EP1543914 - LASER WELDING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.08.2009 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.08.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.09.2009 [2009/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Futaba Industrial Co. Ltd. 1 Ochaya Hashime-cho Okazaki-shi, Aichi 444-8558 / JP | For all designated states Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi 471-8571 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/25] | For all designated states Futaba Industrial Company Ltd. 1, aza-Ochaya, Hashime-cho Okazaki-shi, Aichi 444-8558 / JP | ||
For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi 471-8571 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAKASE, Kikuo Futaba Industrial Co., Ltd. 1, Aza-ochaya, Hashime-cho Okazaki-shi, Aichi 444-8558 / JP | 02 /
OGAWA, Kenji Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi 471-8571 / JP | [2005/25] | Representative(s) | Smith, Norman Ian, et al Cleveland 40-43 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1JQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/25] | Smith, Norman Ian, et al fJ CLEVELAND 40-43 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1JQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 03797568.7 | 09.09.2003 | [2005/25] | WO2003JP11523 | Priority number, date | JP20020262864 | 09.09.2002 Original published format: JP 2002262864 | [2005/25] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004026523 | Date: | 01.04.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1543914 | Date: | 22.06.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.04.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 01.04.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B23K26/28 | [2005/25] | CPC: |
B23K26/08 (EP,US);
B23K26/082 (EP,US);
B23K26/244 (EP,US);
B23K2101/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2005/52] |
Former [2005/25] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | LASERSCHWEISSVERFAHREN | [2005/25] | English: | LASER WELDING METHOD | [2005/25] | French: | PROCEDE DE SOUDAGE LASER | [2005/25] | Entry into regional phase | 11.03.2005 | Translation filed | 14.03.2005 | National basic fee paid | 14.03.2005 | Search fee paid | 14.03.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.03.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.03.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 14.03.2005 | Examination requested [2005/25] | 14.04.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/40] | 14.05.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2009/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2008 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JPS5992189 (TOSHIBA KK); | [XP]JP2003145285 (FUTABA IND CO LTD); | [XP]JP2003290951 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) |