EP1517277 - Secure device and information processing unit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 08.06.2007 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.06.2007 | Withdrawal of application | published on 11.07.2007 [2007/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/12] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Minemura, Atsushi 85-1-802, Ooyaguchikita-machi Itabashi-ku Tokyo 173-0031 / JP | [2005/12] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/12] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04022462.8 | 21.09.2004 | [2005/12] | Priority number, date | JP20030329934 | 22.09.2003 Original published format: JP 2003329934 | JP20030329935 | 22.09.2003 Original published format: JP 2003329935 | JP20040168283 | 07.06.2004 Original published format: JP 2004168283 | [2005/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1517277 | Date: | 23.03.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1517277 | Date: | 25.10.2006 | [2006/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.09.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G07F7/10, G06K19/073 | [2006/43] | CPC: |
G07F7/1008 (EP,US);
G06K19/0719 (EP,US);
G06Q20/341 (EP,US);
G06Q20/346 (EP,US);
G06Q20/3576 (EP,US);
G07F7/0886 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2005/12] | G07F7/10 | Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2007/27] |
Former [2005/12] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Sichere Vorrichtung und Datenverarbeitungseinheit | [2005/12] | English: | Secure device and information processing unit | [2005/12] | French: | Dispositif sécurisé et unité de traitement de données | [2005/12] | Examination procedure | 13.04.2007 | Examination requested [2007/22] | 24.04.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.05.2007 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2007/28] | Divisional application(s) | EP07107223.5 Application withdrawn : 05.06.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 04.06.2007 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 04.06.2007 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 04.06.2007 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 04.06.2007 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 04.06.2007 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 04.06.2007 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 04.06.2007 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 04.06.2007 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 04.06.2007 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 04.06.2007 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 04.06.2007 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 04.06.2007 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 04.06.2007 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 04.06.2007 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 04.06.2007 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 04.06.2007 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 04.06.2007 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 04.06.2007 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 04.06.2007 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 04.06.2007 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 04.06.2007 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 04.06.2007 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 04.06.2007 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 04.06.2007 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 04.06.2007 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [D]JP2002345037 ; | [X]US5276311 (HENNIGE HARTMUT [GB]) [X] 1-35 * column 3, line 40 - column 7, line 26 *; | [A] - "Technology. Sony's universal remote controller using gui, detecting commander orientation with piezoelectric gyroscope", NIKKEI MEKANIKARU - NIKKEI MECHANICAL, NIKKEI MAGUROUHIRUSHA, TOKYO, JP, (19940822), ISSN 0386-3638, pages 14 - 16,4PAGESO, XP002991143 [A] 17-19,21,31 * the whole document * | [D] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20030505), vol. 2003, no. 03, & JP2002345037 A 20021129 (SONY CORP) [D] * abstract * |