EP1548463 - Fishing data display device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.02.2009 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 15.12.2010 [2010/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SHIMANO INC. 3-77, Oimatsu-cho Sakai-ku Sakai City Osaka 590-8577 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/31] | For all designated states SHIMANO INC. 3-77 Oimatsu-cho, Sakai-ku, Sakai City Osaka 590-8577 / JP | ||
Former [2005/26] | For all designated states Shimano Inc. 3-77 Oimatsu-cho, Sakai Osaka 590-8577 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kuriyama, Hiroaki c/o Shimano Inc. 3-77 Oimatsu-cho Sakai-ku Sakai City Osaka 590-8577 / JP | 02 /
Kawabe, Yuzo c/o Shimano Inc. 3-77 Oimatsu-cho Sakai-ku Sakai City Osaka 590-8577 / JP | 03 /
Hirayama, Hirokazu c/o Shimano Inc. 3-77 Oimatsu-cho Sakai-ku Sakai City Osaka 590-8577 / JP | 04 /
Yamamoto, Kazuhito c/o Shimano Inc. 3-77 Oimatsu-cho Sakai-ku Sakai City Osaka 590-8577 / JP | 05 /
Nomura, Masakazu c/o Shimano Inc. 3-77 Oimatsu-cho Sakai-ku Sakai City Osaka 590-8577 / JP | 06 /
Fujimoto, Hiroyasu c/o Furuno Electric Co. Ltd. 9-52 Ashihara-cho Nishinomiya-city, Hyogo 662-8580 / JP | 07 /
Fukuda, Yasushi c/o Furuno Electric Co. Ltd. 9-52 Ashihara-cho Nishinomiya-city, Hyogo 662-8580 / JP | 08 /
Hamato, Hiroyuki c/o Furuno Electric Co. Ltd. 9-52 Ashihara-cho Nishinomiya-city, Hyogo 662-8580 / JP | 09 /
Kobayashi, Koichi c/o Furuno Electric Co. Ltd. 9-52 Ashihara-cho Nishinomiya-city, Hyogo 662-8580 / JP | [2007/39] |
Former [2005/26] | 01 /
Kuriyama, Hiroaki Shimano Inc., 3-77 Oimatsu-cho Sakai, Osaka 590-8577 / JP | ||
02 /
Kawabe, Yuzo Shimano Inc., 3-77 Oimatsu-cho Sakai, Osaka 590-8577 / JP | |||
03 /
Hirayama, Hirokazu Shimano Inc., 3-77 Oimatsu-cho Sakai, Osaka 590-8577 / JP | |||
04 /
Yamamoto, Kazuhito Shimano Inc., 3-77 Oimatsu-cho Sakai, Osaka 590-8577 / JP | |||
05 /
Nomura, Masakazu Shimano Inc., 3-77 Oimatsu-cho Sakai, Osaka 590-8577 / JP | |||
06 /
Fujimoto, Hiroyasu Furuno Electric Co. Ltd., 9-52 Ashihara-cho Nishinomiya-city, Hyogo 662-8580 / JP | |||
07 /
Fukuda, Yasushi Furuno Electric Co. Ltd., 9-52 Ashihara-cho Nishinomiya-city, Hyogo 662-8580 / JP | |||
08 /
Hamato, Hiroyuki Furuno Electric Co. Ltd., 9-52 Ashihara-cho Nishinomiya-city, Hyogo 662-8580 / JP | |||
09 /
Kobayashi, Koichi Furuno Electric Co. Ltd., 9-52 Ashihara-cho Nishinomiya-city, Hyogo 662-8580 / JP | Representative(s) | Murnane, Graham John, et al Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/40] | Murnane, Graham John, et al Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | ||
Former [2005/26] | Murnane, Graham John, et al Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 04257523.3 | 03.12.2004 | [2005/26] | Priority number, date | JP20030405726 | 04.12.2003 Original published format: JP 2003405726 | JP20030405727 | 04.12.2003 Original published format: JP 2003405727 | JP20040009177 | 16.01.2004 Original published format: JP 2004009177 | [2005/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1548463 | Date: | 29.06.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1548463 | Date: | 02.04.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.05.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G01S15/96, A01K97/00 | [2005/26] | CPC: |
G01S15/96 (EP,US);
A01K97/00 (KR);
A01K89/00 (EP);
A01K89/015 (EP);
A01K89/017 (KR);
