Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1556869

EP1556869 - METHOD, USE AND DEVICE CONCERNING CLADDING TUBES FOR NUCLEAR FUEL AND A FUEL ASSEMBLY FOR A NUCLEAR PRESSURE WATER REACTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  04.11.2011
Database last updated on 06.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip03.12.2019New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Westinghouse Electric Sweden AB
721 63 Västerås / SE
[2011/28]
Former [2005/30]For all designated states
Westinghouse Electric Sweden AB
721 83 Västeras / SE
Inventor(s)01 / DAHLBÄCK, Mats
Mangelgatan 13
S-724 76 Väster s / SE
02 / HALLSTADIUS, Lars
Bastugatan 12
S-724 81 Väster s / SE
 [2005/30]
Representative(s)Bjerkéns Patentbyrå KB (Stockholm)
Box 5366
102 49 Stockholm / SE
[N/P]
Former [2011/49]Israelsson, Stefan
Bjerkéns Patentbyrå KB P.O. Box 5366
102 49 Stockholm / SE
Former [2005/30]Israelsson, Stefan
Bjerkéns Patentbyra KB Östermalmsgatan 58
114 50 Stockholm / SE
Application number, filing date03809908.130.10.2003
[2005/30]
WO2003SE01685
Priority number, dateSE2002000319830.10.2002         Original published format: SE 0203198
[2005/30]
Filing languageSV
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2004040587
Date:13.05.2004
Language:EN
[2004/20]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1556869
Date:27.07.2005
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.05.2004
[2005/30]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1556869
Date:07.12.2011
Language:EN
[2011/49]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE13.05.2004
ClassificationInternational:G21C3/07, G21C21/02, C22F1/18
[2005/30]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK [2005/30]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN, VERWENDUNG UND EINRICHTUNG BEZÜGLICH MANTELRÖHREN FÜR KERNBRENNSTOFF UND EINER BRENNSTOFFBAUGRUPPE FÜR EINEN DRUCKWASSERKERNREAKTOR[2005/30]
English:METHOD, USE AND DEVICE CONCERNING CLADDING TUBES FOR NUCLEAR FUEL AND A FUEL ASSEMBLY FOR A NUCLEAR PRESSURE WATER REACTOR[2005/30]
French:PROCEDE, UTILISATION ET DISPOSITIF AYANT TRAIT AUX TUBES DE GAINAGE POUR COMBUSTIBLE NUCLEAIRE, ET ENSEMBLE A COMBUSTIBLE POUR REACTEUR NUCLEAIRE A EAU SOUS PRESSION[2005/30]
Entry into regional phase13.05.2004Translation filed 
30.03.2005National basic fee paid 
30.03.2005Designation fee(s) paid 
30.03.2005Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.04.2004Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE
30.03.2005Examination requested  [2005/30]
10.02.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.06.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.05.2011Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 05.05.2011
05.05.2011Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
01.06.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.09.2011Fee for grant paid
14.09.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  10.02.2009
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  06.09.2012  11.09.2012  ADMISSIBLE
AREVA NP
10 Rue Juliette Récamier
69456 Lyon CEDEX 06 / FR
Opponent's representative
Lavoix
2, place d'Estienne d'Orves
75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
 [2017/03]
Former [2016/33]
Opponent(s)01  06.09.2012  11.09.2012  ADMISSIBLE
AREVA NP
10 Rue Juliette Récamier
69456 Lyon CEDEX 06 / FR
Opponent's representative
Lavoix
62, rue de Bonnel
69448 Lyon Cedex 03 / FR
Former [2012/41]
Opponent(s)01  06.09.2012   
AREVA NP
10 Rue Juliette Récamier
69456 Lyon CEDEX 06 / FR
Opponent's representative
Neyret, Daniel Jean Marie
