EP1542851 - DEVICE FOR CONTINUOUSLY PRODUCING DRIP IRRIGATION TUBES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.04.2012 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE Machines Yvonand SA Rue de l'lndustrie 5 1462 Yvonand / CH | [2011/20] |
Former [2008/21] | For all designated states THE Thomas Machines S.A. Rue de la Gare 2 bis 2108 Couvet / CH | ||
Former [2005/25] | For all designated states Kertscher, Eberhard Frezin 11 1462 Yvonand / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KERTSCHER, Eberhard Frezin 11 CH-1462 Yvonand / CH | 02 /
BERNAUER, Thomas Vy-d'Etra 23 CH-2000 Neuchâtel / CH | [2005/25] | Representative(s) | BOVARD AG Patent- und Markenanwälte Optingenstrasse 16 3013 Bern / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2005/25] | BOVARD AG - Patentanwälte Optingenstrasse 16 3000 Bern 25 / CH | Application number, filing date | 03798030.7 | 26.09.2003 | [2005/25] | WO2003CH00644 | Priority number, date | EP20020405837 | 27.09.2002 Original published format: EP 02405837 | [2005/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004028778 | Date: | 08.04.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1542851 | Date: | 22.06.2005 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.04.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1542851 | Date: | 22.06.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.04.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B29C47/02, A01G25/02 | [2005/25] | CPC: |
B29C66/83411 (EP,US);
A01G25/026 (EP,US);
B29C48/001 (EP,US);
B29C48/157 (EP,US);
B29C65/028 (EP,US);
B29C66/1122 (EP,US);
B29C66/532 (EP,US);
B29C66/61 (EP,US);
B29C66/81423 (EP,US);
B29C66/81433 (EP,US);
B29C48/0011 (EP,US);
B29C48/09 (EP,US);
B29C48/13 (EP,US);
B29C59/043 (EP,US);
B29L2023/22 (EP,US);
Y02A40/22 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/25] |
Former [2005/25] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR KONTINUIERLICHEN HERSTELLUNG VON TROPFBEWÄSSERUNGSROHREN | [2005/25] | English: | DEVICE FOR CONTINUOUSLY PRODUCING DRIP IRRIGATION TUBES | [2005/25] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE PRODUCTION CONTINUE DE TUYAUX D'IRRIGATION GOUTTE A GOUTTE | [2005/25] | Entry into regional phase | 15.03.2005 | National basic fee paid | 15.03.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.03.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.04.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 15.03.2005 | Examination requested [2005/25] | 28.01.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.05.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 11.05.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.01.2011 | Opposition(s) | 23.03.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 18.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2008 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   12.12.2008 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 22.06.2011 | DK | 22.06.2011 | EE | 22.06.2011 | FI | 22.06.2011 | HU | 22.06.2011 | IE | 22.06.2011 | NL | 22.06.2011 | RO | 22.06.2011 | SE | 22.06.2011 | SI | 22.06.2011 | SK | 22.06.2011 | BG | 22.09.2011 | GB | 26.09.2011 | LU | 26.09.2011 | BE | 30.09.2011 | MC | 30.09.2011 | PT | 24.10.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/29] | CZ | 22.06.2011 | |
DK | 22.06.2011 | ||
EE | 22.06.2011 | ||
FI | 22.06.2011 | ||
IE | 22.06.2011 | ||