A01K89/0192 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/26] | Title | German: | Angelinformationsanzeigevorrichtung | [2005/26] | English: | Fishing data display device | [2005/26] | French: | Dispositif d'affichage d'information pour la pêche | [2005/26] | Examination procedure | 30.06.2005 | Examination requested [2005/34] | 31.08.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.12.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 07.12.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.01.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 02.04.2008 | BE | 02.04.2008 | CY | 02.04.2008 | CZ | 02.04.2008 | DK | 02.04.2008 | EE | 02.04.2008 | FI | 02.04.2008 | LT | 02.04.2008 | NL | 02.04.2008 | PL | 02.04.2008 | RO | 02.04.2008 | SI | 02.04.2008 | SK | 02.04.2008 | TR | 02.04.2008 | BG | 02.07.2008 | SE | 02.07.2008 | GR | 03.07.2008 | ES | 13.07.2008 | IS | 02.08.2008 | PT | 03.09.2008 | HU | 03.10.2008 | IE | 03.12.2008 | LU | 03.12.2008 | CH | 31.12.2008 | LI | 31.12.2008 | MC | 31.12.2008 | [2010/50] |
Former [2010/38] | AT | 02.04.2008 | |
BE | 02.04.2008 | ||
CY | 02.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 02.04.2008 | ||
DK | 02.04.2008 | ||
EE | 02.04.2008 | ||
FI | 02.04.2008 | ||
LT | 02.04.2008 | ||
NL | 02.04.2008 | ||
PL | 02.04.2008 | ||
RO | 02.04.2008 | ||
SI | 02.04.2008 | ||
SK | 02.04.2008 | ||
TR | 02.04.2008 | ||
BG | 02.07.2008 | ||
SE | 02.07.2008 | ||
ES | 13.07.2008 | ||
IS | 02.08.2008 | ||
PT | 03.09.2008 | ||
HU | 03.10.2008 | ||
IE | 03.12.2008 | ||
LU | 03.12.2008 | ||
CH | 31.12.2008 | ||
LI | 31.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
Former [2010/34] | AT | 02.04.2008 | |
BE | 02.04.2008 | ||
CY | 02.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 02.04.2008 | ||
DK | 02.04.2008 | ||
EE | 02.04.2008 | ||
FI | 02.04.2008 | ||
LT | 02.04.2008 | ||
NL | 02.04.2008 | ||
PL | 02.04.2008 | ||
RO | 02.04.2008 | ||
SI | 02.04.2008 | ||
SK | 02.04.2008 | ||
BG | 02.07.2008 | ||
SE | 02.07.2008 | ||
ES | 13.07.2008 | ||
IS | 02.08.2008 | ||
PT | 03.09.2008 | ||
HU | 03.10.2008 | ||
IE | 03.12.2008 | ||
LU | 03.12.2008 | ||
CH | 31.12.2008 | ||
LI | 31.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
Former [2010/32] | AT | 02.04.2008 | |
BE | 02.04.2008 | ||
CY | 02.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 02.04.2008 | ||
DK | 02.04.2008 | ||
EE | 02.04.2008 | ||
FI | 02.04.2008 | ||
LT | 02.04.2008 | ||
NL | 02.04.2008 | ||
PL | 02.04.2008 | ||
RO | 02.04.2008 | ||
SI | 02.04.2008 | ||
SK | 02.04.2008 | ||
BG | 02.07.2008 | ||
SE | 02.07.2008 | ||
ES | 13.07.2008 | ||
IS | 02.08.2008 | ||
PT | 03.09.2008 | ||
IE | 03.12.2008 | ||
LU | 03.12.2008 | ||
CH | 31.12.2008 | ||
LI | 31.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/47] | AT | 02.04.2008 | |
BE | 02.04.2008 | ||
CY | 02.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 02.04.2008 | ||
DK | 02.04.2008 | ||
EE | 02.04.2008 | ||
FI | 02.04.2008 | ||
LT | 02.04.2008 | ||
NL | 02.04.2008 | ||
PL | 02.04.2008 | ||
RO | 02.04.2008 | ||
SI | 02.04.2008 | ||
SK | 02.04.2008 | ||
BG | 02.07.2008 | ||
SE | 02.07.2008 | ||
ES | 13.07.2008 | ||
IS | 02.08.2008 | ||
PT | 03.09.2008 | ||
IE | 03.12.2008 | ||
CH | 31.12.2008 | ||
LI | 31.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/44] | AT | 02.04.2008 | |
BE | 02.04.2008 | ||
CY | 02.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 02.04.2008 | ||
DK | 02.04.2008 | ||
EE | 02.04.2008 | ||
FI | 02.04.2008 | ||
LT | 02.04.2008 | ||
