EP1572371 - CENTRIFUGE, PARTICULARLY A SEPARATOR, HAVING SOLIDS DISCHARGE NOZZLES AND WEAR PROTECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 01.11.2019 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.11.2019 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 04.12.2019 [2019/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GEA Mechanical Equipment GmbH Werner-Habig-Strasse 1 59302 Oelde / DE | [2014/43] |
Former [2008/20] | For all designated states Westfalia Separator GmbH Werner-Habig-Strasse 1 59302 Oelde / DE | ||
Former [2005/37] | For all designated states Westfalia Separator AG Werner-Habig-Strasse 1 59302 Oelde / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHULZ, Dieter Hans-Böckler-Strasse 53 59302 Oelde / DE | 02 /
LINNEMANN, Jürgen Werse 35 59269 Beckum / DE | 03 /
KLEIMANN, Anton Dorfstrasse 10 59302 Oelde / DE | [2005/37] | Representative(s) | Specht, Peter, et al Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Am Zwinger 2 33602 Bielefeld / DE | [2019/49] |
Former [2008/33] | Specht, Peter, et al Loesenbeck - Stracke - Specht - Dantz Am Zwinger 2 33602 Bielefeld / DE | ||
Former [2005/37] | Specht, Peter, et al Jöllenbecker Strasse 164 33613 Bielefeld / DE | Application number, filing date | 03795895.6 | 15.12.2003 | [2005/37] | WO2003EP14253 | Priority number, date | DE20022019551U | 16.12.2002 Original published format: DE 20219551 U | [2005/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004054719 | Date: | 01.07.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1572371 | Date: | 14.09.2005 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.07.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1572371 | Date: | 21.05.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/21] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP1572371 | Date: | 04.12.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.07.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B04B1/12, B04B1/10 | [2005/37] | CPC: |
B04B7/12 (EP,NO,US);
B04B1/10 (EP,NO,US);
B04B1/12 (EP,NO,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB, SE [2019/49] |
Former [2006/14] | AT, DE, FR, GB, SE | ||
Former [2005/37] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | ZENTRIFUGE, INSBESONDERE SEPARATOR, MIT FESTSTOFF-AUSTRITTSDÜSEN UND VERSCHLEISSSCHUTZ | [2005/37] | English: | CENTRIFUGE, PARTICULARLY A SEPARATOR, HAVING SOLIDS DISCHARGE NOZZLES AND WEAR PROTECTION | [2005/37] | French: | CENTRIFUGEUSE, EN PARTICULIER SEPARATEUR, POURVUE DE BUSES DE SORTIE POUR MATIERES SOLIDES ET D'UNE PROTECTION CONTRE L'USURE | [2005/37] | Entry into regional phase | 27.04.2005 | National basic fee paid | 27.04.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.04.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.05.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 27.04.2005 | Examination requested [2005/37] | 26.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.03.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 14.03.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
19.02.2009
27.02.2009
ADMISSIBLE Alfa Laval Corporate AB Hans Stahles väg 147 80 Tumba / SE Opponent's representative Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB, et al, et al Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2019/04] |
Former [2009/13] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
19.02.2009
Alfa Laval Corporate AB Hans Stahles väg 147 80 Tumba / SE Opponent's representative Ruschke, Hans Edvard, et al, et al Ruschke Madgwick Seide & Kollegen Postfach 86 06 29 D-81633 München / DE | deleted | Deletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ] | 27.03.2009 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 25.09.2009 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 13.11.2014 | Date of oral proceedings | 02.12.2014 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 02.12.2014 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 28.02.2019 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 10.05.2019 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 26.07.2019 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 24.10.2019 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 16.01.2015 | Appeal received No. T0117/15 | 10.04.2015 | Statement of grounds filed | 28.02.2019 | Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form | 28.02.2019 | Date of oral proceedings | 06.03.2019 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DA]US2060239 (PELTZER ALBERT) [DA] 1,29 * page 1, lines 20-23 * * page 2, lines 22-25; figures 6-9 *; | [DX]DE1861982U (KRAUSS MAFFEI AG [DE]) [DX] 1,7,18,24 * page 1, line 1 - page 2, line 7 * * page 3, lines 1-13; figure 1 *; | [YA]US3075696 (FITZSIMMONS HAROLD C) [Y] 2,3,8,9 * column 1, lines 65-70 * [A] 1,18,24; | [A]US3228598 (KEITH JR FREDERICK W) [A] 1,8,19,24,25* column 2, lines 29-49; figures 1,2 *; | [DXY]DE4105412 (KLOECKNER HUMBOLDT DEUTZ AG [DE]) [DX] 1,4,6,7,10,11,13 * column 2, line 51 - column 4, line 22; figure 4 * [Y] 2,3,8,9 | Opposition | US2698748 |