blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1473378

EP1473378 - Method for applying or repairing thermal barrier coatings [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.04.2013
Database last updated on 24.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip19.04.2013No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 22.05.2013  [2013/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY
1 River Road
Schenectady, NY 12345 / US
[2012/24]
Former [2004/45]For all designated states
GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY
1 River Road
Schenectady, NY 12345 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Nagaraj, Bangalore A.
5196 Traverse Court
West Chester, Ohio 45069 / US
02 / Schorr, Deborah A.
12132 South Pine Drive, Apt. 246
Cincinnati, Ohio 45241 / US
03 / Heidorn, Raymond W.
5644 Lake Mead Drive
Fairfield, Ohio 45014 / US
04 / Young, Craig D.
7319 Windsor Park Drive
Maineville, Ohio 45039 / US
05 / Lanman, Eva Z.
5694 Whistling Wind Lane
Milford, Ohio 45150 / US
06 / Tomlinson, Thomas J.
7456 Quail Run Drive
West Chester, Ohio 45069 / US
07 / Kastrup, David A.
6713 Coachlight Way
West Chester, Ohio 45069 / US
 [2004/48]
Former [2004/45]01 / Nagaraj, Bangalore A.
5196 Traverse Court
West Chester, Ohio 45069 / US
02 / Schorr, Deborah A.
1489 Spring Park Walk
Cincinnati, Ohio 45215 / US
03 / Heidorn, Raymond W.
5644 Lake Mead Drive
Fairfield, Ohio 45014 / US
04 / Young, Craig D.
7319 Windsor Park Drive
Maineville, Ohio 45039 / US
05 / Lanman, Eva Z.
5694 Whistling Wind Lane
Milford, Ohio 45150 / US
06 / Tomlinson, Thomas J.
7456 Quail Run Drive
West Chester, Ohio 45069 / US
07 / Kastrup, David A.
6713 Coachlight Way
West Chester, Ohio 45069 / US
Representative(s)Bedford, Grant Richard, et al
GPO Europe
GE International Inc. The Ark
201 Talgarth Road
Hammersmith
London W6 8BJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2012/22]Bedford, Grant Richard, et al
Global Patent Operation - Europe GE International Inc. 15 John Adam Street
London WC2N 6LU / GB
Former [2009/31]Goode, Ian Roy, et al
London Patent Operation General Electric International, Inc. 15 John Adam Street London
WC2N 6LU / GB
Former [2004/45]Goode, Ian Roy, et al
London Patent Operation General Electric International, Inc. 15 John Adam Street
London WC2N 6LU / GB
Application number, filing date04252527.930.04.2004
[2004/45]
Priority number, dateUS2003042628030.04.2003         Original published format: US 426280
[2004/45]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1473378
Date:03.11.2004
Language:EN
[2004/45]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1473378
Date:13.06.2012
Language:EN
[2012/24]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.09.2004
ClassificationIPC:C23C4/02
[2004/45]
CPC:
C23C4/00 (EP,US); C23C28/3215 (EP,US); C23C28/345 (EP,US);
C23C28/3455 (EP,US); C23C28/36 (EP,US); C23C4/02 (EP,US);
F01D5/005 (EP,US); F01D5/288 (EP,US); F05D2230/312 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49318 (EP,US); Y10T428/12618 (EP,US); Y10T428/12736 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [2005/29]
Former [2004/45]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zum Aufbringen oder Reparieren von Wärmedämmschutzschichten[2004/45]
English:Method for applying or repairing thermal barrier coatings[2004/45]
French:Méthode pour l'application et réparation de revêtements barrières thermiques[2004/45]
Examination procedure03.05.2005Examination requested  [2005/26]
19.12.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
28.06.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.07.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
16.01.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.11.2008Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 02.12.2008
18.11.2008Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
02.12.2008Date of oral proceedings
02.12.2008Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
05.02.2009Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
03.01.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.04.2012Fee for grant paid
17.04.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Appeal following examination15.04.2009Appeal received No.  T1443/09
12.06.2009Statement of grounds filed
11.05.2011Result of appeal procedure: continuation of examination procedure
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  19.12.2005
Opposition(s)14.03.2013No opposition filed within time limit [2013/21]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.05.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
02.05.2007Renewal fee patent year 04
02.05.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
04.05.2009Renewal fee patent year 06
03.05.2010Renewal fee patent year 07
02.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 08
02.05.2012Renewal fee patent year 09
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]JPH08176781  ;
 [X]EP0808913  (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [X] 1,2,5,6,10 * claims 1-3,7,9 *;
 [X]EP1016735  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1,2,5 * page 3, column 3, line 53 - column 4, line 2 * * column 4, line 33 - line 35 * * page 4, column 5, line 29 - column 6, line 17; claims 1,2,4,5 *;
 [X]US6471881  (CHAI YAN [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5,6,10 * column 4, line 39 - line 49; claims 10,13 *;
 [X]GB2375725  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1,2,5 * page 2, line 19 - line 32 * * page 5, line 22 - line 29 * * page 6, line 1 - line 6 * * sentence 15 - sentence 20 * * sentence 28 - sentence 32 * * page 8, line 31 - page 9, line 11 * * sentence 26 - sentence 28; claims 12-16 *;
 [X]EP1304446  (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [X] 1,2,5-7,10 * page 3, line 17 - line 30 * * page 4, line 4 - line 50; claims 1,6,7 *;
 [A]  - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1996, no. 37, Database accession no. 1996-368730, XP002294646 & JPH08176781 A 19960709 (DAINIPPON TORYO KK) [A] 3,4,9 * abstract *
ExaminationUS5409748
 US2002009611
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.