|
16.11.2018 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.10.2017 |
Communication of amended entries |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.07.2017 |
Request for a change of address - opponent |
Opposition |
12 |
|
04.07.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.07.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.07.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.07.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.06.2017 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.06.2017 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.06.2017 |
Decision revoking the European Patent (patent proprietor) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
30.06.2017 |
Decision revoking the European patent (opponent) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
14.03.2017 |
Communication concerning surcharge and failure to observe time limit |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.10.2016 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.10.2016 |
Communication to opponent concerning maintenance |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.10.2016 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
29.09.2016 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.06.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.06.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.06.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.06.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.06.2016 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.06.2016 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.06.2016 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.06.2016 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.06.2016 |
Druckexemplar in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
31 |
|
15.06.2016 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
15.06.2016 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.06.2016 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.06.2016 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.06.2016 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.06.2016 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.06.2016 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.06.2016 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.05.2016 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.05.2016 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.05.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
6 |
|
02.05.2016 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
02.05.2016 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
02.05.2016 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
5 |
|
29.04.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
6 |
|
29.04.2016 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
29.04.2016 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
29.04.2016 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
5 |
|
22.04.2016 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.04.2016 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.04.2016 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.04.2016 |
Matter concerning the application |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.04.2016 |
Matter concerning the application |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.04.2016 |
Matter concerning the application |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.04.2016 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.04.2016 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.03.2016 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.08.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.08.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.08.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.08.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.08.2015 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.08.2015 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.08.2015 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.08.2015 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.08.2015 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.08.2015 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.08.2015 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.03.2015 |
Submission concerning representation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.03.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
04.03.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.03.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.02.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.02.2015 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Appeal |
18 |
|
24.02.2015 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.02.2015 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.02.2015 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
11 |
|
06.02.2015 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.02.2015 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.01.2015 |
F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
20.01.2015 |
F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
13.01.2015 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.01.2015 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.01.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.01.2015 |
F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.01.2015 |
F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.01.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.01.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.01.2015 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.12.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
6 |
|
30.12.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
6 |
|
30.12.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
6 |
|
30.12.2014 |
Claims |
Appeal |
6 |
|
30.12.2014 |
Claims |
Appeal |
6 |
|
30.12.2014 |
Claims |
Appeal |
6 |
|
30.12.2014 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
29.12.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
6 |
|
29.12.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
6 |
|
29.12.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
6 |
|
29.12.2014 |
Claims |
Appeal |
6 |
|
29.12.2014 |
Claims |
Appeal |
6 |
|
29.12.2014 |
Claims |
Appeal |
6 |
|
29.12.2014 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
18.12.2014 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.12.2014 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.12.2014 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.12.2014 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.09.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.09.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.09.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.09.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.09.2014 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
01.09.2014 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
01.09.2014 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
14 |
|
27.08.2014 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.02.2013 |
CDS Clean up - amended opponent data |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.02.2013 |
CDS Clean up - amended opponent data |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.02.2013 |
CDS Clean up - amended opponent data |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.09.2012 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.08.2012 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
28 |
|
11.06.2012 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.02.2012 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.05.2011 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.05.2011 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
12 |
|
01.03.2011 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.03.2011 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.02.2011 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.11.2010 |
F3303.14 Composition of the Board (T), in case Chairman is a legal member |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.11.2010 |
Communication concerning signing of documents |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.11.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.11.2010 |
Communication confirming withdrawal from representation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.11.2010 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.10.2010 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.10.2010 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.10.2010 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.10.2010 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.10.2010 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.10.2010 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.10.2010 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.10.2010 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.10.2010 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.10.2010 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
12 |
|
12.10.2010 |
Submission concerning representation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.10.2010 |
Submission concerning representation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.08.2010 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.08.2010 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.08.2010 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.08.2010 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
3 |
|
12.06.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.06.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.06.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.06.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.06.2010 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.06.2010 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.06.2010 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.06.2010 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
08.06.2010 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.06.2010 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.06.2010 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.06.2010 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.06.2010 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.06.2010 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.06.2010 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.05.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.04.2010 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.04.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
30.04.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
22.04.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.04.2010 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.04.2010 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
17.04.2010 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
17.04.2010 |
Description |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.04.2010 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.04.2010 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
16.04.2010 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.04.2010 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
16.04.2010 |
Description |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.04.2010 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.01.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.01.2010 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.12.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.12.2009 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.12.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.12.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.12.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.12.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.12.2009 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.12.2009 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
04.12.2009 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.12.2009 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.12.2009 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.09.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.09.2009 |
Description |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.09.2009 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
14 |
|
02.09.2009 |
Description |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.09.2009 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
14 |
|
02.07.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.07.2009 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.07.2009 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.06.2009 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.02.2009 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.02.2009 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.01.2009 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.01.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
14.01.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
14.01.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
14.01.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
110 |
|
14.01.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
14.01.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
169 |
|
14.01.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
14.01.2009 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
20 |
|
14.01.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
15 |
|
14.01.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
67 |
|
14.01.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
40 |
|
14.01.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
14.01.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
21 |
|
14.01.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
14.01.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
44 |
|
20.03.2008 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.03.2008 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.03.2008 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
01.03.2008 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
28.02.2008 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.02.2008 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
28.02.2008 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
28.02.2008 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.10.2007 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.10.2007 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
19.10.2007 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.10.2007 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
50 |
|
10.10.2007 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.10.2007 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.09.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.09.2007 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.09.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.09.2007 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.08.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
13.08.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.08.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.08.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
13.08.2007 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
13.08.2007 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
19.06.2007 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.06.2007 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.06.2007 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.02.2007 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
06.02.2007 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.10.2006 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
13.10.2006 |
Description |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.10.2006 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.10.2006 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
11.10.2006 |
Description |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.10.2006 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.08.2006 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.08.2006 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.08.2006 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.04.2006 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.04.2006 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.09.2005 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.09.2005 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.09.2005 |
Reply by International Bureau |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.09.2005 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.08.2005 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.08.2005 |
Enquiry with the International Bureau |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.07.2005 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
30.05.2005 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.08.2004 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
44 |
|
22.07.2004 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.07.2004 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
55 |
|
27.02.2004 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
27.02.2004 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
11 |
|
27.02.2004 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
32 |
|
27.02.2004 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
9 |
|
27.02.2004 |
Submission concerning representation |
International Searching Authority |
1 |