blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1518936

EP1518936 - Marker assisted selection of chicken against fishy taint [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusOpposition rejected
Status updated on  15.11.2013
Database last updated on 24.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip15.11.2013Opposition rejectedpublished on 18.12.2013  [2013/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Lohmann Tierzucht GmbH
Am Seedeich 9-11
27454 Cuxhaven / DE
[2005/13]
Inventor(s)01 / Preisinger, Rudolf
Hasenbeckallee 19
21789 Wingst / DE
02 / Weigend, Steffen
Allerbruchweg 1
31535 Neustadt-Mariensee / DE
03 / Vilkki, Johanna
Rehtijärventie 109
31630 Minkiö / FI
 [2005/13]
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/35]Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
Former [2005/13]VOSSIUS & PARTNER
Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date04022858.724.09.2004
[2005/13]
Priority number, dateEP2003002155624.09.2003         Original published format: EP 03021556
[2005/13]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1518936
Date:30.03.2005
Language:EN
[2005/13]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1518936
Date:22.08.2007
Language:EN
[2007/34]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.12.2004
ClassificationIPC:C12Q1/68, C12N9/02
[2005/13]
CPC:
C12N9/0073 (EP); C12Q1/6883 (EP); C12Y114/13008 (EP);
C12Q2600/124 (EP); C12Q2600/156 (EP); C12Q2600/172 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2005/13]
Extension statesAL29.06.2005
HR29.06.2005
LT29.06.2005
LV29.06.2005
MK29.06.2005
TitleGerman:Marker-unterstützte Auswahl von Hühnern gegen das "fish odour"- oder TMA-Syndrom[2007/33]
English:Marker assisted selection of chicken against fishy taint[2005/13]
French:Sélection assistée par marqueurs de poulets contre la trimethylaminurie ou "fish odour syndrom"[2005/13]
Former [2005/13]Marker-unterstützte Auswahl von Hühnchen gegen das "fish odour"- oder TMA-Syndrom
Examination procedure29.06.2005Examination requested  [2005/34]
05.08.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.12.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.03.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
19.04.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.01.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.06.2007Fee for grant paid
05.06.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  22.05.2008  03.06.2008  ADMISSIBLE
Hendrix Genetics B.V.
Spoorstraat 69 P.O. Box 114
5830 AC Boxmeer / NL
Opponent's representative
Nederlandsch Octrooibureau, et al, et al
P.O. Box 29720
2502 LS The Hague / NL
 [2013/28]
Former [2011/09]
Opponent(s)01  22.05.2008  03.06.2008  ADMISSIBLE
Hendrix Genetics B.V.
Spoorstraat 69 P.O. Box 114
5830 AC Boxmeer / NL
Opponent's representative
Swinkels, Bart Willem, et al, et al
Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720
NL-2502 LS Den Haag / NL
Former [2008/28]
Opponent(s)01  22.05.2008   
Hendrix Genetics B.V.
Spoorstraat 69 P.O. Box 114
5830 AC Boxmeer / NL
Opponent's representative
Hatzmann, Martin, et al, et al
VEREENIGDE Johan de Wittlaan 7
2517 JR Den Haag / NL
03.07.2008Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
11.11.2008Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
23.09.2009Date of oral proceedings
14.10.2009Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
14.10.2009Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
28.10.2013Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2013/51]
Appeal following opposition14.12.2009Appeal received No.  T0015/10
15.02.2010Statement of grounds filed
14.10.2013Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent was rejected
