|
21.05.2012 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.05.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.04.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.04.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.04.2012 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
22 |
|
27.03.2012 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
4 |
|
07.03.2012 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.03.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.03.2012 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.03.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.03.2012 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.02.2012 |
F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.02.2012 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.01.2012 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.01.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.01.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.01.2012 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.12.2011 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.12.2011 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.12.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.12.2011 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.12.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.12.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.11.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.11.2011 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
4 |
|
22.11.2011 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.07.2010 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.07.2010 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.07.2010 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.07.2010 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.07.2010 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.07.2010 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.07.2010 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.07.2010 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.07.2010 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.07.2010 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.07.2010 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.07.2010 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.07.2010 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.07.2010 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
08.03.2010 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.03.2010 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
31 |
|
04.03.2010 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
12 |
|
03.03.2010 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
32 |
|
03.03.2010 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
12 |
|
17.02.2010 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.12.2009 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.12.2009 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.12.2009 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.12.2009 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2009 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.12.2009 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.11.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.11.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.11.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.11.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.11.2009 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.11.2009 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.11.2009 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
8 |
|
03.11.2009 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.11.2009 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.11.2009 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.11.2009 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.11.2009 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.11.2009 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.11.2009 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.11.2009 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.11.2009 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.11.2009 |
Text intended for grant |
Opposition |
21 |
|
10.09.2009 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.09.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.09.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.08.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.08.2009 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
3 |
|
11.08.2009 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
11 |
|
11.08.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
10.08.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.08.2009 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.08.2009 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
3 |
|
07.08.2009 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.08.2009 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.08.2009 |
Description |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.08.2009 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.08.2009 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
11 |
|
07.08.2009 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
4 |
|
07.08.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
22.01.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.01.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.01.2009 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.01.2009 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.01.2009 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.01.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.01.2009 |
Communication of amended entries |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.01.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.01.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.01.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.12.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.12.2008 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
3 |
|
18.12.2008 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
18.12.2008 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.12.2008 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.10.2008 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.06.2008 |
Request for change of name -opponent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.06.2008 |
Request for change of name -opponent |
Opposition |
15 |
|
04.04.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.03.2008 |
Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor |
Opposition |
5 |
|
19.03.2008 |
Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor |
Opposition |
5 |
|
22.11.2007 |
Communication of observations of the patent proprietor to opponent(s) with time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.11.2007 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.11.2007 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
30 |
|
29.10.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.10.2007 |
Request for documents |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.10.2007 |
Description |
Opposition |
3 |
|
10.10.2007 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.10.2007 |
Description |
Opposition |
3 |
|
09.10.2007 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.10.2007 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.10.2007 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.10.2007 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
01.10.2007 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
01.10.2007 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
01.10.2007 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
7 |
|
03.08.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.08.2007 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.07.2007 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.04.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.04.2007 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.03.2007 |
Request for change of representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.03.2007 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.03.2007 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.03.2007 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.02.2007 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.02.2007 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
11 |
|
14.02.2007 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
56 |
|
14.02.2007 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
48 |
|
14.02.2007 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
40 |
|
14.02.2007 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
14.02.2007 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
14.02.2007 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
51 |
|
14.02.2007 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
28 |
|
14.02.2007 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
76 |
|
14.02.2007 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
36 |
|
14.02.2007 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
51 |
|
14.02.2007 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
14.02.2007 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
14.02.2007 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
34 |
|
14.02.2007 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
14.02.2007 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
31 |
|
12.02.2007 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
12 |
|
30.03.2006 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.03.2006 |
Approval of request for amendments/corrections |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.02.2006 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.02.2006 |
Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.01.2006 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.01.2006 |
Description |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.01.2006 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.01.2006 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
16.01.2006 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
25.11.2005 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.11.2005 |
Request for change of representative |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
18.10.2005 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.10.2005 |
|
Search / examination |
5 |
|
18.10.2005 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
53 |
|
04.10.2005 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.10.2005 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.09.2005 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.09.2005 |
Description |
Search / examination |
19 |
|
07.09.2005 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.05.2005 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.05.2005 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.05.2005 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.12.2004 |
Maintenance of the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.12.2004 |
Invitation to confirm maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.12.2004 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.11.2004 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
17.11.2004 |
Refund order search fee |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.10.2004 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.10.2004 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.10.2004 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
13.10.2004 |
Modified abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.09.2004 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.09.2004 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
10.09.2004 |
Description |
Search / examination |
49 |
|
10.09.2004 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.09.2004 |
Request for grant of a European patent (divisional application) |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
08.08.2003 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
62 |
|
08.08.2003 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
29 |
|
08.08.2003 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
32 |
|
08.08.2003 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
24 |
|
08.08.2003 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
58 |