EP1559788 - Use lipase for improving doughs and baked products [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.06.2008 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.07.2008 [2008/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DANISCO A/S Langebrogade 1, P.O. Box 17 1001 Copenhagen K. / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2005/31] | For all designated states DANISCO A/S Langebrogade 1, P.O. Box 17 1001 Copenhagen K. / DK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Poulsen, Charlotte Horsmans Langdalsvej 37 8220 Braband / DK | 02 /
Soee, Joern Borch Oroevaengent 11 8381 Mundelstrup / DK | 03 /
Rasmussen, Preben Boegegaerdsvej 1 4070 Kirke Hyllinge / DK | 04 /
Madrid, Susan Mampusta Ellefolden 7 Troeroed 2950 Vedbaek / DK | 05 /
Zargahi, Masoud R. Kastani Allé 9B 8239 Abyhoej / DK | [2005/31] | Representative(s) | Williams, Aylsa, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/31] | Williams, Aylsa, et al D Young & Co 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 04076486.2 | 03.04.1998 | [2005/31] | Priority number, date | DK19970000400 | 09.04.1997 Original published format: DK 40097 | [2005/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1559788 | Date: | 03.08.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.06.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/55, C12N9/20, C07K19/00, C12N15/80, C12N1/15, A21D8/04 | [2005/31] | CPC: |
C12Y101/03005 (EP,US);
A23L7/107 (EP,US);
A21D2/16 (EP,US);
A21D2/26 (EP,US);
A21D8/042 (EP,US);
C12N9/20 (EP,US);
C12N9/80 (EP,US);
C12Y301/01003 (EP,US);
C12Y301/01004 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2005/31] | Title | German: | Verwendung von Lipase zur Verbesserung von Teigen und Backwaren | [2005/31] | English: | Use lipase for improving doughs and baked products | [2005/31] | French: | Utilisation de lipase pour améliorer des pâte à pain et des produits de boulangerie | [2005/31] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Examination procedure | 21.05.2004 | Examination requested [2005/31] | 20.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.01.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/30] | 05.03.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/30] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP98913539.7 / EP0977869 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5232846 (TAKEDA AKIRA [JP], et al) [A] 1-9 *Abstract; column 2, lines 23-30; and column 2, line 65 - column 3, line 43*; | [DA]WO9404035 (NOVO NORDISK AS [DK], et al) [DA] 1-9 *page 2, line 32 - page 5, line 9 and page 6, line 20 - page 14, line 20*; | [A] - COLOMBO D ET AL, "Optically Pure 1-O- and 3-O-beta-D-Glucosyl- and Galactosyl-sn-glycerols through Lipase-Catalyzed Transformations", TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM, NL, (19950703), vol. 36, no. 27, ISSN 0040-4039, pages 4865 - 4868, XP004027788 [A] 1-9 *page 4865, first paragraph and page 4865, fourth paragraph - page 4867, first paragraph* | [A] - TSUCHIYA A ET AL, "CLONING AND NULCEOTIDE SEQUENCE OF THE MONO- AND DIACYLGLYCEROL LIPASE GENE (MDLB) OF ASPERGILLUS ORYZAE", FEMS MICROBIOLOGY LETTERS, AMSTERDAM, NL, (1996), vol. 143, ISSN 0378-1097, pages 63 - 67, XP001053364 [A] 1-9 *Whole document* DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0378-1097(96)00291-1 |