EP1522436 - Heating circuit for a motor vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 23.01.2009 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.01.2009 | Refusal of application | published on 25.02.2009 [2009/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Behr GmbH & Co. KG Mauserstrasse 3 70469 Stuttgart / DE | [2005/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Klingler, Dietrich Dipl.-Ing. Richard-Wagner-Str. 16 73540 Heubach / DE | 02 /
Schwahn, Werner Paradiesweg 23 71701 Schwieberdingen / DE | [2005/15] | Application number, filing date | 04021634.3 | 10.09.2004 | [2005/15] | Priority number, date | DE2003147676 | 09.10.2003 Original published format: DE 10347676 | [2005/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1522436 | Date: | 13.04.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1522436 | Date: | 31.05.2006 | [2006/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.04.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B60H1/00, F16L39/00 | [2006/22] | CPC: |
F16L9/18 (EP);
B60H1/00571 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2005/15] | B60H1/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR [2007/06] |
Former [2005/15] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Heizungskreislauf für ein Kraftfahrzeug | [2005/15] | English: | Heating circuit for a motor vehicle | [2005/15] | French: | Circuit de chauffage pour un véhicule à moteur | [2005/15] | Examination procedure | 30.11.2006 | Examination requested [2007/03] | 23.03.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.07.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.12.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.04.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.10.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2009/09] | 23.10.2008 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2009/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE19533553 (RASMUSSEN GMBH [DE]) [A] 6 * abstract *; | [X]US6145545 (HARTNAGEL PHILIP S [US], et al) [X] 1-8 * column 2, line 8 - column 3, line 8; figures 1-3 *; | [A]EP1128121 (CALSONIC KANSEI CORP [JP]) [A] 2-8 * abstract *; | [A]EP1128120 (CALSONIC KANSEI CORP [JP]) [A] 2-8 * abstract *; | [AP]DE102004001850 (DENSO CORP [JP]) [AP] 1-8* the whole document * | Examination | EP1433990 | by applicant | DE10012676 |