EP1573389 - BACKPLANES FOR ELECTRO-OPTIC DISPLAYS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.04.2019 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.04.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.01.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.11.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 22.07.2020 [2020/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E Ink Corporation 1000 Technology Park Drive Billerica, MA 01821-4165 / US | [2017/49] |
Former [2005/37] | For all designated states E Ink Corporation 733 Concord Avenue Cambridge, MA 02138-1002 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DENIS, Kevin L. Apartment 233 6745 Old Waterloo Road Elkridge, MD 21075 / US | 02 /
DUTHALER, Gregg M. 40 Dunster Road Needham, MA 02494 / US | 03 /
ZEHNER, Robert W. 186 Walden Street Cambridge, MA 02140 / US | 04 /
KING, Matthew A. Apartment No. 12 554 Washington Street Wellesley, MA 02482 / US | 05 /
HONEYMAN, Charles, H. 19 Lee Hill Road Roslindale, MA 02131 / US | 06 /
WANG, Jianna Apartment No. 15 11 Avalon Drive Marlborough, MA 01752 / US | [2018/22] |
Former [2007/02] | 01 /
DENIS, Kevin L. Apartment 233, 6745 Old Waterloo Road Elkridge, MD 21075 / US | ||
02 /
DUTHALER, Gregg M. 40 Dunster Road Needham, MA 02494 / US | |||
03 /
ZEHNER, Robert W. 186 Walden Street Cambridge, MA 02140 / US | |||
04 /
KING, Matthew A. Apartment No. 12, 554 Washington Street Wellesley, MA 02482 / US | |||
05 /
HONEYMAN, Charles, H. 19 Lee Hill Road Roslindale, MA 02131 / US | |||
06 /
WANG, Jianna Apartment No. 15, 11 Avalon Drive Marlborough, MA 01752 / US | |||
Former [2005/37] | 01 /
DENIS, Kevin L. Apartment 233, 6745 Old Waterloo Road Elkridge, MD 21075 / US | ||
02 /
DUTHALER, Gregg M. 40 Dunster Road Needham, MA 02494 / US | |||
03 /
ZEHNER, Robert W. 7 Edith Street Arlington, MA 02474 / US | |||
04 /
KING, Matthew A. Apartment No. 12, 554 Washington Street Wellesley, MA 02482 / US | |||
05 /
HONEYMAN, Charles, H. 19 Lee Hill Road Roslindale, MA 02131 / US | |||
06 /
WANG, Jianna Apartment No. 15, 11 Avalon Drive Marlborough, MA 01752 / US | Representative(s) | Cole, David John 46 Kirkhill Gardens West Greenlees Estate Cambuslang Glasgow G72 8EZ / GB | [2018/22] |
Former [2005/37] | Cole, David John 46 Kirkhill Gardens, West Greenlees Estate Cambuslang Glasgow G72 8EZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 03799958.8 | 16.12.2003 | [2005/37] | WO2003US40257 | Priority number, date | US20020319786P | 16.12.2002 Original published format: US 319786 P | [2005/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004059378 | Date: | 15.07.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/29] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1573389 | Date: | 14.09.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.07.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1573389 | Date: | 30.05.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.09.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/1362, H01H59/00 | [2005/37] | CPC: |
H01H59/0009 (EP,US);
G02F1/1365 (KR);
G02F1/1362 (EP,US);
G02F1/167 (EP,US);
H01H59/00 (KR);
G02F1/136213 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/22] |
Former [2005/37] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | RÜCKSEITENPLATTEN FÜR ELEKTROOPTISCHE ANZEIGEN | [2017/26] | English: | BACKPLANES FOR ELECTRO-OPTIC DISPLAYS | [2005/37] | French: | PANNEAUX ARRIERE POUR AFFICHEURS ELECTRO-OPTIQUES | [2005/37] |
Former [2005/37] | RÜCKSEITEN FÜR ELEKTROOPTISCHE ANZEIGEN | Entry into regional phase | 10.06.2005 | National basic fee paid | 10.06.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.06.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.06.2005 | Examination requested [2005/37] | 10.02.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.07.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 17.08.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.07.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.10.2017 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 15.01.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.04.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 20.04.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.04.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.02.2015 | Opposition(s) | 01.03.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/19] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 17.08.2015 | Request for further processing filed | 17.08.2015 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 26.08.2015 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 01.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 02.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 05.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 04.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 02.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 02.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2009 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   01.03.2010 | 31.12.2012 | 10   M06   Fee paid on   01.04.2013 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.12.2003 | AT | 30.05.2018 | CY | 30.05.2018 | CZ | 30.05.2018 | DK | 30.05.2018 | EE | 30.05.2018 | ES | 30.05.2018 | FI | 30.05.2018 | IT | 30.05.2018 | MC | 30.05.2018 | NL | 30.05.2018 | PT | 30.05.2018 | RO | 30.05.2018 | SE | 30.05.2018 | SI | 30.05.2018 | SK | 30.05.2018 | TR | 30.05.2018 | BG | 30.08.2018 | GR | 31.08.2018 | GB | 16.12.2018 | IE | 16.12.2018 | LU | 16.12.2018 | BE | 31.12.2018 | CH | 31.12.2018 | FR | 31.12.2018 | LI | 31.12.2018 | [2020/30] |
