EP1464973 - Methods and apparatus for analyzing high voltage circuit breakers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.05.2016 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.05.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.06.2016 [2016/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Megger Sweden AB P.O. Box 724 182 17 Danderyd / SE | [2014/51] |
Former [2009/19] | For all designated states Programma Electric AB Box 2970 187 29 Täby / SE | ||
Former [2004/41] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stanisic, Zoran Hembergav. 23 18773 Taby / SE | [2004/41] | Representative(s) | Bergenstråhle & Partners AB P.O. Box 17704 118 93 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/27] | Estreen, Lars J.F. Bergenstråhle & Lindvall AB P.O. Box 17704 118 93 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2008/40] | Estreen, Lars J.F. Bergenstråhle & Lindvall AB P.O. Box 17704 118 93 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2004/41] | Pedder, James Cuthbert London Patent Operation, General Electric International, Inc., 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | Application number, filing date | 04251895.1 | 30.03.2004 | [2004/41] | Priority number, date | US20030403695 | 31.03.2003 Original published format: US 403695 | [2004/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1464973 | Date: | 06.10.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1464973 | Date: | 01.07.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.07.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G01R31/333 | [2004/41] | CPC: |
G01R31/3333 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [2015/27] |
Former [2005/26] | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE | ||
Former [2004/41] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Analyse von Hochspannungsschaltgeräten | [2004/41] | English: | Methods and apparatus for analyzing high voltage circuit breakers | [2004/41] | French: | Méthode et appareil pour l'analyse d'interrupteurs de puissance à haute tension | [2004/41] | Examination procedure | 06.04.2005 | Examination requested [2005/22] | 21.11.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.05.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.02.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.12.2014 | Date of oral proceedings | 20.01.2015 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 23.01.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.05.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 21.05.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.05.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.11.2006 | Opposition(s) | 04.04.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 18.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 06.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 12.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 09.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2008 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   21.08.2008 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB788548 (LICENTIA GMBH) [X] 1 * claims 1,7 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960229), vol. 1996, no. 02, & JP7280897 A 19951027 (NISSIN ELECTRIC CO LTD) [X] 1-3 * abstract * | Examination | US3612985 | US5119260 | DE3837605 | CH89137 | JPH0359471 |