|
09.11.2015 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.02.2015 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.04.2014 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.03.2014 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.03.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.03.2014 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.03.2014 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
06.03.2014 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
06.03.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.11.2013 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.11.2013 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
06.11.2013 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.11.2013 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
06.11.2013 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
24.10.2013 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.10.2013 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.08.2013 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.07.2013 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's name |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
18.01.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.01.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.01.2013 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
11.01.2013 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
15 |
|
12.11.2012 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
5 |
|
12.10.2012 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.10.2012 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.07.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.07.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.07.2012 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
3 |
|
24.07.2012 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
10 |
|
19.07.2012 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.04.2012 |
CDS Clean up - amended applicant details |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.04.2012 |
Request for correction |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.06.2010 |
Refund of fees |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.06.2010 |
Refund of fees |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.06.2010 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.06.2009 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.04.2009 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.04.2009 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.03.2009 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.03.2009 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.03.2009 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Appeal |
11 |
|
23.02.2009 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
43 |
|
09.12.2008 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.11.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.10.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.10.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.10.2008 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.10.2008 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.10.2008 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
22.10.2008 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.10.2008 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.10.2008 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.10.2008 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.10.2008 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.10.2008 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.09.2008 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.09.2008 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.09.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.09.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.09.2008 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
22.09.2008 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.09.2008 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.09.2008 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
22.09.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.09.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.09.2008 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.09.2008 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
22.09.2008 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.08.2008 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
20.08.2008 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
20.08.2008 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
20.08.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
20.08.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
20.08.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.08.2008 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
11.12.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.12.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.11.2007 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.11.2007 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
28.11.2007 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.11.2007 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.07.2007 |
Communication confirming withdrawal from representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.07.2007 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.07.2007 |
Request for change of representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.07.2007 |
Request for change of representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.04.2007 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
05.04.2007 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.04.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
05.04.2007 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.04.2007 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
01.12.2006 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
01.12.2006 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.06.2006 |
Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.11.2005 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.09.2005 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.12.2004 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.12.2004 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.12.2004 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
21.07.2004 |
Communication regarding the Extended European Search Report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.06.2004 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.06.2004 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.04.2004 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.04.2004 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
29.04.2004 |
Description |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
29.04.2004 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.04.2004 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
29.04.2004 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
6 |