EP1529629 - Method of packaging rolled products and embossing roll [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.05.2014 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.05.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.06.2014 [2014/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SCA TISSUE FRANCE 60, avenue de l'Europe 92270 Bois-Colombes / FR | [2013/14] |
Former [2010/36] | For all designated states Georgia-Pacific France 60, avenue de l'Europe 92270 Bois-Colombes / FR | ||
Former [2005/19] | For all designated states Georgia-Pacific France 11, route Industrielle 68320 Kunheim / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Basler, Michel 6, rue Vauban 68500 Issenheim / FR | 02 /
Jeannot, Sébastien 52 B, Grand'Rue 68320 Bischwihr / FR | [2005/19] | Representative(s) | Cortier, Sophie, et al SCA TISSUE FRANCE Département Brevets 60, avenue de l'Europe 92270 Bois-Colombes / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2010/36] | Cortier, Sophie, et al Georgia-Pacific France Service Propriété Industrielle 60, avenue de l'Europe 92270 Bois-Colombes / FR | ||
Former [2005/19] | Thomas, Nadine GEORGIA-PACIFIC FRANCE, Département Propriété Intellectuelle, 23, Boulevard Georges Clemenceau 92415 Courbevoie Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 04292548.7 | 27.10.2004 | [2005/19] | Priority number, date | FR20030012998 | 05.11.2003 Original published format: FR 0312998 | [2005/19] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1529629 | Date: | 11.05.2005 | Language: | FR | [2005/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.02.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B31F1/07 | [2005/19] | CPC: |
B31F1/07 (EP,US);
B31F2201/0723 (EP,US);
B31F2201/0733 (EP,US);
B31F2201/0776 (EP,US);
B31F2201/0794 (EP,US);
B65B25/146 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/19] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Verpacken von Produkten in Rollenform und Prägewalz | [2005/19] | English: | Method of packaging rolled products and embossing roll | [2005/19] | French: | Procédé de conditionnement de produits en rouleaux et cylindre de gaufrage | [2005/19] | Examination procedure | 11.11.2005 | Examination requested [2006/02] | 19.07.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.11.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.07.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.01.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/25] | 06.02.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/25] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.07.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0367999 (ICAIPLAST SPA [IT], et al) [Y] 3-11* column 5, line 30 - column 5, line 35; figure 8 *; | [XY]GB2380447 (SCA HYGIENE PROD GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,2,12-15 * page 5, line 29 - page 5, line 34 * * page 9, line 29 - page 9, line 34 * * figure 2a * [Y] 3-11 | by applicant | GB2380447 |