blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1537814

EP1537814 - Power blower [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  26.11.2010
Database last updated on 15.06.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip26.11.2010No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 29.12.2010  [2010/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Honda Motor Co., Ltd.
1-1, Minami-Aoyama, 2-chome
Minato-ku
Tokyo 107-8556 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2009/51]For all designated states
Honda Motor Co., Ltd.
1-1, Minami-Aoyama 2-chome Minato-ku
Tokyo 107-8556 / JP
Former [2005/23]For all designated states
Honda Motor Co., Ltd.
1-1, Minami-aoyama, 2-chome
Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Saitou, Akito
c/o Honda R&D Co., Ltd. 4-1, Chuo 1-chome
Wako-shi Saitama, 351-0193 / JP
02 / Ito, Jun
c/o Honda R&D Co., Ltd. 4-1, Chuo 1-chome
Wako-shi Saitama, 351-0193 / JP
03 / Hirakawa, Koichi
c/o Honda R&D Co., Ltd 4-1, Chuo 1-chome
Wako-shi Saitama, 351-0193 / JP
 [2009/51]
Former [2005/23]01 / Saitou, Akito Honda R&D Co., Ltd.
4-1, Chuo 1-chome
Wako-shi Saitama / JP
02 / Ito, Jun Honda R&D Co., Ltd.
4-1, Chuo 1-chome
Wako-shi Saitama / JP
03 / Hirakawa, Koichi Kaaz Corporation
1-15, Higashi-Furumatsu 5-chome
Okayama-shi Okayama / JP
Representative(s)Prechtel, Jörg, et al
C/o Weickmann & Weickmann
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Richard-Strauss-Straße 80
81679 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2005/23]Prechtel, Jörg, Dipl.-Phys. Dr., et al
Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 86 08 20
81635 München / DE
Application number, filing date04028619.702.12.2004
[2005/23]
Priority number, dateJP2003040793805.12.2003         Original published format: JP 2003407938
[2005/23]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1537814
Date:08.06.2005
Language:EN
[2005/23]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1537814
Date:29.03.2006
[2006/13]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1537814
Date:20.01.2010
Language:EN
[2010/03]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.02.2006
ClassificationIPC:A47L5/14, A47L9/32
[2005/23]
CPC:
A47L5/14 (EP,US); A01G20/47 (EP,US); A47L9/32 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2006/49]
Former [2005/23]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Motorgetriebenes Blasgerät[2005/23]
English:Power blower[2005/23]
French:Appareil souffleur de débris entraîné par un moteur[2005/23]
Examination procedure12.05.2006Examination requested  [2006/26]
15.03.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.07.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.06.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.10.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.09.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.11.2009Fee for grant paid
05.11.2009Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)21.10.2010No opposition filed within time limit [2010/52]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.12.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
12.12.2007Renewal fee patent year 04
31.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
11.12.2009Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]US6007304  (VESER NORBERT [DE]) [A] 1 * figures 1,3 ** column 4; claim 1 *;
 [X]US6552891  (PRACH KLAUS [DE]) [X] 1,2 * figures 1,4 * * column 3, line 21 * * column 1, lines 53,54 * * column 5; claim 1 * * column 4, lines 41-45,51-54 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.