|
30.07.2015 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.07.2015 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.07.2015 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.07.2015 |
Filing of the translation of the amended claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.07.2015 |
French translation of claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.07.2015 |
German translation of the claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.07.2015 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.05.2015 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.05.2015 |
Communication to opponent concerning maintenance |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.05.2015 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
28.04.2015 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.03.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.03.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.03.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.03.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.03.2015 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
23 |
|
10.03.2015 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.09.2014 |
Submission concerning representation |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.07.2014 |
Annex |
Appeal |
4 |
|
28.07.2014 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.07.2014 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.07.2014 |
F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
27.06.2014 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.06.2014 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
21.05.2014 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.05.2014 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.05.2014 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.05.2014 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
10 |
|
15.05.2014 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.04.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.04.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.03.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.03.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.03.2014 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.03.2014 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.03.2014 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.06.2013 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.06.2013 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
25.07.2012 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.07.2012 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
18.07.2012 |
Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.07.2012 |
Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.02.2012 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.02.2012 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.02.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.02.2012 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
9 |
|
29.12.2011 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.12.2011 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.08.2011 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.08.2011 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.08.2011 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
98 |
|
06.08.2011 |
Non-scannable object |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.08.2011 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
5 |
|
03.08.2011 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
105 |
|
29.06.2011 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.06.2011 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.06.2011 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.06.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.06.2011 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.06.2011 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.06.2011 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.06.2011 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.04.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.04.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.04.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.04.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.04.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.04.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.04.2011 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
07.04.2011 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.04.2011 |
Druckexemplar in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
37 |
|
07.04.2011 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
16 |
|
07.04.2011 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.04.2011 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.04.2011 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.04.2011 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.04.2011 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.04.2011 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.04.2011 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.04.2011 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
07.04.2011 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.01.2011 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.12.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.11.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
25.11.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
25.11.2010 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
6 |
|
24.09.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.09.2010 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.05.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.05.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.05.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.05.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.05.2010 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
06.05.2010 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
06.05.2010 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.05.2010 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.04.2010 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.12.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.12.2009 |
Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor |
Opposition |
3 |
|
28.10.2009 |
Communication of observations of the patent proprietor to opponent(s) with time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.10.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.10.2009 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.10.2009 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.10.2009 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.10.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
20.10.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
20.10.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
15 |
|
20.10.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
20.10.2009 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
8 |
|
16.10.2009 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.08.2009 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.08.2009 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.08.2009 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.06.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.06.2009 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.06.2009 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.02.2009 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.02.2009 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.01.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.01.2009 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.01.2009 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.12.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
19 |
|
18.12.2008 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
13 |
|
18.12.2008 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
18.12.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
32 |
|
18.12.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
32 |
|
18.12.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
16 |
|
18.12.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
18.12.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
18.12.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
18 |
|
23.04.2008 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.03.2008 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.02.2008 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.02.2008 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.02.2008 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.11.2007 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.11.2007 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
09.11.2007 |
|
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.11.2007 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
90 |
|
05.10.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.10.2007 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.06.2007 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
05.06.2007 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.04.2007 |
Maintenance of the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.03.2007 |
Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.03.2007 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.03.2007 |
Supplementary European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.12.2006 |
Letter concerning search matters |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.10.2005 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.07.2005 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.07.2005 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.05.2005 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.05.2005 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
24.05.2005 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
24.05.2005 |
Description |
Search / examination |
86 |
|
24.05.2005 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.05.2005 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
15.04.2005 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
06.07.2004 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
06.07.2004 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
51 |
|
06.07.2004 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
06.07.2004 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
19 |
|
10.06.2004 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.06.2004 |
Copy of the translated international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.06.2004 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
64 |