|
11.06.2015 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.06.2015 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.06.2015 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.05.2015 |
English translation of the claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.05.2015 |
Filing of the translation of the amended claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.05.2015 |
French translation of claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.05.2015 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.03.2015 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the opponent (Association) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.03.2015 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.03.2015 |
Communication to opponent concerning maintenance |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.03.2015 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.03.2015 |
Druckexemplar in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
09.03.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.03.2015 |
Communication of amended entries |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.02.2015 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.01.2015 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.01.2015 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.01.2015 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.10.2014 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.09.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.09.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
30.09.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
30.09.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.09.2014 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
16 |
|
26.09.2014 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.09.2014 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.09.2014 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.09.2014 |
General enquiry |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.05.2014 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
9 |
|
23.04.2014 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.04.2014 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.04.2014 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.04.2014 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.04.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.04.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.04.2014 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
06.03.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.03.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
04.03.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.03.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.02.2014 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
9 |
|
21.02.2014 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.02.2014 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.02.2014 |
General enquiry |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.02.2014 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.02.2014 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.01.2014 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.01.2014 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.02.2012 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.02.2012 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
8 |
|
13.02.2012 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
8 |
|
14.12.2011 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.12.2011 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.11.2011 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.08.2011 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.07.2011 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
10 |
|
29.06.2011 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.06.2011 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.06.2011 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.06.2011 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.06.2011 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.06.2011 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.06.2011 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.06.2011 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.06.2011 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.06.2011 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.06.2011 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.06.2011 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.06.2011 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.06.2011 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.06.2011 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.06.2011 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.06.2011 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.06.2011 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.06.2011 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.06.2011 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.06.2011 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.04.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.04.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.04.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.04.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.04.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.04.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.04.2011 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
11.04.2011 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.04.2011 |
Druckexemplar in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
11.04.2011 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
9 |
|
11.04.2011 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.04.2011 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.04.2011 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.04.2011 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.04.2011 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.04.2011 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.04.2011 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.04.2011 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.04.2011 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
17 |
|
11.04.2011 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.04.2011 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.03.2011 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.02.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.02.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.02.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.02.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.02.2011 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
4 |
|
10.02.2011 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.02.2011 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.02.2011 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.02.2011 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.02.2011 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.02.2011 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.02.2011 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.02.2011 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
10.02.2011 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
4 |
|
09.02.2011 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.02.2011 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.02.2011 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.02.2011 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.02.2011 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.02.2011 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.02.2011 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.02.2011 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
12.01.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.01.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.01.2011 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.01.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.01.2011 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.01.2011 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.01.2011 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.01.2011 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.12.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.12.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.12.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.12.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.12.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.12.2010 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.12.2010 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.12.2010 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.12.2010 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
27.12.2010 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
27.12.2010 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.12.2010 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
27.12.2010 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
27.12.2010 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
27.12.2010 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.12.2010 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.11.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.11.2010 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
25.10.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.10.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.10.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.10.2010 |
General enquiry |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.02.2009 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.10.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.09.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.09.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
16 |
|
22.09.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
22.09.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
22.09.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.09.2008 |
Non-scannable object |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.09.2008 |
Non-scannable object |
Opposition |
32 |
|
22.09.2008 |
Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor |
Opposition |
6 |
|
19.09.2008 |
Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor |
Opposition |
6 |
|
22.08.2008 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.07.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.07.2008 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.07.2008 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.03.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.03.2008 |
Communication of observations of the patent proprietor to opponent(s) with time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.02.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.02.2008 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
22.10.2007 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.10.2007 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.09.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.09.2007 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.09.2007 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
16 |
|
11.09.2007 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.09.2007 |
Non-scannable object |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.09.2007 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
18 |
|
11.09.2007 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
11.09.2007 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
11.09.2007 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
16.11.2006 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.11.2006 |
Letter concerning the designation and/or extension and/or validation of states |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.10.2006 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.09.2006 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.09.2006 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.09.2006 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.09.2006 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.09.2006 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.09.2006 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.09.2006 |
Letter concerning the grant and printing fee |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.06.2006 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.06.2006 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
01.06.2006 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.06.2006 |
Letter concerning the designation and/or extension and/or validation of states |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.06.2006 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
07.03.2006 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.03.2006 |
Information about publication, reminder payment of designation fee, response to extended European search report, if applicable |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.02.2006 |
Request for change of address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.01.2006 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.12.2005 |
Request for change of representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.12.2005 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.12.2005 |
Request for change of representative |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
02.03.2005 |
Letter filed before dispatch of the 1st communication from the Examining Division(examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.02.2005 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.02.2005 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.02.2005 |
Modified abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.09.2004 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.09.2004 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.09.2004 |
EPO/applicant correspondence crossed |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.09.2004 |
Deficiency in designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.09.2004 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.09.2004 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.08.2004 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.08.2004 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.08.2004 |
Description |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
31.08.2004 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
31.08.2004 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
6 |