|
25.07.2014 |
Closing of application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.07.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.07.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.07.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.07.2014 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
14 |
|
18.07.2014 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.05.2014 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.05.2014 |
F3314 Oral proceedings: Minutes (ex parte) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.05.2014 |
F3314 Oral proceedings: Minutes (ex parte) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.04.2014 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.03.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.02.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.02.2014 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.02.2014 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
8 |
|
13.02.2014 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.06.2010 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.06.2010 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.05.2010 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.04.2010 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's address |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.02.2010 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.12.2009 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.11.2009 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.11.2009 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
4 |
|
03.09.2009 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.08.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.07.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.07.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.07.2009 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.07.2009 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.07.2009 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.07.2009 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
15.07.2009 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.07.2009 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.07.2009 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.07.2009 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.07.2009 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.05.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
29.05.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
29.05.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
29.05.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
29.05.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
29.05.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
29.05.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
29.05.2009 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
11.05.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.05.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.04.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.04.2009 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
06.04.2009 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.03.2009 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.03.2008 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
06.02.2008 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.01.2008 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.09.2007 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.09.2007 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.03.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
29.03.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
29.03.2007 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
12.02.2007 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.01.2007 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.11.2006 |
Final instructions (loss of partial rights) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.09.2006 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.09.2006 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.08.2006 |
Designation deemed to be withdrawn (non payment of designation fees) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.05.2006 |
Communication concerning non paid of designation fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.04.2006 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
13.04.2006 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
13.04.2006 |
Description |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
13.04.2006 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
19.12.2005 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
19.12.2005 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.10.2005 |
Letter concerning the designation and/or extension and/or validation of states |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.10.2005 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.08.2005 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.12.2004 |
Annex to European Search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.12.2004 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.12.2004 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
01.12.2004 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.11.2004 |
Letter concerning search matters |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.10.2004 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.10.2004 |
Partial European search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
24.09.2004 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
25.05.2004 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.05.2004 |
Communication regarding the Extended European Search Report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.05.2004 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.05.2004 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
06.05.2004 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.03.2004 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.03.2004 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
31.03.2004 |
Description |
Search / examination |
35 |
|
31.03.2004 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.03.2004 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
24 |
|
31.03.2004 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
6 |