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.09.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT22.08.2007
BE22.08.2007
CH22.08.2007
CY22.08.2007
CZ22.08.2007
DK22.08.2007
EE22.08.2007
LI22.08.2007
PL22.08.2007
RO22.08.2007
SI22.08.2007
SK22.08.2007
TR22.08.2007
IE24.09.2007
LU24.09.2007
IT30.09.2007
MC30.09.2007
BG22.11.2007
SE22.11.2007
GR23.11.2007
ES03.12.2007
PT22.01.2008
[2011/12]
Former [2009/44]AT22.08.2007
BE22.08.2007
CH22.08.2007
CY22.08.2007
CZ22.08.2007
DK22.08.2007
EE22.08.2007
LI22.08.2007
PL22.08.2007
RO22.08.2007
SI22.08.2007
SK22.08.2007
TR22.08.2007
IE24.09.2007
LU24.09.2007
MC30.09.2007
BG22.11.2007
SE22.11.2007
GR23.11.2007
ES03.12.2007
PT22.01.2008
Former [2009/40]AT22.08.2007
BE22.08.2007
CH22.08.2007
CY22.08.2007
CZ22.08.2007
DK22.08.2007
EE22.08.2007
LI22.08.2007
PL22.08.2007
RO22.08.2007
SI22.08.2007
SK22.08.2007
IE24.09.2007
LU24.09.2007
MC30.09.2007
BG22.11.2007
SE22.11.2007
GR23.11.2007
ES03.12.2007
PT22.01.2008
Former [2009/35]AT22.08.2007
BE22.08.2007
CH22.08.2007
CY22.08.2007
CZ22.08.2007
DK22.08.2007
EE22.08.2007
LI22.08.2007
PL22.08.2007
RO22.08.2007
SI22.08.2007
SK22.08.2007
IE24.09.2007
MC30.09.2007
BG22.11.2007
SE22.11.2007
GR23.11.2007
ES03.12.2007
PT22.01.2008
Former [2009/29]AT22.08.2007
BE22.08.2007
CH22.08.2007
CZ22.08.2007
DK22.08.2007
EE22.08.2007
LI22.08.2007
PL22.08.2007
RO22.08.2007
SI22.08.2007
SK22.08.2007
IE24.09.2007
MC30.09.2007
BG22.11.2007
SE22.11.2007
GR23.11.2007
ES03.12.2007
PT22.01.2008
Former [2009/11]AT22.08.2007
BE22.08.2007
CH22.08.2007
CZ22.08.2007
DK22.08.2007
EE22.08.2007
LI22.08.2007
PL22.08.2007
RO22.08.2007
SK22.08.2007
IE24.09.2007
MC30.09.2007
BG22.11.2007
SE22.11.2007
GR23.11.2007
ES03.12.2007
PT22.01.2008
Former [2008/45]AT22.08.2007
BE22.08.2007
CH22.08.2007
CZ22.08.2007
DK22.08.2007
LI22.08.2007
PL22.08.2007
RO22.08.2007
SK22.08.2007
IE24.09.2007
MC30.09.2007
BG22.11.2007
SE22.11.2007
GR23.11.2007
ES03.12.2007
PT22.01.2008
Former [2008/28]AT22.08.2007
BE22.08.2007
CH22.08.2007
CZ22.08.2007
DK22.08.2007
LI22.08.2007
PL22.08.2007
RO22.08.2007
SK22.08.2007
MC30.09.2007
BG22.11.2007
SE22.11.2007
GR23.11.2007
ES03.12.2007
PT22.01.2008
Former [2008/25]AT22.08.2007
BE22.08.2007
CH22.08.2007
CZ22.08.2007
DK22.08.2007
LI22.08.2007
PL22.08.2007
SK22.08.2007
MC30.09.2007
BG22.11.2007
GR23.11.2007
ES03.12.2007
PT22.01.2008
Former [2008/22]AT22.08.2007
BE22.08.2007
CH22.08.2007
DK22.08.2007
LI22.08.2007
PL22.08.2007
MC30.09.2007
BG22.11.2007
GR23.11.2007
ES03.12.2007
Former [2008/21]AT22.08.2007
BE22.08.2007
CH22.08.2007
LI22.08.2007
PL22.08.2007
BG22.11.2007
GR23.11.2007
ES03.12.2007
Former [2008/14]AT22.08.2007
CH22.08.2007
LI22.08.2007
PL22.08.2007
BG22.11.2007
ES03.12.2007
Former [2008/09]BG22.11.2007
ES03.12.2007
Former [2008/08]ES03.12.2007
Documents cited:Search[DXY]WO03057886  (AREXIS AB [SE], et al) [DX] 1,4,9-11,13,14,23-28 *the whole document, particularly example 3* [Y] 2,3,6-8,12,15-18;
 [DY]  - EMBL, (20020220), Database accession no. aj431390, URL: EBI, XP002268095 [DY] 2,3,6-8,12,15-18 * the whole document *
 [DA]  - TREACY E P ET AL, "MUTATIONS OF THE FLAVIN-CONTAINING MONOOXYGENASE GENE (FMO3) CAUSE TRIMETHYLAMINURIA, A DEFECT IN DETOXICATION", HUMAN MOLECULAR GENETICS, OXFORD UNIVERSITY PRESS, SURREY, GB, (199805), vol. 7, no. 5, ISSN 0964-6906, pages 839 - 845, XP001053063 [DA] * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/hmg/7.5.839
 [A]  - ZSCHOCKE J ET AL, "Mild trimethylaminuria caused by common variants in FMO3 gene", LANCET, XX, XX, (19990904), vol. 354, no. 9181, ISSN 0140-6736, pages 834 - 835, XP004357828 [A] * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0140-6736(99)80019-1
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.