EP1477673 - Leak detection in hydraulically driven membrane pump [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.06.2010 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.06.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.07.2010 [2010/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LEWA GmbH Ulmer Strasse 10 71229 Leonberg / DE | [2006/18] |
Former [2004/47] | For all designated states LEWA Herbert Ott GmbH + Co. Ulmer Strasse 10 71229 Leonberg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stritzelberger, Michael Kornstrasse 5/1 71263 Weil der Stadt / DE | [2004/47] | Representative(s) | Zeitler, Giselher, et al Zeitler Volpert Kandlbinder Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 26 02 51 80059 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/47] | Zeitler, Giselher, et al Herrnstrasse 44 80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04011110.6 | 10.05.2004 | [2004/47] | Priority number, date | DE2003122221 | 16.05.2003 Original published format: DE 10322221 | [2004/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1477673 | Date: | 17.11.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1477673 | Date: | 13.09.2006 | [2006/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1477673 | Date: | 19.08.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.08.2006 | Classification | IPC: | F04B43/00, F04B43/067 | [2004/47] | CPC: |
F04B43/067 (EP,US);
F04B43/009 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2007/20] |
Former [2004/47] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Leckageüberwachung im Hydraulikdruckraum einer Membranpumpe | [2004/47] | English: | Leak detection in hydraulically driven membrane pump | [2004/47] | French: | Détection de fuites dans une pompe à membrane à commande hydraulique | [2004/47] | Examination procedure | 08.12.2004 | Examination requested [2005/06] | 14.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.03.2007 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 21.06.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.07.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 17.04.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.07.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 02.07.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.05.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 19.04.2007 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 19.04.2007 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 19.04.2007 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 19.04.2007 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 19.04.2007 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 19.04.2007 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 19.04.2007 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 19.04.2007 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 19.04.2007 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 19.04.2007 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 19.04.2007 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 19.04.2007 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 19.04.2007 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 19.04.2007 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 19.04.2007 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 19.04.2007 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 19.04.2007 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 19.04.2007 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 19.04.2007 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 19.04.2007 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 19.04.2007 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 19.04.2007 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 19.04.2007 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5047950 (FRITSCH HORST [DE], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]DE4420863 (OTT KG LEWA [DE]) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [X]DE19826610 (BRAN & LUEBBE [DE]) [X] 1-5 * the whole document * * column 6, line 9 - line 15; figure 3 *; | [A]DE10138674 (KLEIBRINK HORST [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document * |