EP1604988 - Pyridazinone derivatives, methods for producing them and their use as pharmaceuticals [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.02.2007 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.02.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.03.2007 [2007/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sanofi-Aventis Deutschland GmbH Brüningstraße 50 65929 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/50] | For all designated states Sanofi-Aventis Deutschland GmbH Brüningstrasse 50 65929 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hölder, Swen, Dr. Friedrichstrasse 12 78464 Konstanz / DE | 02 /
Müller, Günther, Dr. Im Haindell 1b 65843 Sulzbach / DE | 03 /
Schönafinger, Karl, Dr. Holunderweg 8 63755 Alzenau / DE | 04 /
Will David William, Dr. Kirchstr. 21 65830 Kriftel / DE | 05 /
Matter, Hans, Dr. Feldbergring 37 63505 Langenselbold / DE | 06 /
Bossart, Martin, Dr. Hoherodskopfstr. 2 60435 Frankfurt / DE | [2006/17] |
Former [2006/06] | 01 /
HÖLDER, Swen, Dr. Schulstr. 54 60594 Frankfurt / DE | ||
02 /
MÜLLER, Günther, Dr. Im Haindell 1b 65843 Sulzbach / DE | |||
03 /
SCHÖNAFINGER, Karl, Dr. Holunderweg 8 63755 Alzenau / DE | |||
04 /
WILL, David William, Dr. Kirchstr. 21 65830 Kriftel / DE | |||
05 /
MATTER, Hans, Dr. Feldbergring 37 63505 Langenselbold / DE | |||
06 /
BOSSART, Martin, Dr. Hoherodskopfstr. 2 60435 Frankfurt / DE | |||
Former [2005/50] | 01 /
HÖLDER, Sven, Dr. Schulstr. 54 60594 Frankfurt / DE | ||
02 /
MÜLLER, Günther, Dr. Im Haindell 1b 65843 Sulzbach / DE | |||
03 /
SCHÖNAFINGER, Karl, Dr. Holunderweg 8 63755 Alzenau / DE | |||
04 /
WILL, David William, Dr. Kirchstr. 21 65830 Kriftel / DE | |||
05 /
MATTER, Hans, Dr. Feldbergring 37 63505 Langenselbold / DE | |||
06 /
BOSSART, Martin, Dr. Hoherodskopfstr. 2 60435 Frankfurt / DE | Representative(s) | Isenbruck, Günter, et al Patentanwälte Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler PartG mbB Eastsite One Seckenheimer Landstrasse 4 68163 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/50] | Isenbruck, Günter, et al Isenbruck, Bösl, Hörschler, Wichmann, Huhn Patentanwälte Theodor-Heuss-Anlage 12 68165 Mannheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 04011734.3 | 18.05.2004 | [2005/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1604988 | Date: | 14.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.10.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C07D401/14, C07D403/04, A61K31/501, A61K31/5377, A61P3/00, A61P25/00 | [2005/50] | CPC: |
C07D401/14 (EP,US);
A61P15/00 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/02 (EP);
A61P25/16 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P3/00 (EP);
A61P3/04 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P37/04 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | [2006/34] |
Former [2005/50] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Pyridazinonderivate, Methoden, um selbige herzustellen, und ihre Verwendung als Pharmazeutika | [2005/50] | English: | Pyridazinone derivatives, methods for producing them and their use as pharmaceuticals | [2005/50] | French: | Dérivés de pyridazinone, méthodes de leur préparation et leur utilisation comme pharmaceutiques | [2005/50] | Examination procedure | 15.06.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/10] | 12.10.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2007/10] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 21.07.2006 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 21.07.2006 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 21.07.2006 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 21.07.2006 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 21.07.2006 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 21.07.2006 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 21.07.2006 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 21.07.2006 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 21.07.2006 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 21.07.2006 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 21.07.2006 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 21.07.2006 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 21.07.2006 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 21.07.2006 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 21.07.2006 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 21.07.2006 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 21.07.2006 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 21.07.2006 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 21.07.2006 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 21.07.2006 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 21.07.2006 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 21.07.2006 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 21.07.2006 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 21.07.2006 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 21.07.2006 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 21.07.2006 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 21.07.2006 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 21.07.2006 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2006 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0222605 (VERTEX PHARMA [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * claim - *; | [A]US2002119963 (SANNER MARK A [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract *; | [Y]WO02066020 (CAN FITE BIOPHARMA LTD [IL], et al) [Y] 1-15* page 4, line 1 - page 5, line 11; claims 1,20-24,45-49 * | [XY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19971225), vol. 1997, no. 12, & JP9216883 A 19970819 (FUJISAWA PHARMACEUT CO LTD) [X] 1,7-10 * abstract * [Y] 1-15 |