|
14.08.2015 |
CDS Clean up - amended opponent data |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.02.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.01.2013 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.01.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.12.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.12.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.12.2012 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
30 |
|
18.09.2012 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
6 |
|
11.08.2012 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
11.08.2012 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.08.2012 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.08.2012 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.08.2012 |
F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.08.2012 |
F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.08.2012 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.08.2012 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
13 |
|
02.08.2012 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.07.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
30.07.2012 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
30.07.2012 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
30.07.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.07.2012 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
30.07.2012 |
Main request during Opposition procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.07.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.07.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.07.2012 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.07.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.07.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.07.2012 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.06.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
30.06.2012 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.06.2012 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.06.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.06.2012 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
10 |
|
30.04.2012 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.04.2012 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
20.04.2012 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.04.2012 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.04.2012 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.04.2012 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
18.04.2012 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
18.04.2012 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.04.2012 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
17.04.2012 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
17.04.2012 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
17.04.2012 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.04.2012 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.04.2012 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
14.03.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.03.2012 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.02.2012 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.02.2012 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
3 |
|
16.02.2012 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.02.2012 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.02.2012 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.12.2011 |
F3303.14 Composition of the Board (T), in case Chairman is a legal member |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.10.2011 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.10.2011 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.10.2011 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.10.2011 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.10.2011 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
26 |
|
08.10.2011 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
12 |
|
08.10.2011 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
22 |
|
08.10.2011 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
25 |
|
06.10.2011 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
30 |
|
06.10.2011 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
90 |
|
06.10.2011 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
61 |
|
12.08.2011 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.08.2011 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.08.2011 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.08.2011 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.06.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.06.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.06.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.06.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.06.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.06.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.06.2011 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.06.2011 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.06.2011 |
Druckexemplar in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
06.06.2011 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
9 |
|
06.06.2011 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.06.2011 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.06.2011 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.06.2011 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.06.2011 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.06.2011 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.06.2011 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.05.2011 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.04.2011 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.04.2011 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
7 |
|
08.04.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
08.04.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
08.04.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
08.04.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
08.04.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
08.04.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
19 |
|
07.04.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.04.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.04.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.04.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.04.2011 |
Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.04.2011 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.04.2011 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
11 |
|
01.04.2011 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
01.04.2011 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
4 |
|
01.04.2011 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
6 |
|
01.04.2011 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
6 |
|
01.04.2011 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
6 |
|
01.04.2011 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.04.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
01.04.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
19 |
|
01.04.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
01.04.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
01.04.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.04.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
01.04.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
01.04.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
30.03.2011 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.03.2011 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
4 |
|
29.03.2011 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.02.2011 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.01.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.01.2011 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.01.2011 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.01.2011 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.01.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.01.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.01.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.01.2011 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.01.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.01.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.01.2011 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
11.01.2011 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
11.01.2011 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.01.2011 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.01.2011 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.01.2011 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.01.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.01.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.10.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.10.2010 |
Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.08.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.08.2010 |
General enquiry |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.01.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.01.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
19 |
|
23.01.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
23.01.2010 |
Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor |
Opposition |
5 |
|
20.01.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
20.01.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
19 |
|
20.01.2010 |
Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor |
Opposition |
5 |
|
20.11.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.11.2009 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.11.2009 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.11.2009 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.07.2009 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.07.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.07.2009 |
Communication of observations of the patent proprietor to opponent(s) with time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.05.2009 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
12 |
|
10.03.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.02.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.02.2009 |
Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.02.2009 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.02.2009 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.02.2009 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.01.2009 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.01.2009 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.01.2009 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.01.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.12.2008 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.12.2008 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
18 |
|
23.12.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
23.12.2008 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
23.12.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
23.12.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
23.12.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
23.12.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
22 |
|
23.12.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
23.12.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
23.12.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
24 |
|
23.12.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
23.12.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
23.12.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
23.12.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
23.12.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
23.12.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
23.12.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
23.12.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
23.12.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
16 |
|
19.12.2008 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.12.2008 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.12.2008 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.12.2008 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.12.2008 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
18 |
|
12.12.2008 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
18 |
|
12.12.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.12.2008 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
12.12.2008 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
12.12.2008 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
12.12.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
12.12.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
12.12.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
12.12.2008 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.12.2008 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.12.2008 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.02.2008 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.02.2008 |
Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.02.2008 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.01.2008 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.01.2008 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.01.2008 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.01.2008 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.01.2008 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.01.2008 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.12.2007 |
Communication confirming withdrawal from representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.12.2007 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.11.2007 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.09.2007 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.09.2007 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
25.09.2007 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.09.2007 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
25.01.2006 |
Adjournment of examination/opposition proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.10.2005 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.10.2005 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.10.2005 |
Description |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
31.10.2005 |
Description |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
31.10.2005 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.10.2005 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.07.2005 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.07.2005 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.06.2005 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.06.2005 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.06.2005 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
24.02.2005 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
24.02.2005 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.08.2004 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.08.2004 |
Refund order search fee |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.07.2004 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.07.2004 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.07.2004 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.07.2004 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.07.2004 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.07.2004 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.06.2004 |
Annex to European Search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.06.2004 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.06.2004 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.05.2004 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.05.2004 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.05.2004 |
Description |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
11.05.2004 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.05.2004 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.05.2004 |
Request for grant of a European patent (divisional application) |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
20.09.2001 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
15 |