Former [2020/27] | AT | 30.05.2018 | |
CY | 30.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
IT | 30.05.2018 | ||
MC | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PT | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
SI | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
TR | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
GB | 16.12.2018 | ||
IE | 16.12.2018 | ||
LU | 16.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
FR | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 30.05.2018 | |
CY | 30.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
IT | 30.05.2018 | ||
MC | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
SI | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
TR | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
GB | 16.12.2018 | ||
IE | 16.12.2018 | ||
LU | 16.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
FR | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AT | 30.05.2018 | |
CY | 30.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
IT | 30.05.2018 | ||
MC | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
SI | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
GB | 16.12.2018 | ||
IE | 16.12.2018 | ||
LU | 16.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
FR | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/03] | AT | 30.05.2018 | |
CY | 30.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
IT | 30.05.2018 | ||
MC | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
SI | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
GB | 16.12.2018 | ||
IE | 16.12.2018 | ||
LU | 16.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
FR | 31.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AT | 30.05.2018 | |
CY | 30.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
IT | 30.05.2018 | ||
MC | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
SI | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
IE | 16.12.2018 | ||
LU | 16.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
FR | 31.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AT | 30.05.2018 | |
CY | 30.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
IT | 30.05.2018 | ||
MC | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
SI | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
IE | 16.12.2018 | ||
LU | 16.12.2018 | ||
FR | 31.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AT | 30.05.2018 | |
CY | 30.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
IT | 30.05.2018 | ||
MC | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
SI | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
IE | 16.12.2018 | ||
LU | 16.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AT | 30.05.2018 | |
CY | 30.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
IT | 30.05.2018 | ||
MC | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
SI | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
LU | 16.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/39] | AT | 30.05.2018 | |
CY | 30.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
IT | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
SI | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
LU | 16.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 30.05.2018 | |
CY | 30.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
IT | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
SI | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AT | 30.05.2018 | |
CY | 30.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
IT | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 30.05.2018 | |
CY | 30.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | CY | 30.05.2018 | |
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | CY | 30.05.2018 | |
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/03] | CY | 30.05.2018 | |
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | CY | 30.05.2018 | |
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | CY | 30.05.2018 | |
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | ES | 30.05.2018 | |
FI | 30.05.2018 | Cited in | International search | [XY]US4681403 (TE VELDE TIES S [NL], et al) [X] 1,2,4-9,11,13 * column 1, line 16 - column 9, line 22; figures 1-3,7-12; claim - * [Y] 10; | [A]US5638946 (ZAVRACKY PAUL M [US]) [A] 1,2,11 * column 1, line 17 - column 1, line 56; figures 1-5,7,8 *; | [Y]US2002018042 (ALBERT JONATHAN D [US], et al) [Y] 10 * paragraph [0099] - paragraph [0105] *; | [A]US6392618 (KIMURA KOICHI [JP]) [A] 1,2,4-11,13 * column 1, line 31 - column 4, line 12; figures 1-3,6,8,23,31-35 *; | [A] - TAKASHI NISHIO ET AL, "CHARACTERISTIC OF MICROMECHANICAL ELECTROSTATIC SWITCH FOR ACTIVE MATRIX DISPLAYS", IEICE TRANSACTIONS ON ELECTRONICS, INSTITUTE OF ELECTRONICS INFORMATION AND COMM. ENG. TOKYO, JP, (19950901), vol. E78-C, no. 9, ISSN 0916-8524, pages 1292 - 1297, XP000545793 [A] 1,2,11 * column W * | [A] - PETERSEN K E, "DYNAMIC MICROMECHANICS ON SILICON: TECHNIQUES AND DEVICES", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON ELECTRON DEVICES, IEEE INC. NEW YORK, US, (19781001), vol. ED-25, no. 10, ISSN 0018-9383, pages 1241 - 1249, XP000572631 [A] 1,2,11 * the whole document * |