NL | 02.04.2008 | ||
PL | 02.04.2008 | ||
RO | 02.04.2008 | ||
SI | 02.04.2008 | ||
SK | 02.04.2008 | ||
BG | 02.07.2008 | ||
SE | 02.07.2008 | ||
ES | 13.07.2008 | ||
IS | 02.08.2008 | ||
PT | 03.09.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/35] | AT | 02.04.2008 | |
BE | 02.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 02.04.2008 | ||
DK | 02.04.2008 | ||
EE | 02.04.2008 | ||
FI | 02.04.2008 | ||
LT | 02.04.2008 | ||
NL | 02.04.2008 | ||
PL | 02.04.2008 | ||
RO | 02.04.2008 | ||
SI | 02.04.2008 | ||
SK | 02.04.2008 | ||
BG | 02.07.2008 | ||
SE | 02.07.2008 | ||
ES | 13.07.2008 | ||
IS | 02.08.2008 | ||
PT | 03.09.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | AT | 02.04.2008 | |
BE | 02.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 02.04.2008 | ||
DK | 02.04.2008 | ||
EE | 02.04.2008 | ||
FI | 02.04.2008 | ||
LT | 02.04.2008 | ||
NL | 02.04.2008 | ||
PL | 02.04.2008 | ||
RO | 02.04.2008 | ||
SI | 02.04.2008 | ||
SK | 02.04.2008 | ||
BG | 02.07.2008 | ||
SE | 02.07.2008 | ||
ES | 13.07.2008 | ||
IS | 02.08.2008 | ||
PT | 03.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/14] | AT | 02.04.2008 | |
BE | 02.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 02.04.2008 | ||
DK | 02.04.2008 | ||
FI | 02.04.2008 | ||
LT | 02.04.2008 | ||
NL | 02.04.2008 | ||
PL | 02.04.2008 | ||
RO | 02.04.2008 | ||
SI | 02.04.2008 | ||
SK | 02.04.2008 | ||
BG | 02.07.2008 | ||
SE | 02.07.2008 | ||
ES | 13.07.2008 | ||
IS | 02.08.2008 | ||
PT | 03.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/13] | AT | 02.04.2008 | |
BE | 02.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 02.04.2008 | ||
DK | 02.04.2008 | ||
FI | 02.04.2008 | ||
LT | 02.04.2008 | ||
NL | 02.04.2008 | ||
PL | 02.04.2008 | ||
SI | 02.04.2008 | ||
SK | 02.04.2008 | ||
BG | 02.07.2008 | ||
SE | 02.07.2008 | ||
ES | 13.07.2008 | ||
IS | 02.08.2008 | ||
PT | 03.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/09] | AT | 02.04.2008 | |
DK | 02.04.2008 | ||
FI | 02.04.2008 | ||
NL | 02.04.2008 | ||
PL | 02.04.2008 | ||
SI | 02.04.2008 | ||
BG | 02.07.2008 | ||
SE | 02.07.2008 | ||
ES | 13.07.2008 | ||
IS | 02.08.2008 | ||
PT | 03.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/07] | AT | 02.04.2008 | |
FI | 02.04.2008 | ||
NL | 02.04.2008 | ||
PL | 02.04.2008 | ||
SI | 02.04.2008 | ||
BG | 02.07.2008 | ||
SE | 02.07.2008 | ||
ES | 13.07.2008 | ||
IS | 02.08.2008 | ||
PT | 03.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/05] | AT | 02.04.2008 | |
FI | 02.04.2008 | ||
NL | 02.04.2008 | ||
PL | 02.04.2008 | ||
SI | 02.04.2008 | ||
BG | 02.07.2008 | ||
ES | 13.07.2008 | ||
IS | 02.08.2008 | ||
PT | 03.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/49] | AT | 02.04.2008 | |
FI | 02.04.2008 | ||
NL | 02.04.2008 | ||
PL | 02.04.2008 | ||
SI | 02.04.2008 | ||
BG | 02.07.2008 | ||
ES | 13.07.2008 | ||
PT | 03.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/48] | NL | 02.04.2008 | |
SI | 02.04.2008 | ||
BG | 02.07.2008 | ||
ES | 13.07.2008 | ||
Former [2008/47] | SI | 02.04.2008 | |
ES | 13.07.2008 | ||
Former [2008/44] | SI | 02.04.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5253220 (WILSON SR JOHN E [US]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US5771205 (CURRIER JON DAVID [US], et al) [A] 1-16 * abstract *; | [A]US6595315 (FUJIMOTO HIROYASU [JP], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US6628569 (STEINER MARK [US], et al) [A] 1* the whole document * |