EP1482322 - Apparatus and method for determining geographical location relative to a designated geographical location [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.04.2012 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 20, Yeouido-dong Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 150-721 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2010/11] | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 20, Yeouido-dong Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 150-721 / KR | ||
Former [2004/49] | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 20, Yoido-Dong, Yongdungpo-Gu Seoul / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cheon, Mun-Ki 101, 66-7, Jooam-Dong Gwachon Gyeonggi-Do / KR | [2004/49] | Representative(s) | Beyer, Andreas, et al Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/20] | Beyer, Andreas, et al Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/49] | von Hellfeld, Axel, Dr. Dipl.-Phys. Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04009613.3 | 22.04.2004 | [2004/49] | Priority number, date | KR20030034906 | 30.05.2003 Original published format: KR 2003034906 | KR20030063398 | 09.09.2003 Original published format: KR 2003063398 | [2004/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1482322 | Date: | 01.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1482322 | Date: | 09.11.2005 | [2005/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1482322 | Date: | 08.06.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.09.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G01S3/00 | [2010/50] | CPC: |
G01S3/00 (EP,US);
G01S5/0284 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2004/49] | G01S5/02, G01C21/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/49] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Ortung relativ zu einem vorbestimmten Ort. | [2004/49] | English: | Apparatus and method for determining geographical location relative to a designated geographical location | [2004/49] | French: | Dispositif et procédé pour la détermination d'une position géographique relative à une position géographique designée | [2004/49] | Examination procedure | 22.04.2004 | Examination requested [2004/49] | 28.07.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.11.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.12.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.04.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 04.04.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.07.2006 | Opposition(s) | 09.03.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.04.2004 | AT | 08.06.2011 | BE | 08.06.2011 | CY | 08.06.2011 | CZ | 08.06.2011 | DK | 08.06.2011 | EE | 08.06.2011 | FI | 08.06.2011 | NL | 08.06.2011 | PL | 08.06.2011 | RO | 08.06.2011 | SE | 08.06.2011 | SI | 08.06.2011 | SK | 08.06.2011 | TR | 08.06.2011 | BG | 08.09.2011 | GR | 09.09.2011 | ES | 19.09.2011 | PT | 10.10.2011 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/21] | AT | 08.06.2011 | |
BE | 08.06.2011 | ||
CY | 08.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 08.06.2011 | ||
DK | 08.06.2011 | ||
EE | 08.06.2011 | ||
FI | 08.06.2011 | ||
NL | 08.06.2011 | ||
PL | 08.06.2011 | ||
RO | 08.06.2011 | ||
SE | 08.06.2011 | ||
SI | 08.06.2011 | ||
SK | 08.06.2011 | ||
TR | 08.06.2011 | ||
BG | 08.09.2011 | ||
GR | 09.09.2011 | ||
ES | 19.09.2011 | ||
PT | 10.10.2011 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 08.06.2011 | |
BE | 08.06.2011 | ||
CY | 08.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 08.06.2011 | ||
DK | 08.06.2011 | ||
EE | 08.06.2011 | ||
FI | 08.06.2011 | ||
NL | 08.06.2011 | ||
PL | 08.06.2011 | ||
RO | 08.06.2011 | ||
SE | 08.06.2011 | ||
SI | 08.06.2011 | ||
SK | 08.06.2011 | ||
BG | 08.09.2011 | ||
GR | 09.09.2011 | ||
