EP1633145 - Secured electronic device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.05.2007 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.05.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.06.2007 [2007/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nagra Thomson Licensing 46, Quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | [2007/08] |
Former [2006/10] | For all designated states Canal + Technologies 34, Place Raoul Dautry 75906 Paris Cedex 15 / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Albanèse, Laurent Canal + Technologies 34 place Raoul Dautry 759006 Paris cedex 15 / FR | 02 /
Perrine, Jérome Canal + Technologies 34 place Raoul Dautry 75906 Paris cedex 15 / FR | [2006/10] | Representative(s) | Weihs, Bruno Konrad Osha Liang 121, Avenue des Champs Elysées 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2006/10] | Weihs, Bruno Konrad Cabinet Osha Liang 121, Avenue des Champs Elysées 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 04292128.8 | 03.09.2004 | [2006/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1633145 | Date: | 08.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.02.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/167, G06F12/14 | [2006/10] | CPC: |
H04N21/4183 (EP);
H04N21/4181 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2006/46] |
Former [2006/10] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Gesichertes elektronisches Gerät | [2006/10] | English: | Secured electronic device | [2006/10] | French: | Appareil électronique sécurisé | [2006/10] | Examination procedure | 09.09.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/24] | 19.01.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2007/24] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 17.10.2006 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 17.10.2006 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 17.10.2006 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 17.10.2006 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 17.10.2006 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 17.10.2006 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 17.10.2006 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 17.10.2006 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 17.10.2006 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 17.10.2006 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 17.10.2006 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 17.10.2006 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 17.10.2006 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 17.10.2006 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 17.10.2006 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 17.10.2006 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 17.10.2006 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 17.10.2006 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 17.10.2006 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 17.10.2006 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 17.10.2006 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 17.10.2006 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 17.10.2006 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 17.10.2006 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 17.10.2006 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 17.10.2006 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 17.10.2006 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 17.10.2006 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2006 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5249232 (ERBES NORBERT [DE], et al) [X] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [X] - WEISS R, "ENHANCED 8051 DELIVERS SECURE OPERATION AND PROTECTS SOFTWARE", EDN ELECTRICAL DESIGN NEWS, CAHNERS PUBLISHING CO. NEWTON, MASSACHUSETTS, US, (19920316), vol. 37, no. 6, ISSN 0012-7515, page 83, XP000298138 [X] 1-6 * the whole document * |