EP1489058 - Dielectric material and method of producing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 29.01.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.01.2016 | Refusal of application | published on 02.03.2016 [2016/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NGK SPARK PLUG CO., LTD. 14-18, Takatsuji-cho Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2004/52] | For all designated states NGK SPARK PLUG CO., LTD 14-18, Takatsuji-cho Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kozuka, Hisashi NGK Spark Plug Co. Ltd. 14-18 Takatsuji-cho Mizuho-ku, Nagoya-shi, Aichi / JP | 02 /
Yasunishi, Yuji NGK Spark Plug Co. Ltd. 14-18 Takatsuji-cho Mizuho-ku, Nagoya-shi, Aichi / JP | 03 /
Matsuda, Kiyoshi NGK Spark Plug Co. Ltd. 14-18 Takatsuji-cho Mizuho-ku, Nagoya-shi, Aichi / JP | [2004/52] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/52] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04013675.6 | 09.06.2004 | [2004/52] | Priority number, date | JP20030167047 | 11.06.2003 Original published format: JP 2003167047 | JP20040128922 | 23.04.2004 Original published format: JP 2004128922 | [2004/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1489058 | Date: | 22.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/52] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1489058 | Date: | 04.11.2009 | [2009/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.10.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C04B35/468, H01G4/12, H01P7/10, C03C14/00 | [2009/45] | CPC: |
H01G4/1227 (EP,KR,US);
H01B3/12 (KR);
C03C12/00 (EP,US);
C03C3/066 (EP,KR,US);
C04B35/462 (EP,KR,US);
C04B2235/3215 (EP,KR,US);
C04B2235/3217 (EP,KR,US);
C04B2235/3224 (EP,KR,US);
C04B2235/3262 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3284 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3298 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3409 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3418 (EP,US);
C04B2235/365 (EP,US);
C04B2235/5436 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2004/52] | C04B35/468, H01G4/12, H01P7/10 | Designated contracting states | GB [2010/27] |
Former [2004/52] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Dielektrisches Material und Verfahren zu dessen Herstellung | [2004/52] | English: | Dielectric material and method of producing the same | [2004/52] | French: | Matériau diélectrique et procédé de sa fabrication | [2004/52] | Examination procedure | 12.01.2010 | Examination requested [2010/08] | 05.05.2010 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 10.06.2010 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, HU, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 14.09.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.01.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.09.2015 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2016/09] | 17.09.2015 | Date of oral proceedings | 15.10.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2016/09] | 15.10.2015 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.09.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 01.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2015 | 12   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]JPH05319922 (NGK INSULATORS LTD) [DA] 1-8 * abstract *; | [DA]JPH05319920 (NGK INSULATORS LTD) [DA] 1-8* abstract *; | [A]US2002037804 (SUGIMOTO YASUTAKA [JP], et al) [A] 1-8 * tables 1,2 * | Examination | JP2001031470 | US6251816 |