|
09.10.2014 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.10.2014 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
09.10.2014 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.03.2014 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.03.2014 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
29.03.2014 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
12.11.2012 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
12.11.2012 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
12.11.2012 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
12.11.2012 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
12.11.2012 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.11.2012 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
12.11.2012 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
12.11.2012 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
12.11.2012 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
21.09.2012 |
F3004 Communication of the Registry |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.09.2012 |
Closing of application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.09.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.09.2012 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
14 |
|
01.06.2012 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.05.2012 |
Communication confirming withdrawal from representation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.05.2012 |
Notification of termination of representative's authorisation |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.04.2012 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.04.2012 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
05.04.2012 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.04.2012 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.03.2012 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.02.2012 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.02.2012 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
21 |
|
23.02.2012 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
06.02.2012 |
F3346 Communication with reference to loss of rights, with time limit (ex parte) |
Appeal |
6 |
|
23.01.2012 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.11.2011 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.11.2011 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.10.2011 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
5 |
|
18.06.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.06.2011 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
18.06.2011 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
18.06.2011 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.06.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.06.2011 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.06.2011 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.06.2011 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.06.2011 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.06.2011 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
14.06.2011 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.06.2011 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.06.2011 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.06.2011 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.06.2011 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
01.06.2011 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
30.05.2011 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.05.2011 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.05.2011 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.05.2011 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.05.2011 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.05.2011 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.05.2011 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
16.05.2011 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.05.2011 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
14.05.2011 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.05.2011 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
11.05.2011 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.05.2011 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.05.2011 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.05.2011 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.05.2011 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
10.05.2011 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.04.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.04.2011 |
Communication about missing advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.03.2011 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
21.03.2011 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
21.03.2011 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.03.2011 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.03.2011 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.03.2011 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.03.2011 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.02.2011 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.02.2011 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.01.2011 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
22 |
|
14.01.2011 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.01.2011 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.12.2010 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.12.2010 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.12.2010 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.12.2010 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.10.2010 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.10.2010 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
21 |
|
14.10.2010 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.10.2010 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
30.08.2010 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
30.08.2010 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.08.2010 |
Decision to allow further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.07.2010 |
Notice on debiting of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.07.2010 |
Notice on debiting of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.07.2010 |
Request for further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.06.2010 |
Request for further processing |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.05.2010 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn (non-payment of examination fee/designation fee/non-reply to Written Opinion) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.04.2010 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
06.04.2010 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.10.2009 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.09.2009 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.09.2009 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.02.2009 |
Enquiry as to when the search report can be expected |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.02.2009 |
Enquiry as to when the search report can be expected |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.09.2008 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.02.2007 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.01.2007 |
General authorisation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.12.2006 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.12.2006 |
Request for change of representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.12.2006 |
Request for change of representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.09.2006 |
Communication confirming withdrawal from representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.09.2006 |
Notification of termination of representative's authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.08.2006 |
Request for change of representative |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.08.2006 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.04.2006 |
Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.07.2004 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.03.2004 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.03.2004 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.03.2004 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
19.02.2004 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.02.2004 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.02.2004 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.02.2004 |
Description |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
19.02.2004 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.02.2004 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |