.2019 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.05.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.05.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.05.2019 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.05.2019 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.05.2019 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
32 |
|
09.05.2019 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.05.2019 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.05.2019 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
31 |
|
01.05.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
01.05.2019 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
47 |
|
01.05.2019 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
10 |
|
01.05.2019 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
01.05.2019 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.05.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
01.05.2019 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
5 |
|
29.04.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.04.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.04.2019 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.03.2019 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.03.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.03.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.03.2019 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.03.2019 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.03.2019 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
13.03.2019 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.03.2019 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.03.2019 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.03.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.03.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.03.2019 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.02.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.02.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.02.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.02.2019 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.02.2019 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.02.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.02.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.02.2019 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.01.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.01.2019 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.01.2019 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.01.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.01.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.01.2019 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.01.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.01.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.01.2019 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.01.2019 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.12.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.12.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.12.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.12.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.12.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.12.2018 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.12.2018 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.12.2018 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.12.2018 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.12.2018 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
18 |
|
14.12.2018 |
Decision on the taking of evidence |
Opposition |
6 |
|
14.12.2018 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
14.12.2018 |
Settlement of expenses for witnesses and experts |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.12.2018 |
Settlement of expenses for witnesses and experts |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.12.2018 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.12.2018 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.12.2018 |
Summons to give evidence |
Opposition |
4 |
|
15.03.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.03.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.03.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.03.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.02.2018 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
17 |
|
20.02.2018 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.02.2018 |
Refund of fees |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.01.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.01.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.01.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.01.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.01.2018 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.01.2018 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.01.2018 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.01.2018 |
F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.12.2017 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.12.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.12.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.12.2017 |
Withdrawal of a request for oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.12.2017 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.12.2017 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.12.2017 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.12.2017 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.12.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.12.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.12.2017 |
Withdrawal of a request for oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.12.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.12.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.12.2017 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.12.2017 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.12.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.12.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.12.2017 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.11.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.11.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.11.2017 |
Communication about missing proof of delivery |
Appeal |
3 |
|
02.11.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
30.10.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.10.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.10.2017 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
4 |
|
18.10.2017 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
13.10.2017 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.03.2017 |
F3004 Communication of the Registry |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.03.2017 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.02.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.02.2017 |
General enquiry |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.02.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.12.2016 |
F3303.17 Change of the composition of the Board (T), in case Chairman is a legal member |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.10.2015 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.11.2014 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.11.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.11.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.11.2014 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
27.10.2014 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.10.2014 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
19.05.2014 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.05.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.05.2014 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.05.2014 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.05.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.05.2014 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
14.01.2014 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.09.2013 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.09.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.09.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.09.2013 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
21 |
|
01.07.2013 |
F3303.14 Composition of the Board (T), in case Chairman is a legal member |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.05.2013 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.05.2013 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.05.2013 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.05.2013 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.05.2013 |
Non-scannable object |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.04.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.04.2013 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
29.04.2013 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.04.2013 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
29.04.2013 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
29.04.2013 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
29.04.2013 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
29.04.2013 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
16 |
|
29.04.2013 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
29.04.2013 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
29.04.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.04.2013 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.04.2013 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
47 |
|
24.04.2013 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.04.2013 |
Non-scannable object |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.03.2013 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.03.2013 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.02.2013 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
4 |
|
09.01.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.01.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.01.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.12.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.12.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.12.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.12.2012 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
21.12.2012 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.12.2012 |
Decision rejecting the opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.12.2012 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
21.12.2012 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.12.2012 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.12.2012 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.12.2012 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.12.2012 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.12.2012 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.10.2012 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.10.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.10.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.10.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.10.2012 |
Non-scannable object |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.10.2012 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
15.10.2012 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.10.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.10.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.10.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.10.2012 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
09.10.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.10.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.10.2012 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
08.10.2012 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.10.2012 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
15 |
|
27.09.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.09.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.09.2012 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
21.09.2012 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.09.2012 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.09.2012 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.09.2012 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
21.09.2012 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.09.2012 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
21.09.2012 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.09.2012 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.09.2012 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
21.09.2012 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
21.09.2012 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
133 |
|
21.09.2012 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.09.2012 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.09.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
3 |
|
21.09.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
21.09.2012 |
Translation of the evidence during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.09.2012 |
Translation of the evidence during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.09.2012 |
Translation of the evidence during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
17 |
|
21.09.2012 |
Translation of the evidence during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
21.09.2012 |
Translation of the evidence during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.09.2012 |
Translation of the evidence during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
21.09.2012 |
Translation of the evidence during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
21.09.2012 |
Translation of the evidence during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
21.09.2012 |
Translation of the evidence during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
21.09.2012 |
Translation of the evidence during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
21.09.2012 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
28 |
|
24.08.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.08.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.08.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.08.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.08.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.08.2012 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
20.08.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.08.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.08.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.08.2012 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.08.2012 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.08.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.08.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.06.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.05.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.05.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.05.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.05.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.05.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.05.2012 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
3 |
|
15.05.2012 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
15.05.2012 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.05.2012 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.05.2012 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.04.2012 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.11.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.11.2010 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.11.2010 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.11.2010 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.11.2010 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
22.11.2010 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.11.2010 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
22.11.2010 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
22.11.2010 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
19 |
|
25.08.2010 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.07.2010 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.07.2010 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.06.2010 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.06.2010 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.06.2010 |
Non-scannable object |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.06.2010 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.06.2010 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.06.2010 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
13 |
|
16.06.2010 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.06.2010 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.06.2010 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
16.06.2010 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
16.06.2010 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.06.2010 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.06.2010 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
16.06.2010 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.06.2010 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
16.06.2010 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.06.2010 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
16.06.2010 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.06.2010 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.06.2010 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.06.2010 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.06.2010 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.06.2010 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.06.2010 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.06.2010 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
16.06.2010 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
16 |
|
16.06.2010 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
17 |
|
16.06.2010 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
7 |
|
16.06.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
16 |
|
16.06.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
16.06.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
12.11.2009 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.10.2009 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.10.2009 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.08.2009 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.05.2009 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.05.2009 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
28.05.2009 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
27.05.2009 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.05.2009 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
27.05.2009 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
27.05.2009 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.01.2009 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.01.2009 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
27.01.2009 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.01.2009 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
21 |
|
21.08.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
21.08.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
21.08.2008 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
11.04.2008 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.04.2008 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.08.2007 |
Maintenance of the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.06.2007 |
Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.06.2007 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.06.2007 |
Supplementary European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.08.2005 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.08.2005 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
13.07.2005 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.06.2005 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.03.2005 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
21.01.2005 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.07.2004 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.07.2004 |
International publication of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.06.2004 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
18.03.2004 |
Published international application - A2 |
Search / examination |
23 |