|
27.03.2013 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.03.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
01.03.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.02.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.02.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.02.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.02.2013 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
19 |
|
01.02.2013 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
5 |
|
29.11.2012 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.11.2012 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.11.2012 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.11.2012 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.11.2012 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.10.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.09.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.09.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.09.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.09.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.09.2012 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
8 |
|
13.09.2012 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.09.2011 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.08.2011 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.08.2011 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
26.08.2011 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
26 |
|
26.08.2011 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.08.2011 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.08.2011 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
16 |
|
22.08.2011 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
53 |
|
21.04.2011 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.04.2011 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.04.2011 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.04.2011 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.04.2011 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.04.2011 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.04.2011 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
22 |
|
04.04.2011 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.04.2011 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
48 |
|
04.04.2011 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.04.2011 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
22 |
|
03.02.2011 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.01.2011 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
3 |
|
20.01.2011 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.01.2011 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.01.2011 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.11.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.11.2010 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.11.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.11.2010 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.11.2010 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.11.2010 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.11.2010 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.11.2010 |
Decision rejecting the opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.11.2010 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
15 |
|
22.11.2010 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.11.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.11.2010 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
8 |
|
02.11.2010 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.11.2010 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.11.2010 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.11.2010 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.11.2010 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
28.10.2010 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.10.2010 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.10.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.10.2010 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.08.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.08.2010 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
5 |
|
03.08.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
03.08.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
03.08.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.08.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
23 |
|
19.04.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.04.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.04.2010 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.03.2010 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
31.03.2010 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.03.2010 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.03.2010 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.03.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.03.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.03.2010 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.03.2010 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
05.03.2010 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
05.03.2010 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.03.2010 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.03.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.03.2010 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.02.2010 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.02.2010 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.10.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.10.2009 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.10.2009 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.10.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
07.10.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
13 |
|
07.10.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.10.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
07.10.2009 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
7 |
|
30.09.2009 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
34 |
|
14.08.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.08.2009 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.08.2009 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.07.2009 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.03.2009 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.03.2009 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.02.2009 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.02.2009 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
24 |
|
16.02.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
16.02.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
16.02.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
16.02.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
17.04.2008 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.04.2008 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
09.04.2008 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.04.2008 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
02.04.2008 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
02.04.2008 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.04.2008 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
02.04.2008 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.04.2008 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.02.2008 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of third party observations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.02.2008 |
Transmittal of third party observations to applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.02.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
06.02.2008 |
Observations by third parties |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
31.01.2008 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.01.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
31.01.2008 |
Observations by third parties |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
25.01.2008 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.01.2008 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
25.01.2008 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.01.2008 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
23 |
|
17.12.2007 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.12.2007 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.12.2007 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.11.2007 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.11.2007 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.11.2007 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.11.2007 |
Indication of deficiencies in a request for registering a transfer of rights and invitation to correct them |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.11.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
08.11.2007 |
Description |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
08.11.2007 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.11.2007 |
Request for transfer of rights |
Search / examination |
22 |
|
05.11.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.11.2007 |
Description |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
05.11.2007 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.11.2007 |
Request for transfer of rights |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.10.2007 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.10.2007 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.09.2004 |
Maintenance of the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.08.2004 |
Invitation to confirm maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.07.2004 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.06.2004 |
Refund order search fee |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.06.2004 |
Annex to European Search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.06.2004 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.06.2004 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.06.2004 |
Modified abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.04.2004 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.04.2004 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.04.2004 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.03.2004 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.02.2004 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.02.2004 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.02.2004 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
04.02.2004 |
Description |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
04.02.2004 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.02.2004 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
04.02.2004 |
Letter concerning search matters |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.02.2004 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.02.2004 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
34 |
|
04.02.2004 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
6 |