EP1473679 - Autonomous, portable machine, for coin counting, classifying and wrapping into rolls [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.01.2006 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.01.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.03.2006 [2006/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Esparza Lozano, Rafael C/ Asturias, 1 2 A 3110 Cabezo de Torres (Murcia) / ES | [2004/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2004/45] | Representative(s) | Maldonado Jordan, Julia Linares, 7 - 3 46018 Valencia / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2004/45] | Maldonado Jordan, Julia Linares, 7 Pta. 3 46018 Valencia / ES | Application number, filing date | 04010285.7 | 29.04.2004 | [2004/45] | Priority number, date | ES20030001054 | 29.04.2003 Original published format: ES 200301054 | [2004/45] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1473679 | Date: | 03.11.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/45] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1473679 | Date: | 17.11.2004 | [2004/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.10.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G07D9/00 | [2004/45] | CPC: |
G07D3/121 (EP);
G07D3/16 (EP);
G07D9/065 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/45] | Title | German: | Tragbare, autonome Vorrichtung zum Zählen, Klassifizieren und Einwickeln von Münzen | [2004/45] | English: | Autonomous, portable machine, for coin counting, classifying and wrapping into rolls | [2004/45] | French: | Machine portable et autonome pour compter, classifier et enrouler des pièces de monnaie | [2004/45] | Examination procedure | 18.05.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/10] | 05.10.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2006/10] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4376442 (GOMEZ JIM H, et al) [A] 1* column 6, line 4 - column 21, line 13; figures 1-30 *; | [X]US4442850 (AUSTIN WARREN [US], et al) [X] 1-4 * column 2, line 55 - column 14, line 59; figures 1-12 *; | [A]US5299977 (MAZUR RICHARD A [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 4, line 4 - column 13, line 20; figures 1-18 *; | [A]US5474496 (PERKITNY JERZY [US]) [A] 1 * column 2, line 28 - column 4, line 47; figures 1-4F *; | [A]US6165063 (PERKITNY JERZY [US]) [A] 1-4 * column 4, line 44 - column 9, line 6; figures 1-9 *; | [XA]US2001034202 (NOTTINGHAM JOHN R [US], et al) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0031] - [0041]; figures 1-6 * [A] 2-4; | [XA]US2002019209 (NOTTINGHAM JOHN R [US], et al) [X] 1,2 * paragraphs [0032] - [0054]; figures 1-7 * [A] 3,4 |