EP1513109 - Remote door lock controller for vehicles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.08.2007 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.09.2007 [2007/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HONDA MOTOR CO., LTD. 1-1, Minamiaoyama 2-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/41] | For all designated states HONDA MOTOR CO., Ltd. 1-1, Minamiaoyama 2-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | |||
Former [2005/10] | For all designated states HONDA MOTOR CO., LTD. 1-1, Minamiaoyama 2-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Asakura, Suguru K.K. Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi Saitama-ken 351-0193 / JP | 02 /
Arie, Shinichi K.K. Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi Saitama-ken 351-0193 / JP | 03 /
Sawada, Kenichi K.K. Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi Saitama-ken 351-0193 / JP | 04 /
Yamane, Katsuyasu K.K. Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi Saitama-ken 351-0193 / JP | 05 /
Yoshimura, Kentaro K.K. Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi Saitama-ken 351-0193 / JP | 06 /
Ochi, Masaaki 25-8 Higashi-kori Minamimachi Hirakata-City Osaka 573-0074 / JP | [2005/10] | Representative(s) | Herzog, Markus, et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/10] | Herzog, Markus, Dipl.-Phys. Dr., et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 86 08 20 81635 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04020925.6 | 02.09.2004 | [2005/10] | Priority number, date | JP20030310501 | 02.09.2003 Original published format: JP 2003310501 | [2005/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1513109 | Date: | 09.03.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1513109 | Date: | 11.10.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.10.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G07C9/00, E05B65/36 | [2005/10] | CPC: |
E05B81/78 (EP,US);
B60R25/245 (EP,US);
E05B81/16 (EP,US);
E05B81/54 (EP,US);
G07C9/00309 (EP,US);
E05B81/06 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2005/48] |
Former [2005/10] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Fernsteuerungsgerät für Kraftfahrzeugstürschloss | [2005/10] | English: | Remote door lock controller for vehicles | [2005/10] | French: | Dispositif de commande à distance pour serrure de porte de véhicule automobile | [2005/10] | Examination procedure | 12.05.2005 | Examination requested [2005/28] | 14.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.10.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.03.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.04.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.08.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 23.08.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.07.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2807238 (TRW INC [US]) [X] 1-8* abstract *; | [X]EP1143091 (DELPHI TECH INC [US]) [X] 1-8 * column 5, line 22 - column 6, line 11; figure - *; | [X]FR2816346 (PEUGEOT CITROEN AUTOMOBILES SA [FR]) [X] 1-8 * page 4, line 27 - page 6, line 16; figure - * | Examination | DE19635003 |