|
30.01.2013 |
Refund of fees |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.01.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.01.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.01.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.01.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.01.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.01.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.01.2013 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
30 |
|
18.01.2013 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.10.2012 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
7 |
|
26.09.2012 |
F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.09.2012 |
F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.09.2012 |
F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.09.2012 |
F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.09.2012 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.09.2012 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.09.2012 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.09.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.09.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.09.2012 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Appeal |
8 |
|
20.09.2012 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.09.2012 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Appeal |
3 |
|
20.09.2012 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.09.2012 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Appeal |
3 |
|
05.09.2012 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.09.2012 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.09.2012 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.09.2012 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.09.2012 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.09.2012 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.08.2012 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.08.2012 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.08.2012 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.08.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.08.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.08.2012 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.08.2012 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.08.2012 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
26 |
|
23.08.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Appeal |
23 |
|
23.08.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Appeal |
47 |
|
18.07.2012 |
Communication confirming withdrawal from representation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.07.2012 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.07.2012 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.07.2012 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.07.2012 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.07.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.07.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.07.2012 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.07.2012 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.06.2012 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
13.06.2012 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.06.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
30.05.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.05.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
30.05.2012 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.05.2012 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.05.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.05.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.05.2012 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
18 |
|
21.05.2012 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.05.2012 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
03.05.2012 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.04.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.04.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.04.2012 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.02.2012 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
6 |
|
01.02.2012 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
6 |
|
27.01.2012 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
24.01.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.01.2012 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
24.01.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.01.2012 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.01.2012 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.01.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.01.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.01.2012 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.10.2010 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
4 |
|
13.09.2010 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
09.09.2010 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.09.2010 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.09.2010 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
09.09.2010 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
46 |
|
09.09.2010 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
15 |
|
02.08.2010 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
23.07.2010 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.07.2010 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.07.2010 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.06.2010 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.05.2010 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
28.04.2010 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.04.2010 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.04.2010 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.04.2010 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
18 |
|
26.04.2010 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
26.04.2010 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
19 |
|
05.02.2010 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
4 |
|
04.02.2010 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.02.2010 |
Cover sheet for fax transmission |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.02.2010 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.02.2010 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.01.2010 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.01.2010 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.01.2010 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.12.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.12.2009 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.12.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.12.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.12.2009 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.12.2009 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.12.2009 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
8 |
|
22.12.2009 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.12.2009 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
22.12.2009 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
15.12.2009 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.12.2009 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.11.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.11.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.11.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.11.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.11.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.11.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.11.2009 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.11.2009 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.11.2009 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
10.11.2009 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.11.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
19 |
|
10.11.2009 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
09.11.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.11.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.11.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.11.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.11.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.11.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.11.2009 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.11.2009 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.11.2009 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.11.2009 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
3 |
|
03.11.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.11.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.11.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.11.2009 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
03.11.2009 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
25 |
|
03.11.2009 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
03.11.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.11.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
31 |
|
03.11.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
03.11.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
03.11.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.11.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
23 |
|
03.11.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
03.11.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
03.11.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
03.11.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
03.11.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
03.11.2009 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.10.2009 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
28.10.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
28.10.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
16 |
|
28.10.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
98 |
|
28.10.2009 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.10.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.10.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.10.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.10.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.10.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.10.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.10.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.10.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.10.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.10.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.10.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.10.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.10.2009 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.10.2009 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.10.2009 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
27 |
|
08.10.2009 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
36 |
|
08.10.2009 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.10.2009 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.10.2009 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
3 |
|
08.10.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
08.10.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
08.10.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
08.10.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
08.10.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
18 |
|
08.10.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
08.10.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
08.10.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
08.10.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
08.10.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
08.10.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
08.10.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
13 |
|
08.10.2009 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