NL | 22.06.2011 | ||
RO | 22.06.2011 | ||
SE | 22.06.2011 | ||
SI | 22.06.2011 | ||
SK | 22.06.2011 | ||
BG | 22.09.2011 | ||
GB | 26.09.2011 | ||
LU | 26.09.2011 | ||
BE | 30.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
PT | 24.10.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | CZ | 22.06.2011 | |
DK | 22.06.2011 | ||
EE | 22.06.2011 | ||
FI | 22.06.2011 | ||
IE | 22.06.2011 | ||
NL | 22.06.2011 | ||
RO | 22.06.2011 | ||
SE | 22.06.2011 | ||
SI | 22.06.2011 | ||
SK | 22.06.2011 | ||
GB | 26.09.2011 | ||
LU | 26.09.2011 | ||
BE | 30.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
PT | 24.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/36] | CZ | 22.06.2011 | |
DK | 22.06.2011 | ||
EE | 22.06.2011 | ||
FI | 22.06.2011 | ||
IE | 22.06.2011 | ||
NL | 22.06.2011 | ||
RO | 22.06.2011 | ||
SE | 22.06.2011 | ||
SI | 22.06.2011 | ||
SK | 22.06.2011 | ||
GB | 26.09.2011 | ||
BE | 30.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
PT | 24.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/31] | CZ | 22.06.2011 | |
DK | 22.06.2011 | ||
EE | 22.06.2011 | ||
FI | 22.06.2011 | ||
IE | 22.06.2011 | ||
NL | 22.06.2011 | ||
RO | 22.06.2011 | ||
SE | 22.06.2011 | ||
SI | 22.06.2011 | ||
SK | 22.06.2011 | ||
BE | 30.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
PT | 24.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/30] | CZ | 22.06.2011 | |
EE | 22.06.2011 | ||
FI | 22.06.2011 | ||
IE | 22.06.2011 | ||
NL | 22.06.2011 | ||
RO | 22.06.2011 | ||
SE | 22.06.2011 | ||
SI | 22.06.2011 | ||
SK | 22.06.2011 | ||
BE | 30.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
PT | 24.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/20] | CZ | 22.06.2011 | |
EE | 22.06.2011 | ||
FI | 22.06.2011 | ||
IE | 22.06.2011 | ||
NL | 22.06.2011 | ||
RO | 22.06.2011 | ||
SE | 22.06.2011 | ||
SI | 22.06.2011 | ||
SK | 22.06.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
PT | 24.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/10] | CZ | 22.06.2011 | |
EE | 22.06.2011 | ||
FI | 22.06.2011 | ||
IE | 22.06.2011 | ||
NL | 22.06.2011 | ||
RO | 22.06.2011 | ||
SE | 22.06.2011 | ||
SI | 22.06.2011 | ||
SK | 22.06.2011 | ||
PT | 24.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/09] | CZ | 22.06.2011 | |
EE | 22.06.2011 | ||
FI | 22.06.2011 | ||
IE | 22.06.2011 | ||
NL | 22.06.2011 | ||
SE | 22.06.2011 | ||
SI | 22.06.2011 | ||
PT | 24.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/08] | EE | 22.06.2011 | |
FI | 22.06.2011 | ||
IE | 22.06.2011 | ||
NL | 22.06.2011 | ||
SE | 22.06.2011 | ||
SI | 22.06.2011 | ||
Former [2012/02] | FI | 22.06.2011 | |
NL | 22.06.2011 | ||
SE | 22.06.2011 | ||
SI | 22.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/52] | FI | 22.06.2011 | |
SE | 22.06.2011 | ||
SI | 22.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | FI | 22.06.2011 | |
SE | 22.06.2011 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0480632 (NAAN IRRIGATION SYSTEMS [IL]) [A] 1-9* the whole document *; | [XY]WO9962691 (COHEN AMIR [IL]) [X] 1-3 * page 8, line 11 - page 9, line 32 * * figures 6-9 * [Y] 4-9; | [YA]WO0010378 (GIUFFRE CARMELO [IT]) [Y] 6-9 * page 15, line 8 - line 14 * [A] 1-5; | [DYA]US6280554 (LAMBERT GILLES [CH], et al) [DY] 4 * column 5, line 36 - line 44 * * figures 1,4 * [A] 1-3,5-9; | [Y]US6308902 (HUNTLEY MARK [US]) [Y] 5 * column 4, line 38 - line 46 * * figure 4 * |