EP1472984 - Control system for performing electrosurgical procedures [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2004/45] | Method and control system for performing electrosurgical procedures | ||
[2009/19] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.06.2014 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.06.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.07.2014 [2014/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Covidien AG Victor von Bruns-Strasse 19 8212 Neuhausen am Rheinfall / CH | [2007/33] |
Former [2004/45] | For all designated states Sherwood Services AG Bahnhofstrasse 29 8200 Schaffhausen / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Buysse, Steven P. 7641 Estate Circle Niwot, CO 80503 / US | 02 /
Felton, Bret 677 McClure Court Erie CO 80516 / US | 03 /
Heard, David Nichols 3620 Silver Plum Lane Boulder CO 80303 / US | 04 /
Keppel, David 911 Tulip Street Apt. C Longmont CO 80501 / US | 05 /
Podhajsky, Ronald J. 6941 Harvest Road Boulder CO 80301 / US | 06 /
Schmaltz, Dale F. 2319 Westview Road Fort Collins CO 80524 / US | 07 /
Wham, Robert H. 705 Yale Road Boulder CO 80305 / US | 08 /
Meagher, Edward C. 12 Alvord Court Greenlawn NY 11740 / US | 09 /
Lawes, Kate Ryland 2805 Palmdale Court Austin, TX 78738 / US | 10 /
Schlechter, Dave A. 9020 Rocky Canyon Road Atascadero, CA 93422 / US | 11 /
Shields, Chelsea 1125 NW 9th Ave, 323 Portland, Oregon 97209 / US | 12 /
Tetzlaff, Philip M. 2805 Palmdale Court Austin, TX 78738 / US | [2013/33] |
Former [2013/30] | 01 /
Buysse, Steven P. 7641 Estate Circle Niwot, CO 80503 / US | ||
02 /
Felton, Bret 677 McClure Court Erie CO 80516 / US | |||
03 /
Heard, David Nichols 3620 Silver Plum Lane Boulder CO 80303 / US | |||
04 /
Keppel, David 911 Tulip Street Apt. C Longmont CO 80501 / US | |||
05 /
Podhajsky, Ronald J. 6941 Harvest Road Boulder CO 80301 / US | |||
06 /
F. Schmaltz, Dale F. 2319 Westview Road Fort Collins CO 80524 / US | |||
07 /
Wham, Robert H. 705 Yale Road Boulder CO 80305 / US | |||
08 /
Meagher, Edward C. 12 Alvord Court Greenlawn NY 11740 / US | |||
09 /
Lawes, Kate Ryland 2805 Palmdale Court Austin, TX 78738 / US | |||
10 /
Schechter, Dave A. 902 Rocky Canyon Road Atascadero, CA 93422 / US | |||
11 /
Shields, Chelsea 1125 NW 9th Ave, 323 Portland, Oregon 97209 / US | |||
12 /
Tetzlaff, Philip M. 2805 Palmdale Court Austin, TX 78738 / US | |||
Former [2004/45] | 01 /
Buysse, Steven P. 741 Rider Ridge Drive Longmont CO 80501 / US | ||
02 /
Felton, Bret 677 McClure Court Erie CO 80516 / US | |||
03 /
Heard, David Nichols 3620 Silver Plum Lane Boulder CO 80303 / US | |||
04 /
Keppel, David 911 Tulip Street Apt. C Longmont CO 80501 / US | |||
05 /
Podhajsky, Ronald J. 6941 Harvest Road Boulder CO 80301 / US | |||
06 /
F. Schmaltz, Dale 2319 Westview Road Fort Collins CO 80524 / US | |||
07 /
Wham, Robert H. 705 Yale Road Boulder CO 80305 / US | |||
08 /
Meagher, Edward C. 12 Alvord Court Greenlawn NY 11740 / US | |||
09 /
Ryland Lawes, Kate 1690 Rockview Circle Superior CO 80027 / US | |||
10 /
Schechter, Dave A. 11676 Pointe View Drive Longmont CO 80503 / US | |||
11 /
Shields, Chelsea 711B Alpine Avenue Boulder CO 80304 / US | |||
12 /
Tetzlaff, Philip M. 1690 Rockview Circle Superior CO 80027 / US | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/31] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/45] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04009964.0 | 27.04.2004 | [2004/45] | Priority number, date | US20030427832 | 01.05.2003 Original published format: US 427832 | [2004/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1472984 | Date: | 03.11.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1472984 | Date: | 31.07.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/31] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP1472984 | Date: | 11.09.2013 | [2013/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.07.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61B18/12 | [2004/45] | CPC: |
A61B18/1445 (EP,US);
A61B18/1206 (EP,US);
A61B18/1442 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00404 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00601 (EP,US);
A61B2018/0063 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00702 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00726 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00791 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IE, IT [2005/29] |
Former [2004/45] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Regelungssystem zur Durchführung eines elektrochirurgischen Prozesses | [2009/19] | English: | Control system for performing electrosurgical procedures | [2009/19] | French: | Système de contrôle pour effectuer une opération électrochirurgicale | [2009/19] |
Former [2004/45] | Regelungsverfahren und System zur Durchführung eines elektrochirurgischen Prozesses | ||
Former [2004/45] | Method and control system for performing electrosurgical procedures | ||
Former [2004/45] | Procédé de contrôle et système pour effectuer une opération électrochirurgicale | Examination procedure | 14.04.2005 | Examination requested [2005/23] | 22.02.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.07.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.01.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.07.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.12.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.09.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.01.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.09.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.01.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.02.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.06.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 17.06.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.02.2007 | Opposition(s) | 02.05.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 31.07.2013 | IT | 31.07.2013 | [2014/24] |
Former [2014/12] | ES | 31.07.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5558671 (YATES DAVID C [US]) [X] 8-10,12-24,26-29,31-34 * column 6, line 33 - line 59 * * column 8, line 8 - column 10, line 18 *; | [X]US5722975 (EDWARDS STUART D [US], et al) [X] 8-10,12-24,26-34 * column 4, line 14 - line 44 * * column 5, line 66 - column 6, line 18 * * column 6, line 59 - column 7, line 24 * * column 11, line 12 - line 49 *; | [A]EP0878169 (ETHICON ENDO SURGERY INC [US]) [A] 15* column 12, line 18 - line 36 *; | [X]US2002035363 (EDWARDS STUART D [US], et al) [X] 8-10,12-34 * paragraph [0079] - paragraph [0092]; figure 9 *; | [DX]US6398779 (BUYSSE STEVEN P [US], et al) [DX] 8-29,31-34 * column 4, line 38 - line 65 * * column 6, line 66 - column 7, line 20 * * column 9, line 54 - column 12, line 53 * | Examination | WO0232333 | by applicant | WO0232333 | US6398779 |