08.10.2009 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
08.10.2009 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
27 |
|
06.10.2009 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.05.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.05.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.05.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.05.2009 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.05.2009 |
Withdrawal of a request for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.05.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.05.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.05.2009 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.05.2009 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.05.2009 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.05.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.05.2009 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
12.05.2009 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
12.05.2009 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.05.2009 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.05.2009 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.05.2009 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.05.2009 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.04.2009 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.10.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.10.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.10.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.10.2008 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
19 |
|
27.10.2008 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
47 |
|
27.10.2008 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
26 |
|
27.10.2008 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
13 |
|
27.10.2008 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
20 |
|
27.10.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.10.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
15 |
|
27.10.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
16 |
|
27.10.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
27.10.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
27.10.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.10.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
27.10.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
18 |
|
27.10.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
27.10.2008 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
23 |
|
24.10.2008 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
19 |
|
24.10.2008 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
20 |
|
24.10.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.10.2008 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
23 |
|
08.08.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.08.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.08.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.08.2008 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.08.2008 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.08.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.08.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.08.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.08.2008 |
Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.08.2008 |
Communication of amended entries |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.08.2008 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.07.2008 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.07.2008 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.06.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.06.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.06.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.06.2008 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.06.2008 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.05.2008 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.04.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.04.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.04.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.04.2008 |
Communication of amended entries |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.04.2008 |
Request for a change of address - opponent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.02.2008 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.02.2008 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.02.2008 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.02.2008 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.01.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.01.2008 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.01.2008 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.01.2008 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.01.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
11.01.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
11.01.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
11.01.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
11.01.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
11.01.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
11.01.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
11.01.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.01.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
11.01.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
11.01.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
11.01.2008 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
11.01.2008 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
10 |
|
11.01.2008 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
20 |
|
11.01.2008 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
11.01.2008 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
11.01.2008 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
10 |
|
11.01.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
24 |
|
11.01.2008 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.01.2008 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.01.2008 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
10.01.2008 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
10.01.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.01.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.01.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
10.01.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
10.01.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
10.01.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
10.01.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
10.01.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
10.01.2008 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
10.01.2008 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
23 |
|
10.01.2008 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.01.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
23 |
|
10.01.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
10.01.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
21 |
|
10.01.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
21 |
|
10.01.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
59 |
|
10.01.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
24 |
|
10.01.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
25 |
|
15.03.2007 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.03.2007 |
Approval of request for amendments/corrections |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.02.2007 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.02.2007 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.02.2007 |
Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.02.2007 |
Communication concerning deficiencies in subsequently filed documents |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.01.2007 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.01.2007 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.01.2007 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.01.2007 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.01.2007 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.01.2007 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.01.2007 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent until 31.03.2012 |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.12.2006 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.12.2006 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
04.12.2006 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
25 |
|
14.11.2006 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.10.2006 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.10.2006 |
Description |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
12.10.2006 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.10.2006 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.10.2006 |
Description |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
11.10.2006 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.10.2006 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.09.2006 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.09.2006 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.09.2006 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.09.2006 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.08.2006 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.08.2006 |
Description |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
03.08.2006 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.08.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
03.08.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
56 |
|
03.08.2006 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.04.2006 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
28.04.2006 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.04.2006 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.04.2006 |
Decision to allow further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.03.2006 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.03.2006 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.01.2006 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.08.2005 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.08.2005 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.08.2005 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.08.2005 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.05.2005 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.05.2005 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.09.2004 |
Refund order search fee |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.07.2004 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.07.2004 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.07.2004 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.06.2004 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.05.2004 |
Annex to European Search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.05.2004 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.05.2004 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.05.2004 |
Communication on invalid designation/extension/validation of states |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.04.2004 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.04.2004 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.04.2004 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.04.2004 |
Description |
Search / examination |
47 |
|
19.04.2004 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.04.2004 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.04.2004 |
Letter concerning search matters |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.04.2004 |
Letter concerning search matters |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.04.2004 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.04.2004 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
31.10.1997 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
59 |