EP1562313 - Raman optical amplifier, optical transmission system using the same, and Raman optical amplification method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.01.2008 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 24.09.2008 [2008/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/11] | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | ||
Former [2005/32] | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tanaka, Tomoto c/o Fujitsu Network Techn. Limited 9-18, Shinyokohama 3-chome, Kohoku-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 222-0033 / JP | [2005/32] | Representative(s) | Kreutzer, Ulrich, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie Lessingstrasse 6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/39] | Kreutzer, Ulrich, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie Bavariaring 26 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/32] | Kreutzer, Ulrich, Dipl.-Phys., et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie, Bavariaring 26 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04015376.9 | 30.06.2004 | [2005/32] | Priority number, date | JP20040029254 | 05.02.2004 Original published format: JP 2004029254 | [2005/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1562313 | Date: | 10.08.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1562313 | Date: | 02.11.2005 | [2005/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1562313 | Date: | 14.03.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.09.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H04B10/17, H01S3/30 | [2005/44] | CPC: |
H01S3/06754 (EP,US);
H01S3/302 (EP,US);
H04B10/2916 (EP,US);
H01S3/06712 (EP,US);
H01S3/094003 (EP,US);
H01S3/094096 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2005/32] | H04B10/17 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/27] |
Former [2005/32] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Optischer Ramanverstärker, optisches Ramanübertragungssystem und Verfahren zur optischer Ramanverstärkung | [2006/39] | English: | Raman optical amplifier, optical transmission system using the same, and Raman optical amplification method | [2005/32] | French: | Amplificateur optique Raman, système de transmission optique qui l'utilise et methode d'amplification optique Raman | [2005/32] |
Former [2005/32] | Optischer Ramanverstärker, optisches Ramansübertragungssystem und Verfassung zur optischer Ramanverstärkung | Examination procedure | 02.11.2005 | Examination requested [2005/52] | 06.12.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.05.2006 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 16.06.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.08.2006 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 18.09.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.01.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 26.01.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.12.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 08.06.2006 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 08.06.2006 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.06.2006 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 08.06.2006 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 08.06.2006 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 08.06.2006 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 08.06.2006 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 08.06.2006 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.06.2006 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 08.06.2006 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 08.06.2006 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 08.06.2006 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 08.06.2006 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.06.2006 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 08.06.2006 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 08.06.2006 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 08.06.2006 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 08.06.2006 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 08.06.2006 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 08.06.2006 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 08.06.2006 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.06.2006 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 08.06.2006 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 08.06.2006 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]WO0049721 (CORVIS CORP [US]) [X] 19 * page 6, line 1 - page 6, line 32 * * page 11, line 15 - page 13, line 5; figure 4 * [A] 1-18; | [XA]WO03017537 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al) [X] 19 * page 1, line 1 - page 1, line 4 * * page 2, line 6 - page 2, line 7 * * page 3, line 13 - page 3, line 14; figure 1 * [A] 1-18; | [A]US2003053199 (AKASAKA YOUICHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-19 * abstract *; | [A]US2003058899 (ISLAM MOHAMMED N [US]) [A] 1-19* abstract * |