EP1637875 - A multi-frequency capacitive measurement device and a method of operating the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.08.2009 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.08.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.09.2009 [2009/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fondazione Torino Wireless Galleria San Federico 54 10121 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2006/12] | For all designated states Fondazione Torino Wireless Galleria San Federico 54 10121 Torino / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pasero, Eros Via Lavazzo 14 10131 Torino / IT | 02 /
Riccardi, Marco Via Repubblica 16 13897 Occhieppo Inf. (BI) / IT | 03 /
Meindl, Tassilo B. Via S Antonino 52 10139 Torino / IT | [2006/12] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/12] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04022196.2 | 17.09.2004 | [2006/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1637875 | Date: | 22.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.02.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G01N27/22, G01R27/26, G01W1/14 | [2006/12] | CPC: |
G01D5/2405 (EP,US);
G01R27/26 (KR);
G01N27/228 (EP,US);
G01R23/00 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/12] | Title | German: | Kapazitiver Mehrfrequenzsensor und Verfahren zur dessen Betreibung | [2006/12] | English: | A multi-frequency capacitive measurement device and a method of operating the same | [2006/12] | French: | Capteur capacitif multifréquence et procédé de commande | [2006/12] | Examination procedure | 03.08.2006 | Examination requested [2006/37] | 06.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.04.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.06.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 14.10.2008 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 20.10.2008 | 14.10.2008 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 20.10.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 20.10.2008 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 06.11.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.03.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/37] | 22.04.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2009/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3046537 (DOW JENNINGS B) [X] 1-20,25-27,30-42 * column 2, line 14 - line 34 * * column 3, line 50 - line 61 * * column 4, line 57 - line 58 *; | [A]US3873927 (OVERALL WILSON W) [A] 1-44* the whole document *; | [X]US4058766 (VOGEL RONALD F, et al) [X] 1-20,25-27,30-42 * column 1, line 67 - column 2, line 39; figure 1 * * column 3, line 4 - column 3, line 61 * * column 5, line 32 - line 40 * * column 6, line 28 - column 6, line 54 *; | [XY]US4281286 (BRIGGS DONALD E) [X] 1-20,25-42 * column 1, line 37 - line 46 * * column 1, line 62 - line 68 * * column 2, line 56 - line 65 * * column 3, line 6 - line 17 * * column 3, line 33 - line 41 * * column 3, line 50 - column 4, line 9 * * column 4, line 37 - line 61 * [Y] 21-24,43,44; | [X]US4654598 (ARULANANDAN KANDIAH [US], et al) [X] 1,26 * column 3, line 6 - line 9 * * column 9, line 45 - line 52 *; | [X]US5551288 (GERALDI JOSEPH J [US], et al) [X] 1-20,25-27,30-42 * column 3, line 48 - line 57 * * column 5, line 66 - column 6, line 18 * * column 13, line 4 - line 29 *; | [Y] - ARA N. KNAIAN, A Wireless Sensor Network for Smart Roadbeds and Intelligent Transportation Systems, MASSACHUSETTS INSTITUTE OF TECHNOLOGY, (200006), XP002313995 [Y] 21-24,43,44 * page 12 * | Examination | US4873655 | GB2359893 |