|
12.12.2012 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.12.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.12.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.11.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.11.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.11.2012 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
27 |
|
24.10.2012 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.10.2012 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.10.2012 |
F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) |
Appeal |
4 |
|
28.09.2012 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.09.2012 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.09.2012 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.09.2012 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.09.2012 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
20.09.2012 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
14 |
|
20.09.2012 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.09.2012 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
16 |
|
18.09.2012 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
14 |
|
17.09.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.09.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.09.2012 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.09.2012 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.06.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.06.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.06.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.06.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.06.2012 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
14 |
|
11.06.2012 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.09.2011 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.08.2011 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.08.2011 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
22 |
|
17.03.2011 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.01.2011 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.04.2010 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.04.2010 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.04.2010 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.04.2010 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
7 |
|
11.02.2010 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.02.2010 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
06.02.2010 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
06.02.2010 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
7 |
|
05.02.2010 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
05.02.2010 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
05.02.2010 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
6 |
|
15.12.2009 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.12.2009 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.12.2009 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.12.2009 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.10.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.10.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.10.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.10.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.10.2009 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
3 |
|
08.10.2009 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.10.2009 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
08.10.2009 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.10.2009 |
Decision rejecting the opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.10.2009 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
08.10.2009 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.10.2009 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.10.2009 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.10.2009 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.10.2009 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.10.2009 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.07.2009 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.07.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.06.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.06.2009 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
6 |
|
24.06.2009 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
24.06.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
24.06.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.06.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
24 |
|
24.06.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
24.06.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
24.06.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
24.06.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
60 |
|
24.06.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
17 |
|
24.06.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
44 |
|
24.06.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
66 |
|
24.06.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
100 |
|
04.03.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.03.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.02.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.02.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.02.2009 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
5 |
|
19.02.2009 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.06.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.06.2008 |
CDS Clean up - amended opponent data |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.06.2008 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
4 |
|
17.03.2008 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.03.2008 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.02.2008 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.01.2008 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
31.01.2008 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
30.01.2008 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
17.07.2007 |
Communication concerning corrections of the European patent specification |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.06.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.06.2007 |
Request for correction of the publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.04.2007 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.03.2007 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.03.2007 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.03.2007 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.11.2006 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.11.2006 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
14.11.2006 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
65 |
|
20.09.2006 |
Preparation of grant |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.08.2006 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.08.2006 |
Description |
Search / examination |
28 |
|
24.08.2006 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.06.2006 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.06.2006 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.09.2005 |
Letter concerning the designation and/or extension and/or validation of states |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.05.2005 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.04.2005 |
Refund order search fee |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.03.2005 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.03.2005 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.03.2005 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
06.12.2004 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.12.2004 |
Certificate of deposit of biological material |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
06.12.2004 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.12.2004 |
Description |
Search / examination |
56 |
|
06.12.2004 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.12.2004 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.12.2004 |
Letter concerning search matters |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
06.12.2004 |
Non-scannable object |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.12.2004 |
Request for grant of a European patent (divisional application) |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
06.12.2004 |
Sequence listing |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
12.03.2002 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
19 |
|
12.03.2002 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
21 |
|
12.03.2002 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
31 |
|
12.03.2002 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
22 |
|
12.03.2002 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
24 |