EP1493745 - New crystalline and amorphous form of a triazolo(4,5-D)pyrimidine compound [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 16.04.2021 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.04.2021 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 19.05.2021 [2021/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AstraZeneca AB 151 85 Södertälje / SE | [2021/20] |
Former [2005/01] | For all designated states AstraZeneca AB 151 85 Södertälje / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bohlin, Martin AstraZeneca R&D Södertälje S-151 85 Södertälje / SE | 02 /
Cosgrove, Steve AstraZeneca R&D Charnwood Bakewell Road Loughborough Leicestershire LE 11 5RH / GB | 03 /
Lassen, Bo AstraZeneca R&D Södertälje S-151 85 Södertälje / SE | [2012/17] |
Former [2005/01] | 01 /
Bohlin, Martin AstraZeneca R&D Södertälje S-151 85 Södertälje / SE | ||
02 /
Cosgrove, Steve AstraZeneca R&D Charnwood Bakewell Road Loughborough Leicestershire LE 11 5RH / GB | |||
03 /
Lassen, Bo AstraZeneca R&D Södertälje S-151 85 Södertälje / SE | Representative(s) | Potter Clarkson Chapel Quarter Mount Street Nottingham NG1 6HQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/20] | Potter Clarkson The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | ||
Former [2013/44] | Bassett, Richard Simon Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | ||
Former [2012/17] | Bill, Kevin AstraZeneca Global Intellectual Property - Patents 151 85 Södertalje / SE | ||
Former [2005/01] | Bill, Kevin AstraZeneca AB, Global Intellectual Property 151 85 Sodertalje / SE | Application number, filing date | 04015299.3 | 31.05.2001 | [2005/01] | Priority number, date | GB20000013407 | 02.06.2000 Original published format: GB 0013407 | [2005/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1493745 | Date: | 05.01.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1493745 | Date: | 25.04.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/17] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP1493745 | Date: | 19.05.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.09.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C07D487/04, A61K31/519, A61P7/02, A61P9/10 | [2005/01] | CPC data not yet available | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2021/20] |
Former [2005/01] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Extension states | AL | 30.06.2004 | LT | 30.06.2004 | LV | 30.06.2004 | MK | 30.06.2004 | RO | 30.06.2004 | SI | 30.06.2004 | Title | German: | NEUE KRISTALLINE UND AMORPHE FORM EINER TRIAZOLO(4,5-D)PYRIMIDIN VERBINDUNG | [2020/43] | English: | New crystalline and amorphous form of a triazolo(4,5-D)pyrimidine compound | [2005/01] | French: | NOUVELLE FORME CRISTALLINE ET AMORPHE D'UN COMPOSE DE TRIAZOLO(4,5-D)PYRIMIDINE | [2020/43] |
Former [2005/01] | Neue kristalline und amorphe Form einer triazolo(4,5-D)pyrimidin Verbindung | ||
Former [2005/01] | Nouvelle forme cristalline et amorphe d'un compose de triazolo(4,5-D)pyrimidine | Examination procedure | 30.06.2004 | Examination requested [2005/42] | 06.05.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.11.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.12.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.06.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.10.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.01.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 30.01.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP01937109.5 / EP1289992 | Divisional application(s) | EP10182133.8 / EP2292622 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20010937109) is 03.07.2003 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
24.01.2013
05.02.2013
ADMISSIBLE Hexal AG Industriestrasse 25 83607 Holzkirchen / DE Opponent's representative Guggenberger, Christoph Hexal AG Industriestraße 25 83607 Holzkirchen / DE | [2019/12] |
Former [2019/11] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
24.01.2013
05.02.2013
ADMISSIBLE Hexal AG Industriestrasse 25 83607 Holzkirchen / DE Opponent's representative Schust, Jochen Sandoz International GmbH Industriestraße 25 83607 Holzkirchen / DE | ||
Former [2013/09] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
24.01.2013
Hexal AG Industriestrasse 25 83607 Holzkirchen / DE Opponent's representative Ellis, Robin Patrick Hexal AG Patent Department Industriestrasse 25 83607 Holzkirchen / DE | 01.03.2013 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 01.11.2013 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 20.05.2014 | Date of oral proceedings | 20.06.2014 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 20.06.2014 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 13.05.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02) | 10.06.2020 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 17.06.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02) | 09.10.2020 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 19.10.2020 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 27.01.2021 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 08.04.2021 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 15.08.2014 | Appeal received No. T1744/14 | 30.10.2014 | Statement of grounds filed | 22.11.2019 | Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form | 22.11.2019 | Date of oral proceedings | 09.12.2019 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 02.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9905143 (ASTRA PHARMA PROD [GB], et al) [X] 1-32* page 2 formula 1;; page 12, line 24 - page 13, line 24; claims 1,2 *; | [PX]WO0034283 (ASTRAZENECA UK LTD [GB], et al) [PX] 1-32 * Example 3, step I * | Opposition | WO0034283 | - Byrn, Stephen, Pharmaceutical Research, (1995), vol. 12, no. 7 |