EP1561273 - METHOD FOR OPERATING A MATRIX CONVERTER AND GENERATOR WITH MATRIX CONVERTER FOR CARRYING OUT SAID METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2005/32] | METHOD FOR OPERATING A MATRIX CONVERTER AND MATRIX CONVERTER FOR CARRYING OUT SAID METHOD | ||
[2016/11] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.06.2017 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.06.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.07.2017 [2017/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states General Electric Technology GmbH Brown Boveri Strasse 7 5400 Baden / CH | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/31] | For all designated states ALSTOM Technology Ltd Brown Boveri Strasse 7 5400 Baden / CH | ||
Former [2005/32] | For all designated states Alstom Technology Ltd Brown Boveri Strasse 7 5400 Baden / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LACAZE, Alain 3 Rue de cham ps F-90850 Essert / FR | 02 /
TURRI, Sylvie 18 Ter rue du magny F-70170 Port-sur-Saone / FR | [2016/31] |
Former [2005/32] | 01 /
LACAZE, Alain 3 Rue de cham ps F-90850 Essert / FR | ||
02 /
TURRI, Sylvie 18 Ter Rue du magny F-70170 Port-sur-Saone / FR | Representative(s) | General Electric Technology GmbH Global Patent Operation - Europe Brown Boveri Strasse 7 5400 Baden / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2016/31] | General Electric Technology GmbH GE Corporate Intellectual Property Brown Boveri Strasse 7 5400 Baden / CH | Application number, filing date | 03796005.1 | 10.11.2003 | [2005/32] | WO2003EP50808 | Priority number, date | DE2002152234 | 11.11.2002 Original published format: DE 10252234 | [2005/32] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004045058 | Date: | 27.05.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1561273 | Date: | 10.08.2005 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.05.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1561273 | Date: | 03.08.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/31] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP1561273 | Date: | 14.09.2016 | [2016/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.05.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H02M5/27 | [2005/32] | CPC: |
H02M5/271 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2016/31] |
Former [2006/09] | DE, GB | ||
Former [2005/32] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM BETRIEB EINES MATRIXKONVERTERS SOWIE GENERATOR MIT MATRIXKONVERTER ZUR DURCHFüHRUNG DIESES VERFAHREN | [2016/12] | English: | METHOD FOR OPERATING A MATRIX CONVERTER AND GENERATOR WITH MATRIX CONVERTER FOR CARRYING OUT SAID METHOD | [2016/12] | French: | PROCEDE DE FONCTIONNEMENT D'UN CONVERTISSEUR MATRICIEL ET GENERATEUR AVEC CONVERTISSEUR MATRICIEL UTILISE POUR LA MISE EN OEUVRE DE CE PROCEDE | [2016/12] |
Former [2005/32] | VERFAHREN ZUM BETRIEB EINES MATRIXKONVERTERS SOWIE MATRIXKONVERTER ZUR DURCHF HRUNG DIESES VERFAHRENS | ||
Former [2005/32] | METHOD FOR OPERATING A MATRIX CONVERTER AND MATRIX CONVERTER FOR CARRYING OUT SAID METHOD | ||
Former [2005/32] | PROCEDE DE FONCTIONNEMENT D'UN CONVERTISSEUR MATRICIEL ET CONVERTISSEUR MATRICIEL UTILISE POUR LA MISE EN OEUVRE DE CE PROCEDE | Entry into regional phase | 02.05.2005 | National basic fee paid | 02.05.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.05.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.05.2005 | Examination requested [2005/32] | 04.11.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.01.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.05.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.07.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.03.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.06.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 21.06.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.06.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.11.2014 | Opposition(s) | 04.05.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 07.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 07.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 07.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 25.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 24.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DA]EP1199794 (ALSTOM SWITZERLAND LTD [CH]) [DA] 1-12 * abstract *; | [A]JP2000232785 ; | [L]EP1286455 (YASKAWA DENKI SEISAKUSHO KK [JP]) [L] 1 * column 1, line 21 - line 22 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010103), vol. 2000, no. 11, & JP2000232785 A 20000822 (KUKIHARA TAKEAKI) [A] 1-12 * abstract * |