ES | 19.09.2011 | ||
PT | 10.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/31] | AT | 08.06.2011 | |
BE | 08.06.2011 | ||
CY | 08.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 08.06.2011 | ||
DK | 08.06.2011 | ||
EE | 08.06.2011 | ||
FI | 08.06.2011 | ||
NL | 08.06.2011 | ||
PL | 08.06.2011 | ||
RO | 08.06.2011 | ||
SE | 08.06.2011 | ||
SI | 08.06.2011 | ||
SK | 08.06.2011 | ||
GR | 09.09.2011 | ||
ES | 19.09.2011 | ||
PT | 10.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | AT | 08.06.2011 | |
BE | 08.06.2011 | ||
CY | 08.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 08.06.2011 | ||
EE | 08.06.2011 | ||
FI | 08.06.2011 | ||
NL | 08.06.2011 | ||
PL | 08.06.2011 | ||
RO | 08.06.2011 | ||
SE | 08.06.2011 | ||
SI | 08.06.2011 | ||
SK | 08.06.2011 | ||
GR | 09.09.2011 | ||
ES | 19.09.2011 | ||
PT | 10.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/10] | AT | 08.06.2011 | |
BE | 08.06.2011 | ||
CY | 08.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 08.06.2011 | ||
EE | 08.06.2011 | ||
FI | 08.06.2011 | ||
NL | 08.06.2011 | ||
RO | 08.06.2011 | ||
SE | 08.06.2011 | ||
SI | 08.06.2011 | ||
SK | 08.06.2011 | ||
GR | 09.09.2011 | ||
ES | 19.09.2011 | ||
PT | 10.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/09] | AT | 08.06.2011 | |
BE | 08.06.2011 | ||
CY | 08.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 08.06.2011 | ||
EE | 08.06.2011 | ||
FI | 08.06.2011 | ||
NL | 08.06.2011 | ||
SE | 08.06.2011 | ||
SI | 08.06.2011 | ||
GR | 09.09.2011 | ||
ES | 19.09.2011 | ||
PT | 10.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/05] | AT | 08.06.2011 | |
BE | 08.06.2011 | ||
CY | 08.06.2011 | ||
FI | 08.06.2011 | ||
NL | 08.06.2011 | ||
SE | 08.06.2011 | ||
SI | 08.06.2011 | ||
GR | 09.09.2011 | ||
ES | 19.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/01] | AT | 08.06.2011 | |
CY | 08.06.2011 | ||
FI | 08.06.2011 | ||
NL | 08.06.2011 | ||
SE | 08.06.2011 | ||
SI | 08.06.2011 | ||
GR | 09.09.2011 | ||
ES | 19.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/52] | AT | 08.06.2011 | |
CY | 08.06.2011 | ||
FI | 08.06.2011 | ||
SE | 08.06.2011 | ||
SI | 08.06.2011 | ||
GR | 09.09.2011 | ||
ES | 19.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | CY | 08.06.2011 | |
FI | 08.06.2011 | ||
SE | 08.06.2011 | ||
SI | 08.06.2011 | ||
GR | 09.09.2011 | ||
ES | 19.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | CY | 08.06.2011 | |
FI | 08.06.2011 | ||
SE | 08.06.2011 | ||
GR | 09.09.2011 | ||
ES | 19.09.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4512667 (DOULTON ROMM [MC], et al) [Y] 27,34 * figure 3 * * column 2, line 33 - column 3, line 3 * * column 6, line 31 - line 34 *; | [Y]US5546310 (EHDAIE SEYF-OLLAH [US], et al) [Y] 2,8-17,19,24-26,28,35-37 * figures 1,2,3a,4 * * column 1, line 66 - column 2, line 12 * * column 2, line 40 - line 43 * * column 4, line 36 - line 46 * * column 5, line 43 - column 6, line 2 *; | [X]EP0995973 (NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD [FI]) [X] 1,3-7,18,21-23,32,33 * figures 1,5b * * paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0025] * * column 10, line 46 - line 50 * * column 11, line 55 - column 12, line 2 *; | [A]WO02065151 (CHIECHANOWIECKI JEAN HERVE [ZA], et al) [A] 1-38 * figure 5 * * page 7, line 16 - page 8, line 17 *; | [A]WO02080606 (TELECOM ITALIA LAB SPA [IT], et al) [A] 1-38 * page 2, line 22 - page 3, line 5 *; | [XY]KR20030038494 (YAMAHA CORP) [X] 1,3-7,18,20-23,29-33,38 * -- US document serves as the interpretation of the Korean document -- * [Y] 2,8-17,19,24-28,34-37; | [PXY]US2003103002 (HASEBE KIYOSHI [JP], et al) [PX] 1,3-7,18,20-23,29-33,38 * figures 1-3 * * paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0025] * * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0031] *[PY] 2,8-17,19,24-28,34-37 |