EP1581312 - MECHANICAL SEMI-AUTOMATIC TEE-UP DEVICE AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.11.2008 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.11.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.12.2008 [2008/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Jones, Donald R. 5533 Diamond Mill Road Brookville, OH 45309 / US | [2005/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2005/40] | Representative(s) | Jenkins, Peter David, et al Page White & Farrer Limited Bedford House 21A John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/40] | Jenkins, Peter David, et al PAGE WHITE & FARRER 54 Doughty Street London WC1N 2LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 03814835.9 | 16.12.2003 | [2005/40] | WO2003US39917 | Priority number, date | US20020435450P | 20.12.2002 Original published format: US 435450 P | US20030715056 | 17.11.2003 Original published format: US 715056 | [2005/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004060496 | Date: | 22.07.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/30] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1581312 | Date: | 05.10.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.07.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 07.04.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.05.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A63B57/00 | [2005/40] | CPC: |
A63B57/0006 (EP,US);
A63B2047/004 (EP,US);
A63B2225/093 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/40] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MECHANISCHE; HALBAUTOMATISCHE AUFTEE-VORRICHTUNG UND -VERFAHREN | [2005/40] | English: | MECHANICAL SEMI-AUTOMATIC TEE-UP DEVICE AND METHOD | [2005/40] | French: | DISPOSITIF MECANIQUE SEMI-AUTOMATIQUE DE MISE EN PLACE D'UNE BALLE DE GOLF SUR UN TEE ET PROCEDE ASSOCIE | [2005/40] | Entry into regional phase | 18.07.2005 | National basic fee paid | 18.07.2005 | Search fee paid | 18.07.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.07.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.07.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.07.2005 | Examination requested [2005/40] | 06.08.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2008/52] | 07.08.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2006 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   25.06.2007 | 31.12.2007 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4741537 (ADAM ALVIN R [US]) [X] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [A]US5348305 (LOWE RICHARD D [US]) [A] 5,6,10,11* column 5, line 5 - line 46; figure - *; | [X]US6106405 (FOX ROBERT [CA]) [X] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [A]WO0207827 (TEE UP PTY LTD [AU], et al) [A] 5,6,10,11 * page 9, line 5 - page 14, line 9; figures 5-10 * | International search | [X]US4741537 (ADAM ALVIN R [US]) |