Cabinet Lavoix
2, place d'Estienne d'Orves
75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
17.10.2012Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
17.04.2013Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
28.01.2014Date of oral proceedings
05.02.2014Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02)
05.02.2014Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
20.02.2014Reply to a communication from the opposition division
16.05.2014Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
Appeal following opposition15.07.2014Appeal received No.  T1714/14
27.11.2019Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent
27.11.2019Date of oral proceedings
04.12.2019Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.10.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
26.10.2006Renewal fee patent year 04
22.10.2007Renewal fee patent year 05
20.10.2008Renewal fee patent year 06
22.10.2009Renewal fee patent year 07
19.10.2010Renewal fee patent year 08
24.10.2011Renewal fee patent year 09
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU30.10.2003
AT07.12.2011
BE07.12.2011
CY07.12.2011
CZ07.12.2011
DK07.12.2011
EE07.12.2011
FI07.12.2011
IT07.12.2011
NL07.12.2011
RO07.12.2011
SE07.12.2011
SI07.12.2011
SK07.12.2011
BG07.03.2012
GR08.03.2012
PT09.04.2012
IE30.10.2012
LU30.10.2012
CH31.10.2012
LI31.10.2012
MC31.10.2012
[2014/34]
Former [2014/27]AT07.12.2011
BE07.12.2011
CY07.12.2011
CZ07.12.2011
DK07.12.2011
EE07.12.2011
FI07.12.2011
IT07.12.2011
NL07.12.2011
RO07.12.2011
SE07.12.2011
SI07.12.2011
SK07.12.2011
BG07.03.2012
GR08.03.2012
PT09.04.2012
IE30.10.2012
LU30.10.2012
CH31.10.2012
LI31.10.2012
MC31.10.2012
Former [2013/47]AT07.12.2011
BE07.12.2011
CY07.12.2011
CZ07.12.2011
DK07.12.2011
EE07.12.2011
FI07.12.2011
IT07.12.2011
NL07.12.2011
RO07.12.2011
SE07.12.2011
SI07.12.2011
SK07.12.2011
BG07.03.2012
GR08.03.2012
PT09.04.2012
IE30.10.2012
CH31.10.2012
LI31.10.2012
MC31.10.2012
Former [2013/33]AT07.12.2011
BE07.12.2011
CY07.12.2011
CZ07.12.2011
DK07.12.2011
EE07.12.2011
FI07.12.2011
IT07.12.2011
NL07.12.2011
RO07.12.2011
SE07.12.2011
SI07.12.2011
SK07.12.2011
BG07.03.2012
GR08.03.2012
PT09.04.2012
CH31.10.2012
LI31.10.2012
MC31.10.2012
Former [2013/29]AT07.12.2011
BE07.12.2011
CY07.12.2011
CZ07.12.2011
DK07.12.2011
EE07.12.2011
FI07.12.2011
IT07.12.2011
NL07.12.2011
RO07.12.2011
SE07.12.2011
SI07.12.2011
SK07.12.2011
BG07.03.2012
GR08.03.2012
PT09.04.2012
MC31.10.2012
Former [2012/37]BE07.12.2011
CY07.12.2011
CZ07.12.2011
EE07.12.2011
NL07.12.2011
RO07.12.2011
SE07.12.2011
SI07.12.2011
SK07.12.2011
BG07.03.2012
GR08.03.2012
PT09.04.2012
Former [2012/36]BE07.12.2011
CY07.12.2011
CZ07.12.2011
EE07.12.2011
NL07.12.2011
RO07.12.2011
SE07.12.2011
SI07.12.2011
SK07.12.2011
BG07.03.2012
GR08.03.2012
Former [2012/35]BE07.12.2011
CY07.12.2011
CZ07.12.2011
EE07.12.2011
NL07.12.2011
SE07.12.2011
SI07.12.2011
BG07.03.2012
GR08.03.2012
Former [2012/34]BE07.12.2011
CY07.12.2011
CZ07.12.2011
NL07.12.2011
SE07.12.2011
SI07.12.2011
GR08.03.2012
Former [2012/30]BE07.12.2011
CY07.12.2011
NL07.12.2011
SE07.12.2011
SI07.12.2011
GR08.03.2012
Former [2012/28]CY07.12.2011
NL07.12.2011
SE07.12.2011
SI07.12.2011
GR08.03.2012
Former [2012/24]NL07.12.2011
SE07.12.2011
SI07.12.2011
GR08.03.2012
Cited inInternational search[X]EP1225243  (KOREA ATOMIC ENERGY RES [KR], et al);
 [X]EP0198570  ;
 [Y]US5648995  (MARDON JEAN-PAUL [FR], et al);
 [A]US4775428  (BUNEL GERARD [FR], et al);
 [A]WO0161062  (WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORP [US])
by applicantUS5648995
 EP0198570
 EP1225243
 EP0674800